Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2862375

EP2862375 - APPARATUS AND METHOD FOR IMPLEMENTING DUAL-SIM CROSS-DIVERT IN DSDS WIRELESS DEVICES [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  09.11.2018
Database last updated on 11.11.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip14.06.2019New entry: Renewal fee paid 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Qualcomm Incorporated
Attn: International IP Administration 5775 Morehouse Drive
San Diego, CA 92121 / US
[2015/17]
Inventor(s)01 / VANGHI, Vieri
5775 Morehouse Drive
San Diego, California 92121 / US
 [2015/17]
Representative(s)Dunlop, Hugh Christopher , et al
Maucher Jenkins
26 Caxton Street
London SW1H 0RJ / GB
[N/P]
Former [2015/17]Dunlop, Hugh Christopher , et al
RGC Jenkins & Co.
26 Caxton Street
London SW1H 0RJ / GB
Application number, filing date13734240.818.06.2013
WO2013US46430
Priority number, dateUS20121352589718.06.2012         Original published format: US201213525897
[2015/17]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013192239
Date:27.12.2013
Language:EN
[2013/52]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2862375
Date:22.04.2015
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.12.2013
[2015/17]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP27.12.2013
ClassificationInternational:H04W4/16, H04W88/06
[2015/17]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2015/17]
TitleGerman:VORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUR IMPLEMENTIERUNG EINER QUERUMLEITUNG MIT ZWEI SIM-KARTEN IN DRAHTLOSEN DSDS-VORRICHTUNGEN[2015/17]
English:APPARATUS AND METHOD FOR IMPLEMENTING DUAL-SIM CROSS-DIVERT IN DSDS WIRELESS DEVICES[2015/17]
French:APPAREIL ET PROCÉDÉ POUR METTRE EN UVRE UN RENVOI CROISÉ DE DOUBLE CARTE SIM DANS DES DISPOSITIFS SANS FIL DSDS[2015/17]
Entry into regional phase08.12.2014National basic fee paid 
08.12.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
08.12.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure08.12.2014Examination requested  [2015/17]
06.08.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
09.11.2018Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
05.03.2019Reply to a communication from the examining division
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  09.11.2018
Fees paidRenewal fee
15.04.2015Renewal fee patent year 03
31.03.2016Renewal fee patent year 04
08.06.2017Renewal fee patent year 05
08.06.2018Renewal fee patent year 06
10.06.2019Renewal fee patent year 07
Cited inInternational search[A]WO2008040848  (ELISA OYJ [FI]; FILS HENRY [FI]; HENRIKSSON KIM [FI]; JOKELA JARI [FI]) [A] 1-24 * the whole document *;
 [A]WO2012041663  (ST ERICSSON SA [CH]; HELFRE VINCENT [SE]; GOERANSON HANS-CHRISTIAN [DK) [A] 1-24 * the whole document *
 [I]  - TELTARIF, "Erste Eindrücke: Mit dem Dual-SIM-Handy unterwegs", INTERNET CITATION, (20070314), pages 1 - 9, URL: http://www.teltarif.de/gb/arch/2007/kw11/s25274:1.html, (20081216), XP002508367 [I] 1-24 * pages 1-3 *