Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2800466

EP2800466 - ANIMAL PLAY TOY [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  27.10.2017
Database last updated on 21.10.2019
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  18.11.2016
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  14.11.2016
Most recent event   Tooltip18.10.2019Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): CY
published on 20.11.2019 [2019/47]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Nestec S.A.
Avenue Nestlé 55
1800 Vevey / CH
[2016/51]
Former [2014/46]For all designated states
Nestec S.A.
Avenue Nestlé 55
1800 Vevey / CH
Inventor(s)01 / PERSELLS, James P.
3201 Patterson Place Drive 105
St. Louis, MO 63129 / US
02 / WURTH, Stephen, Andrew
2842 Indiana Avenue
St. Louis, Missouri 63118 / US
03 / KIM, Kisun
530 N. Union Boulevard
St. Louis, Missouri 63108 / US
04 / BALLARD, Jacob
1119 Mississippi Avenue
Apt. 203
St. Louis, Missouri 63104 / US
05 / SEAL, Paul
901 Chouteau Avenue
St. Louis, Missouri 63102 / US
 [2014/46]
Representative(s)Krishnan, Sri , et al
Société des Produits Nestlé S.A.
Avenue Nestlé 55
1800 Vevey / CH
[N/P]
Former [2016/51]Krishnan, Sri , et al
Nestec S.A.
CT-IAM
Avenue Nestlé, 55
1800 Vevey / CH
Former [2014/46]Rupp, Christian
Mitscherlich PartmbB
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte
Sonnenstraße 33
80331 München / DE
Application number, filing date13733874.503.01.2013
[2016/51]
WO2013US20041
Priority number, dateUS201261582968P04.01.2012         Original published format: US 201261582968 P
[2014/46]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013103650
Date:11.07.2013
Language:EN
[2013/28]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2800466
Date:12.11.2014
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.07.2013
[2014/46]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2800466
Date:21.12.2016
Language:EN
[2016/51]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US11.07.2013
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP18.12.2014
ClassificationInternational:A01K15/02, B65D85/00
[2016/36]
Former International [2015/04]A01K29/00, A01K11/00, A01K15/02
Former International [2014/46]A01K29/00
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/46]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:TIERSPIELZEUG[2014/46]
English:ANIMAL PLAY TOY[2014/46]
French:JOUET POUR ANIMAL[2014/46]
Entry into regional phase25.06.2014National basic fee paid 
25.06.2014Search fee paid 
25.06.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
25.06.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure25.06.2014Examination requested  [2014/46]
20.07.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
07.01.2016Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
15.03.2016Reply to a communication from the examining division
08.04.2016Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
08.06.2016Reply to a communication from the examining division
27.09.2016Communication of intention to grant the patent
10.11.2016Fee for grant paid
10.11.2016Fee for publishing/printing paid
10.11.2016Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  07.01.2016
Opposition(s)22.09.2017No opposition filed within time limit [2017/48]
Fees paidRenewal fee
13.01.2015Renewal fee patent year 03
11.01.2016Renewal fee patent year 04
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT21.12.2016
BE21.12.2016
CY21.12.2016
DK21.12.2016
EE21.12.2016
FI21.12.2016
HR21.12.2016
LT21.12.2016
LV21.12.2016
MC21.12.2016
RO21.12.2016
RS21.12.2016
SI21.12.2016
SM21.12.2016
IE03.01.2017
LU03.01.2017
MT03.01.2017
BG21.03.2017
GR22.03.2017
IS21.04.2017
PT21.04.2017
[2019/47]
Former [2018/43]AT21.12.2016
BE21.12.2016
DK21.12.2016
EE21.12.2016
FI21.12.2016
HR21.12.2016
LT21.12.2016
LV21.12.2016
MC21.12.2016
RO21.12.2016
RS21.12.2016
SI21.12.2016
SM21.12.2016
IE03.01.2017
LU03.01.2017
MT03.01.2017
BG21.03.2017
GR22.03.2017
IS21.04.2017
PT21.04.2017
Former [2018/13]AT21.12.2016
BE21.12.2016
DK21.12.2016
EE21.12.2016
FI21.12.2016
HR21.12.2016
LT21.12.2016
LV21.12.2016
MC21.12.2016
RO21.12.2016
RS21.12.2016
SI21.12.2016
SM21.12.2016
IE03.01.2017
LU03.01.2017
BG21.03.2017
GR22.03.2017
IS21.04.2017
PT21.04.2017
Former [2018/01]AT21.12.2016
BE21.12.2016
DK21.12.2016
EE21.12.2016
FI21.12.2016
HR21.12.2016
LT21.12.2016
LV21.12.2016
MC21.12.2016
RO21.12.2016
RS21.12.2016
SM21.12.2016
LU03.01.2017
BG21.03.2017
GR22.03.2017
IS21.04.2017
PT21.04.2017
Former [2017/43]AT21.12.2016
BE21.12.2016
EE21.12.2016
FI21.12.2016
HR21.12.2016
LT21.12.2016
LV21.12.2016
MC21.12.2016
RO21.12.2016
RS21.12.2016
SM21.12.2016
BG21.03.2017
GR22.03.2017
IS21.04.2017
PT21.04.2017
Former [2017/36]BE21.12.2016
EE21.12.2016
FI21.12.2016
HR21.12.2016
LT21.12.2016
LV21.12.2016
RO21.12.2016
RS21.12.2016
GR22.03.2017
IS21.04.2017
Former [2017/28]FI21.12.2016
HR21.12.2016
LT21.12.2016
LV21.12.2016
RS21.12.2016
BE31.01.2017
GR22.03.2017
Former [2017/12]LV21.12.2016
Documents cited:Search[XY]WO2011085413  (ROGZ PTY LTD [ZA], et al) [X] 1,5,7,8,10 * the whole document * [Y] 2-4,6,9,13-19;
 [X]US2011083608  (MARKHAM JOSEPH P [US], et al) [X] 1,7 * abstract * * paragraph [0020]; figures 1-3 *;
 [X]WO0027185  (OTTOSON NINA [SE]) [X] 1,7 * abstract *;
 [Y]US2011162998  (WURTH STEPHEN A [US], et al) [Y] 13-15,17-19 * abstract * * paragraph [0045]; figures 1-4 *;
 [YA]US5467741  (O'ROURKE ANTHONY [US]) [Y] 2-4,6,9 * the whole document * [A] 1,5,7,8,10,13-19;
 [Y]US2005123585  (COX EDWARD R [US], et al) [Y] 16 * abstract * * paragraphs [0054] , [0 62] *;
 [A]US6178922  (DENESUK MATTHEW [US], et al) [A] 1-10,13-19 * abstract * * column 9, lines 37-53; figures 2, 3 *;
 [A]US3830202  (GARRISON E) [A] 1-10,13-19 * the whole document *
International search[X]US2011083608  (MARKHAM JOSEPH P [US], et al);
 [Y]US3830202  (GARRISON E);
 [Y]USD380879S  (HERNANDEZ);
 [Y]US2011162998  (WURTH STEPHEN A [US], et al);
 [Y]US2806643  (WEISS ARTHUR J);
 [Y]US2005123585  (COX EDWARD R [US], et al)
 [Y]  - "WOBBLER webpage", WOBBLER WEBPAGE, (2011), page 1, URL: http://web.archive.org/web/20111010045910/http://www.kongcompany.com/products/dogs/wobb ler/wobbler-1, (20130207), XP008172252
Examination   - URL: http://dictionary.cambridge.org/dictionary/english/attach