Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2801031

EP2801031 - FAULT-TOLERANT SENSING AND MONITORING COMMUNICATIONS BUS SYSTEM FOR AGRICULTURAL APPLICATIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  25.05.2018
Database last updated on 19.10.2019
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  16.06.2017
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  18.01.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip21.06.2019Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): MC
published on 24.07.2019  [2019/30]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Dickey-John
500 Cardigan Road
St. Paul, MN 55126 / US
[2014/46]
Inventor(s)01 / KUHNEL, David
3534 Maplewood Lane
Johnstown, CO 80534 / US
02 / MILLER, Gregory C.
313 Brookside Lane
Chatham, IL 62629 / US
 [2014/46]
Representative(s)Kuhnen & Wacker Patent- und Rechtsanwaltsbüro PartG mbB
Prinz-Ludwig-Straße 40A
85354 Freising / DE
[N/P]
Former [2014/46]Kuhnen & Wacker
Patent- und Rechtsanwaltsbüro
Prinz-Ludwig-Straße 40A
85354 Freising / DE
Application number, filing date13733907.307.01.2013
[2017/29]
WO2013US20464
Priority number, dateUS201261584000P06.01.2012         Original published format: US 201261584000 P
[2014/46]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013103937
Date:11.07.2013
Language:EN
[2013/28]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2801031
Date:12.11.2014
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.07.2013
[2014/46]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2801031
Date:19.07.2017
Language:EN
[2017/29]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US11.07.2013
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP30.07.2015
ClassificationInternational:G06F11/07, G06F11/20, H04L12/40, H04L12/42, A01C21/00, G01F1/76, A01B79/00, A01C7/10
[2017/07]
Former International [2015/36]G06F11/00, G06F11/20, A01B79/00, A01C7/10, A01C17/00
Former International [2014/46]G06F11/00
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/46]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:FEHLERTOLERANTE MESSUNG UND ÜBERWACHUNG EINES KOMMUNIKATIONSBUSSYSTEMS FÜR LANDWIRTSCHAFTLICHE ANWENDUNGEN[2014/46]
English:FAULT-TOLERANT SENSING AND MONITORING COMMUNICATIONS BUS SYSTEM FOR AGRICULTURAL APPLICATIONS[2014/46]
French:SYSTÈME DE BUS DE COMMUNICATION DE DÉTECTION ET DE SURVEILLANCE INSENSIBLE AUX DÉFAILLANCES POUR APPLICATIONS AGRICOLES[2014/46]
Entry into regional phase18.07.2014National basic fee paid 
18.07.2014Search fee paid 
18.07.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
18.07.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure18.07.2014Examination requested  [2014/46]
25.02.2016Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
27.07.2016Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02)
05.10.2016Reply to a communication from the examining division
24.01.2017Communication of intention to grant the patent
01.06.2017Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
06.06.2017Fee for grant paid
06.06.2017Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  27.07.2016
Opposition(s)20.04.2018No opposition filed within time limit [2018/26]
Fees paidRenewal fee
26.01.2015Renewal fee patent year 03
11.01.2016Renewal fee patent year 04
11.01.2017Renewal fee patent year 05
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT19.07.2017
CZ19.07.2017
DK19.07.2017
EE19.07.2017
ES19.07.2017
FI19.07.2017
HR19.07.2017
LT19.07.2017
LV19.07.2017
MC19.07.2017
NL19.07.2017
PL19.07.2017
RO19.07.2017
RS19.07.2017
SI19.07.2017
SK19.07.2017
SM19.07.2017
BG19.10.2017
NO19.10.2017
GR20.10.2017
IS19.11.2017
IE07.01.2018
LU07.01.2018
BE31.01.2018
CH31.01.2018
LI31.01.2018
[2019/30]
Former [2019/09]AT19.07.2017
CZ19.07.2017
DK19.07.2017
EE19.07.2017
ES19.07.2017
FI19.07.2017
HR19.07.2017
LT19.07.2017
LV19.07.2017
NL19.07.2017
PL19.07.2017
RO19.07.2017
RS19.07.2017
SI19.07.2017
SK19.07.2017
SM19.07.2017
BG19.10.2017
NO19.10.2017
GR20.10.2017
IS19.11.2017
IE07.01.2018
LU07.01.2018
BE31.01.2018
CH31.01.2018
LI31.01.2018
Former [2018/52]AT19.07.2017
CZ19.07.2017
DK19.07.2017
EE19.07.2017
ES19.07.2017
FI19.07.2017
HR19.07.2017
LT19.07.2017
LV19.07.2017
NL19.07.2017
PL19.07.2017
RO19.07.2017
RS19.07.2017
SI19.07.2017
SK19.07.2017
SM19.07.2017
BG19.10.2017
NO19.10.2017
GR20.10.2017
IS19.11.2017
LU07.01.2018
BE31.01.2018
CH31.01.2018
LI31.01.2018
Former [2018/50]AT19.07.2017
CZ19.07.2017
DK19.07.2017
EE19.07.2017
ES19.07.2017
FI19.07.2017
HR19.07.2017
LT19.07.2017
LV19.07.2017
NL19.07.2017
PL19.07.2017
RO19.07.2017
RS19.07.2017
SI19.07.2017
SK19.07.2017
SM19.07.2017
BG19.10.2017
NO19.10.2017
GR20.10.2017
IS19.11.2017
LU07.01.2018
BE31.01.2018
Former [2018/47]AT19.07.2017
CZ19.07.2017
DK19.07.2017
EE19.07.2017
ES19.07.2017
FI19.07.2017
HR19.07.2017
LT19.07.2017
LV19.07.2017
NL19.07.2017
PL19.07.2017
RO19.07.2017
RS19.07.2017
SI19.07.2017
SK19.07.2017
SM19.07.2017
BG19.10.2017
NO19.10.2017
GR20.10.2017
IS19.11.2017
LU07.01.2018
Former [2018/39]AT19.07.2017
CZ19.07.2017
DK19.07.2017
EE19.07.2017
ES19.07.2017
FI19.07.2017
HR19.07.2017
LT19.07.2017
LV19.07.2017
NL19.07.2017
PL19.07.2017
RO19.07.2017
RS19.07.2017
SI19.07.2017
SK19.07.2017
SM19.07.2017
BG19.10.2017
NO19.10.2017
GR20.10.2017
IS19.11.2017
Former [2018/24]AT19.07.2017
CZ19.07.2017
DK19.07.2017
EE19.07.2017
ES19.07.2017
FI19.07.2017
HR19.07.2017
LT19.07.2017
LV19.07.2017
NL19.07.2017
PL19.07.2017
RO19.07.2017
RS19.07.2017
SK19.07.2017
SM19.07.2017
BG19.10.2017
NO19.10.2017
GR20.10.2017
IS19.11.2017
Former [2018/21]AT19.07.2017
CZ19.07.2017
DK19.07.2017
ES19.07.2017
FI19.07.2017
HR19.07.2017
LT19.07.2017
LV19.07.2017
NL19.07.2017
PL19.07.2017
RS19.07.2017
BG19.10.2017
NO19.10.2017
GR20.10.2017
IS19.11.2017
Former [2018/12]AT19.07.2017
ES19.07.2017
FI19.07.2017
HR19.07.2017
LT19.07.2017
LV19.07.2017
NL19.07.2017
PL19.07.2017
RS19.07.2017
BG19.10.2017
NO19.10.2017
GR20.10.2017
IS19.11.2017
Former [2018/11]AT19.07.2017
ES19.07.2017
FI19.07.2017
HR19.07.2017
LT19.07.2017
NL19.07.2017
PL19.07.2017
RS19.07.2017
BG19.10.2017
NO19.10.2017
GR20.10.2017
IS19.11.2017
Former [2018/10]AT19.07.2017
FI19.07.2017
HR19.07.2017
LT19.07.2017
NL19.07.2017
RS19.07.2017
NO19.10.2017
Former [2018/08]FI19.07.2017
LT19.07.2017
NL19.07.2017
NO19.10.2017
Former [2018/07]LT19.07.2017
NO19.10.2017
Documents cited:Search[Y]US6009354  (FLAMME DAVID D [US] ET AL) [Y] 1-13 * abstract * * figures 3,5 * * column 5, line 21 - column 6, line 42 * * column 7, line 34 - column 4, line 22 * * claims 7,18 *;
 [Y]US5621666  (O'NEALL DONALD L [US] ET AL) [Y] 1-13 * abstract * * figure 4 * * column 9, line 52 - column 10, line 18; figure 5 *;
 [A]US2009276666  (HALEY NEIL [US] ET AL) [A] 1-13 * abstract * * paragraphs [0019] - [0024] - [0058] , [0089] - [0097]; figure 5 *
International search[Y]US6009354  (FLAMME ET AL.);
 [Y]US2008201994  (CRAGO);
 [Y]US2008262669  (SMID ET AL.);
 [A]US2007042803  (ANDERSON)
by applicantUS5864781