Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2867837

EP2867837 - SYSTEM FOR THE SECURE TRANSMISSION OF DIGITAL DATA [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  14.06.2019
Database last updated on 23.01.2020
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  06.07.2018
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  22.02.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip09.08.2019Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): SI
published on 11.09.2019  [2019/37]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Nepting
18 rue Auguste Comte
34000 Montpellier / FR
[2015/19]
Inventor(s)01 / AUBRY-TRIAL, Martine
334 Avenue des Costières
F-34130 Saint Aunes / FR
02 / COTTE, Jean-François
13 Chemin de Massacos
F-34800 Peret / FR
03 / DALMAS, Jean-Paul
35 Bis de Massane
F-34670 Baillargues / FR
04 / RENAULT, Frédéric
22 rue des Frères Platter
F-34000 Montpellier / FR
 [2018/32]
Former [2015/19]01 / AUBRY-TRIAL, Martine
334 Avenue des Costières
F-34130 Saint Aunes / FR
02 / COTTE, Jean-François
13 Chemin de Massacos
F-34800 Peret / FR
03 / DALMAS, Jean-Paul
35 Bis de Massane
F-34670 Baillargues / FR
04 / RENAULT, Frédéric
5 rue Bonnié
F-34000 Montpellier / FR
Representative(s)Rhein, Alain
Cabinet BREV&SUD
55 Avenue Clément Ader
34170 Castelnau le Lez / FR
[2015/19]
Application number, filing date13734134.311.06.2013
[2018/32]
WO2013FR51352
Priority number, dateFR2012005621729.06.2012         Original published format: FR 1256217
FR2013005517505.06.2013         Original published format: FR 1355175
[2015/19]
Filing languageFR
Procedural languageFR
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2014001677
Date:03.01.2014
Language:FR
[2014/01]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2867837
Date:06.05.2015
Language:FR
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.01.2014
[2015/19]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2867837
Date:08.08.2018
Language:FR
[2018/32]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP03.01.2014
ClassificationInternational:H04W12/06, G06Q20/32, H04L29/06
[2018/10]
Former International [2015/19]G06Q20/18, G06Q20/34, H04W12/00, G06Q20/36
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2015/19]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:SYSTEM ZUM SICHEREN ÜBERTRAGEN VON DIGITALEN DATEN[2015/19]
English:SYSTEM FOR THE SECURE TRANSMISSION OF DIGITAL DATA[2015/19]
French:SYSTÈME DE TRANSMISSION SÉCURISÉE DE DONNÉES NUMÉRIQUES[2018/10]
Former [2015/19]SYSTEME DE TRANSMISSION SECURISEE DE DONNEES NUMERIQUES
Entry into regional phase13.01.2015National basic fee paid 
13.01.2015Designation fee(s) paid 
13.01.2015Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure13.01.2015Examination requested  [2015/19]
28.07.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
23.02.2018Communication of intention to grant the patent
25.06.2018Fee for grant paid
25.06.2018Fee for publishing/printing paid
25.06.2018Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  23.02.2018
Opposition(s)09.05.2019No opposition filed within time limit [2019/29]
Fees paidRenewal fee
29.06.2015Renewal fee patent year 03
27.06.2016Renewal fee patent year 04
19.06.2017Renewal fee patent year 05
26.06.2018Renewal fee patent year 06
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAL08.08.2018
AT08.08.2018
CZ08.08.2018
DK08.08.2018
EE08.08.2018
FI08.08.2018
HR08.08.2018
LT08.08.2018
LV08.08.2018
RS08.08.2018
SI08.08.2018
SK08.08.2018
SM08.08.2018
BG08.11.2018
NO08.11.2018
GR09.11.2018
IS08.12.2018
[2019/37]
Former [2019/26]AL08.08.2018
AT08.08.2018
CZ08.08.2018
DK08.08.2018
EE08.08.2018
FI08.08.2018
HR08.08.2018
LT08.08.2018
LV08.08.2018
RS08.08.2018
SK08.08.2018
SM08.08.2018
BG08.11.2018
NO08.11.2018
GR09.11.2018
IS08.12.2018
Former [2019/24]AL08.08.2018
AT08.08.2018
CZ08.08.2018
EE08.08.2018
FI08.08.2018
HR08.08.2018
LT08.08.2018
LV08.08.2018
RS08.08.2018
SK08.08.2018
BG08.11.2018
NO08.11.2018
GR09.11.2018
IS08.12.2018
Former [2019/22]AL08.08.2018
AT08.08.2018
CZ08.08.2018
FI08.08.2018
HR08.08.2018
LT08.08.2018
LV08.08.2018
RS08.08.2018
BG08.11.2018
NO08.11.2018
GR09.11.2018
IS08.12.2018
Former [2019/12]AL08.08.2018
AT08.08.2018
FI08.08.2018
HR08.08.2018
LT08.08.2018
LV08.08.2018
RS08.08.2018
BG08.11.2018
NO08.11.2018
GR09.11.2018
IS08.12.2018
Former [2019/11]AT08.08.2018
FI08.08.2018
HR08.08.2018
LT08.08.2018
RS08.08.2018
BG08.11.2018
NO08.11.2018
GR09.11.2018
IS08.12.2018
Former [2019/10]AT08.08.2018
FI08.08.2018
LT08.08.2018
RS08.08.2018
BG08.11.2018
NO08.11.2018
GR09.11.2018
IS08.12.2018
Former [2019/08]FI08.08.2018
LT08.08.2018
NO08.11.2018
IS08.12.2018
Former [2019/07]LT08.08.2018
Cited inInternational search[XI]EP1965596  (GEMPLUS CARD INT [FR]) [X] 1,2,6,7 * abstract * * paragraph [0001] - paragraph [0004] * * paragraph [0013] - paragraph [0016] * * paragraph [0031] - paragraph [0033] * * paragraph [0036] - paragraph [0037] * * paragraph [0042] - paragraph [0044] * [I] 3-5,8,9;
 [A]WO2010052722  (WALLETEX MICROELECTRONICS LTD [CN], et al) [A] 1-9 * abstract * * figures 1,2 * * page 1, line 1 - line 4 * * page 2, line 7 - line 14 * * page 3, line 22 - line 25 * * page 4, line 14 - line 27 * * page 15, line 1 - line 19 * * page 18, line 13 - line 28 *;
 [A]WO2011080273  (GEMALTO SA [FR], et al) [A] 1-9 * figures 1,2 * * page 3, line 11 - line 20 * * page 9, line 8 - line 12 * * page 9, line 21 - page 10, line 8 *