Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2801167

EP2801167 - METHOD FOR TRANSMITTING HARQ-ACK INFORMATION BASED ON TRANSMISSION DIVERSITY PRIORITY [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  27.07.2019
Database last updated on 16.10.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip02.08.2019First examination report 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd.
129, Samsung-ro
Yeongtong-gu
Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do, 443-742 / KR
[2014/46]
Inventor(s)01 / FU, Jingxing
c/o SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO., LTD.
12/F Zhongdian Fazhan Building
N0.9 Xiaguangli
Chaoyang District
Beijing 100125 / CN
02 / FU, Jingxing
c/o SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO., LTD.
12/F Zhongdian Fazhan Building
N0.9 Xiaguangli
Chaoyang District
Beijing 100125 / CN
 [2014/46]
Representative(s)Nederlandsch Octrooibureau
P.O. Box 29720
2502 LS The Hague / NL
[2014/46]
Application number, filing date13733881.007.01.2013
WO2013KR00095
Priority number, dateCN2012100303106.01.2012         Original published format: CN201210003031
[2014/46]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013103274
Date:11.07.2013
Language:EN
[2013/28]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2801167
Date:12.11.2014
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.07.2013
[2014/46]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:KR11.07.2013
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP03.08.2015
ClassificationInternational:H04L1/18, H04B7/04
[2014/46]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/46]
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZUR ÜBERTRAGUNG VON HARQ-ACK-INFORMATIONEN AUF DER BASIS VON ÜBERTRAGUNGSDIVERSITÄTSPRIORITÄT[2014/46]
English:METHOD FOR TRANSMITTING HARQ-ACK INFORMATION BASED ON TRANSMISSION DIVERSITY PRIORITY[2014/46]
French:PROCÉDÉ DE TRANSMISSION D'INFORMATIONS HARQ-ACK SUR LA BASE D'UNE PRIORITÉ DE DIVERSITÉ DE TRANSMISSION[2014/46]
Entry into regional phase04.07.2014National basic fee paid 
04.07.2014Search fee paid 
04.07.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
04.07.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure04.07.2014Examination requested  [2014/46]
29.02.2016Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
31.07.2019Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  31.07.2019
Fees paidRenewal fee
24.12.2014Renewal fee patent year 03
21.12.2015Renewal fee patent year 04
22.12.2016Renewal fee patent year 05
27.12.2017Renewal fee patent year 06
23.01.2019Renewal fee patent year 07
Documents cited:Search[X]WO2011041623  (INTERDIGITAL PATENT HOLDINGS [US], et al) [X] 1-7,10,14 * paragraph [0133] - paragraph [0147] * * paragraph [0162] - paragraph [0163] * * paragraph [0211] - paragraph [0216] *;
 [X]US2011235599  (NAM YOUNG-HAN [US], et al) [X] 1-3,14 * paragraph [0179] - paragraph [0180] * * paragraph [0088] - paragraph [0104] * * paragraph [0108] - paragraph [0109] *
 [X]  - SAMSUNG, "HARQ-ACK Coding for DL CA with TDD", 3GPP DRAFT; R1-106014 FORMAT3 TDD, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, (20101109), vol. RAN WG1, no. Jacksonville, USA; 20101115 - 20101119, XP050598853 [X] 1-6,14 * page 1, paragraph 2 - page 3, paragraph 3; figure 1 *
 [X]  - LG ELECTRONICS, "Details on Spatial Bundling for TDD Mode 1 using PUCCH format 3", 3GPP DRAFT; R1-110842_LG_SPATIAL BUNDLING FOR MODE 1, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, (20110215), vol. RAN WG1, no. Taipei, Taiwan; 20110221, XP050490614 [X] 1-4,14 * page 1, paragraph 1 - page 2, paragraph 2 * * page 3, paragraph A - page 5, paragraph B; table 1 *
 [X]  - MCC SUPPORT, "Final Report of 3GPP TSG RAN WG1 #64 v1.3.0", 3GPP DRAFT; FINAL_REPORTWG1#64_V130, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, (20110523), vol. RAN WG1, no. Barcelona; 20110509, XP050490958 [X] 1-4,14 * page 28, line 6.2.1.1 * * page 29, paragraph 6.2.1.2 - page 33, paragraph 6.2.1.2 *
 [X]  - HUAWEI ET AL, "Discussion on TDD HARQ-ACK bundling", 3GPP DRAFT; R1-114087, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, (20111108), vol. RAN WG1, no. San Francisco, USA; 20111114 - 20111118, XP050562067 [X] 1-3,14 * page 1, paragraph 1 - page 3, paragraph 3; table 3 *
 [X]  - CATT, "Enhancements on UL ACK/NACK in Rel-11 carrier aggregation", 3GPP DRAFT; R1-112937, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, (20111004), vol. RAN WG1, no. Zhuhai; 20111010, XP050538143 [X] 1-4,14 * page 1, paragraph 2 * * page 3, paragraph 3; table 2 *
International search[Y]US2011090825  (PAPASAKELLARIOU ARIS [US], et al);
 [Y]US2011194525  (NISHIO AKIHIKO [JP], et al);
 [A]US2009055703  (KIM YOUNG-BUM [KR], et al);
 [A]US2011305284  (MUECK MARKUS [DE], et al);
 [A]US2009042558  (SHEN ZUKANG [US], et al)