Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2833751

EP2833751 - SOLE STRUCTURE FOR ARTICLE OF FOOTWEAR [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  15.11.2019
Database last updated on 18.01.2020
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  07.12.2018
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  12.07.2018
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  03.02.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip17.01.2020Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): MC
published on 19.02.2020 [2020/08]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
NIKE Innovate C.V.
One Bowerman Drive
Beaverton, OR 97005-6453 / US
[2015/07]
Inventor(s)01 / ADAMI, Giovanni
c/o NIKE Inc.
One Bowerman Drive
Beaverton, OR 97005-6453 / US
02 / AUGER, Perry W.
c/o NIKE Inc.
One Bowerman Drive
Beaverton, OR 97005-6453 / US
03 / CAVALIERE, Sergio
c/o NIKE Inc.
One Bowerman Drive
Beaverton, OR 97005-6453 / US
04 / SMITH, Timothy J.
c/o NIKE Inc.
One Bowerman Drive
Beaverton, OR 97005-6453 / US
 [2019/02]
Former [2015/07]01 / ADAMI, Giovanni
c/o NIKE Inc.
One Bowerman Drive
Beaverton, OR 97005-6453 / US
02 / AUGER, Perry, W.
c/o NIKE Inc.
One Bowerman Drive
Beaverton, OR 97005-6453 / US
03 / CAVALIERE, Sergio
c/o NIKE Inc.
One Bowerman Drive
Beaverton, OR 97005-6453 / US
04 / SMITH, Timothy, J.
c/o NIKE Inc.
One Bowerman Drive
Beaverton, OR 97005-6453 / US
Representative(s)Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte PartG mbB
Friedenheimer Brücke 21
80639 München / DE
[2015/07]
Application number, filing date13734241.619.06.2013
[2019/02]
WO2013US46457
Priority number, dateUS20121352830620.06.2012         Original published format: US201213528306
[2015/07]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013192259
Date:27.12.2013
Language:EN
[2013/52]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2833751
Date:11.02.2015
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.12.2013
[2015/07]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2833751
Date:09.01.2019
Language:EN
[2019/02]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP27.12.2013
ClassificationInternational:A43B5/02, A43B13/04, A43B13/14, A43B13/16, A43B13/26, A43B13/41, A43B13/42, A43C15/16, A43B13/12
[2015/07]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2015/07]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:SOHLENAUFBAU FÜR SCHUHWERK[2015/07]
English:SOLE STRUCTURE FOR ARTICLE OF FOOTWEAR[2015/07]
French:STRUCTURE DE SEMELLE POUR ARTICLE CHAUSSANT[2015/07]
Entry into regional phase06.11.2014National basic fee paid 
06.11.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
06.11.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure06.11.2014Examination requested  [2015/07]
05.06.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
02.02.2017Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
12.06.2017Reply to a communication from the examining division
09.11.2017Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
15.03.2018Reply to a communication from the examining division
13.07.2018Communication of intention to grant the patent
21.11.2018Fee for grant paid
21.11.2018Fee for publishing/printing paid
22.11.2018Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  02.02.2017
Opposition(s)10.10.2019No opposition filed within time limit [2019/51]
Fees paidRenewal fee
10.06.2015Renewal fee patent year 03
10.06.2016Renewal fee patent year 04
16.06.2017Renewal fee patent year 05
12.06.2018Renewal fee patent year 06
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAL09.01.2019
AT09.01.2019
CZ09.01.2019
DK09.01.2019
EE09.01.2019
ES09.01.2019
FI09.01.2019
HR09.01.2019
IT09.01.2019
LT09.01.2019
LV09.01.2019
MC09.01.2019
NL09.01.2019
PL09.01.2019
RO09.01.2019
RS09.01.2019
SE09.01.2019
SK09.01.2019
SM09.01.2019
BG09.04.2019
NO09.04.2019
GR10.04.2019
IS09.05.2019
PT09.05.2019
[2020/08]
Former [2019/52]AL09.01.2019
AT09.01.2019
CZ09.01.2019
DK09.01.2019
EE09.01.2019
ES09.01.2019
FI09.01.2019
HR09.01.2019
IT09.01.2019
LT09.01.2019
LV09.01.2019
NL09.01.2019
PL09.01.2019
RO09.01.2019
RS09.01.2019
SE09.01.2019
SK09.01.2019
SM09.01.2019
BG09.04.2019
NO09.04.2019
GR10.04.2019
IS09.05.2019
PT09.05.2019
Former [2019/49]AL09.01.2019
AT09.01.2019
CZ09.01.2019
DK09.01.2019
EE09.01.2019
ES09.01.2019
FI09.01.2019
HR09.01.2019
IT09.01.2019
LT09.01.2019
LV09.01.2019
NL09.01.2019
PL09.01.2019
RO09.01.2019
RS09.01.2019
SE09.01.2019
SK09.01.2019
BG09.04.2019
NO09.04.2019
GR10.04.2019
IS09.05.2019
PT09.05.2019
Former [2019/48]AT09.01.2019
DK09.01.2019
ES09.01.2019
FI09.01.2019
HR09.01.2019
IT09.01.2019
LT09.01.2019
LV09.01.2019
NL09.01.2019
PL09.01.2019
RS09.01.2019
SE09.01.2019
BG09.04.2019
NO09.04.2019
GR10.04.2019
IS09.05.2019
PT09.05.2019
Former [2019/46]AT09.01.2019
ES09.01.2019
FI09.01.2019
HR09.01.2019
IT09.01.2019
LT09.01.2019
LV09.01.2019
NL09.01.2019
PL09.01.2019
RS09.01.2019
SE09.01.2019
BG09.04.2019
NO09.04.2019
GR10.04.2019
IS09.05.2019
PT09.05.2019
Former [2019/39]ES09.01.2019
FI09.01.2019
HR09.01.2019
LT09.01.2019
LV09.01.2019
NL09.01.2019
PL09.01.2019
RS09.01.2019
SE09.01.2019
BG09.04.2019
NO09.04.2019
GR10.04.2019
IS09.05.2019
PT09.05.2019
Former [2019/38]ES09.01.2019
FI09.01.2019
LT09.01.2019
NL09.01.2019
PL09.01.2019
SE09.01.2019
BG09.04.2019
NO09.04.2019
GR10.04.2019
PT09.05.2019
Former [2019/37]ES09.01.2019
FI09.01.2019
LT09.01.2019
NL09.01.2019
PL09.01.2019
SE09.01.2019
NO09.04.2019
GR10.04.2019
PT09.05.2019
Former [2019/35]ES09.01.2019
FI09.01.2019
LT09.01.2019
NL09.01.2019
PL09.01.2019
SE09.01.2019
NO09.04.2019
PT09.05.2019
Former [2019/34]FI09.01.2019
LT09.01.2019
NL09.01.2019
SE09.01.2019
NO09.04.2019
PT09.05.2019
Former [2019/33]FI09.01.2019
LT09.01.2019
NL09.01.2019
NO09.04.2019
PT09.05.2019
Former [2019/30]NL09.01.2019
Cited inInternational search[XI]US6954998  (LUSSIER MICHEL [US]) [X] 1,7,10-12 * column 7, lines 10-20,35-40,53-57; figures 2e,3b,3d-3g * * column 8, lines 21-44,57-59 * [I] 3-5,8,9;
 [XI]GB1063516  (IND LEMM & CO GMBH) [X] 1,2 * page 1, lines 89,90; figure 1 * * page 2, lines 1-4 * [I] 3;
 [I]EP0723745  (PIJNENBURG CAROLUS JOANNES MAR [BE]) [I] 1 * figure 1 *;
 [A]DE102005046138  (UHLSPORT GMBH [DE]) [A] 1 * paragraph [0029]; figures 1-3 *;
 [A]WO2011050038  (NIKE INTERNATIONAL LTD; AUGER PERRY W [US]; CAVALIERE SERGIO [IT]) [A] 1 * paragraph [0047]; figure 1 *;
 [A]WO2010115004  (NIKE INTERNATIONAL LTD [US]; AUGER PERRY W [US]; BAKER BRIAN D [US]; C) [A] 2-5,10 * paragraphs [0119] , [0085]; figures 7,8,10a,10b,12-15,16a *;
 [A]EP0533570  (PATRICK INTERNATIONAL SOCIETE [FR]) [A] 2,4 * figure 6 *;
 [A]DE19708113  (ZEPF HANS PETER [DE]) [A] 1 * column 9, lines 18-28; figures 12,13 *;
 [A]US2004163283  (DANIELS PAUL W [US] ET AL) [A] 1 * paragraph [0040] *;
 [A]US2448455  (MURRAY ALAN E) [A] 1 * column 3, lines 54-56 *