EP2882763 - METAL COMPLEXES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 28.06.2019 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 20.07.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 06.03.2018 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 27.01.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 03.08.2022 [2022/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Merck Patent GmbH Frankfurter Strasse 250 64293 Darmstadt / DE | [2015/25] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
STOESSEL, Philipp Sophienstrasse 30/03 60487 Frankfurt am Main / DE | 02 /
JOOSTEN, Dominik Am Weingarten 7 60487 Frankfurt am Main / DE | 03 /
BREUNING, Esther Salvador-Dali-Weg 18 64372 Ober-Ramstadt / DE | 04 /
KAISER, Joachim Elisabeth-Selbert-Str. 13 64289 Darmstadt / DE | [2015/25] | Application number, filing date | 13734334.9 | 02.07.2013 | [2018/34] | WO2013EP01926 | Priority number, date | EP20120005715 | 07.08.2012 Original published format: EP 12005715 | [2015/25] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2014023377 | Date: | 13.02.2014 | Language: | DE | [2014/07] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2882763 | Date: | 17.06.2015 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.02.2014 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2015/25] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2882763 | Date: | 22.08.2018 | Language: | DE | [2018/34] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 04.09.2014 | Classification | IPC: | C07F15/00, C09K11/00, H01L51/00, H05B33/10 | [2015/25] | CPC: |
H05B33/10 (EP,US);
C07F15/0033 (EP,KR,US);
H10K85/342 (EP,KR,US);
C09K11/06 (EP,KR,US);
H05B33/20 (EP,US);
H10K50/11 (EP,KR,US);
H10K85/346 (EP,US);
C09K2211/1007 (EP,US);
C09K2211/1011 (EP,US);
C09K2211/1029 (EP,US);
C09K2211/1044 (EP,US);
C09K2211/1088 (EP,US);
C09K2211/185 (EP,KR,US);
H10K2101/10 (EP,US);
H10K71/12 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/25] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | METALLKOMPLEXE | [2015/25] | English: | METAL COMPLEXES | [2015/25] | French: | COMPLEXES MÉTALLIQUES | [2015/25] | Entry into regional phase | 08.12.2014 | National basic fee paid | 08.12.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.12.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.12.2014 | Examination requested [2015/25] | 15.09.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 25.01.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 07.07.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.10.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.01.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.03.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.06.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 07.06.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 07.06.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP18189133.4 / EP3424936 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 25.01.2017 | Opposition(s) | 23.05.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit [2019/31] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.07.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.07.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.07.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 11.07.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 02.07.2013 | AL | 22.08.2018 | CY | 22.08.2018 | CZ | 22.08.2018 | DK | 22.08.2018 | EE | 22.08.2018 | ES | 22.08.2018 | FI | 22.08.2018 | HR | 22.08.2018 | IT | 22.08.2018 | LT | 22.08.2018 | LV | 22.08.2018 | MC | 22.08.2018 | MK | 22.08.2018 | MT | 22.08.2018 | NL | 22.08.2018 | PL | 22.08.2018 | RO | 22.08.2018 | RS | 22.08.2018 | SE | 22.08.2018 | SI | 22.08.2018 | SK | 22.08.2018 | SM | 22.08.2018 | TR | 22.08.2018 | BG | 22.11.2018 | NO | 22.11.2018 | GR | 23.11.2018 | IS | 22.12.2018 | PT | 22.12.2018 | [2022/31] |
Former [2021/34] | HU | 02.07.2013 | |
AL | 22.08.2018 | ||
CY | 22.08.2018 | ||
CZ | 22.08.2018 | ||
DK | 22.08.2018 | ||
EE | 22.08.2018 | ||
ES | 22.08.2018 | ||
FI | 22.08.2018 | ||
HR | 22.08.2018 | ||
IT | 22.08.2018 | ||
LT | 22.08.2018 | ||
LV | 22.08.2018 | ||
MC | 22.08.2018 | ||
MT | 22.08.2018 | ||
NL | 22.08.2018 | ||
PL | 22.08.2018 | ||
RO | 22.08.2018 | ||
RS | 22.08.2018 | ||
SE | 22.08.2018 | ||
SI | 22.08.2018 | ||
SK | 22.08.2018 | ||
SM | 22.08.2018 | ||
TR | 22.08.2018 | ||
BG | 22.11.2018 | ||
NO | 22.11.2018 | ||
GR | 23.11.2018 | ||
IS | 22.12.2018 | ||
PT | 22.12.2018 | ||
Former [2021/32] | HU | 02.07.2013 | |
AL | 22.08.2018 | ||
CY | 22.08.2018 | ||
CZ | 22.08.2018 | ||
DK | 22.08.2018 | ||
EE | 22.08.2018 | ||
ES | 22.08.2018 | ||
FI | 22.08.2018 | ||
HR | 22.08.2018 | ||
IT | 22.08.2018 | ||
LT | 22.08.2018 | ||
LV | 22.08.2018 | ||
MC | 22.08.2018 | ||
NL | 22.08.2018 | ||
PL | 22.08.2018 | ||
RO | 22.08.2018 | ||
RS | 22.08.2018 | ||
SE | 22.08.2018 | ||
SI | 22.08.2018 | ||
SK | 22.08.2018 | ||
SM | 22.08.2018 | ||
TR | 22.08.2018 | ||
BG | 22.11.2018 | ||
NO | 22.11.2018 | ||
GR | 23.11.2018 | ||
IS | 22.12.2018 | ||
PT | 22.12.2018 | ||
Former [2021/26] | AL | 22.08.2018 | |
CY | 22.08.2018 | ||
CZ | 22.08.2018 | ||
DK | 22.08.2018 | ||
EE | 22.08.2018 | ||
ES | 22.08.2018 | ||
FI | 22.08.2018 | ||
HR | 22.08.2018 | ||
IT | 22.08.2018 | ||
LT | 22.08.2018 | ||
LV | 22.08.2018 | ||
MC | 22.08.2018 | ||
NL | 22.08.2018 | ||
PL | 22.08.2018 | ||
RO | 22.08.2018 | ||
RS | 22.08.2018 | ||
SE | 22.08.2018 | ||
SI | 22.08.2018 | ||
SK | 22.08.2018 | ||
SM | 22.08.2018 | ||
TR | 22.08.2018 | ||
BG | 22.11.2018 | ||
NO | 22.11.2018 | ||
GR | 23.11.2018 | ||
IS | 22.12.2018 | ||
PT | 22.12.2018 | ||
Former [2020/29] | AL | 22.08.2018 | |
CZ | 22.08.2018 | ||
DK | 22.08.2018 | ||
EE | 22.08.2018 | ||
ES | 22.08.2018 | ||
FI | 22.08.2018 | ||
HR | 22.08.2018 | ||
IT | 22.08.2018 | ||
LT | 22.08.2018 | ||
LV | 22.08.2018 | ||
MC | 22.08.2018 | ||
NL | 22.08.2018 | ||
PL | 22.08.2018 | ||
RO | 22.08.2018 | ||
RS | 22.08.2018 | ||
SE | 22.08.2018 | ||
SI | 22.08.2018 | ||
SK | 22.08.2018 | ||
SM | 22.08.2018 | ||
TR | 22.08.2018 | ||
BG | 22.11.2018 | ||
NO | 22.11.2018 | ||
GR | 23.11.2018 | ||
IS | 22.12.2018 | ||
PT | 22.12.2018 | ||
Former [2020/17] | AL | 22.08.2018 | |
CZ | 22.08.2018 | ||
DK | 22.08.2018 | ||
EE | 22.08.2018 | ||
ES | 22.08.2018 | ||
FI | 22.08.2018 | ||
HR | 22.08.2018 | ||
IT | 22.08.2018 | ||
LT | 22.08.2018 | ||
LV | 22.08.2018 | ||
MC | 22.08.2018 | ||
NL | 22.08.2018 | ||
PL | 22.08.2018 | ||
RO | 22.08.2018 | ||
RS | 22.08.2018 | ||
SE | 22.08.2018 | ||
SI | 22.08.2018 | ||
SK | 22.08.2018 | ||
SM | 22.08.2018 | ||
TR | 22.08.2018 | ||
BG | 22.11.2018 | ||
NO | 22.11.2018 | ||
GR | 23.11.2018 | ||
IS | 22.12.2018 | ||
Former [2020/14] | AL | 22.08.2018 | |
CZ | 22.08.2018 | ||
DK | 22.08.2018 | ||
EE | 22.08.2018 | ||
ES | 22.08.2018 | ||
FI | 22.08.2018 | ||
HR | 22.08.2018 | ||
IT | 22.08.2018 | ||
LT | 22.08.2018 | ||
LV | 22.08.2018 | ||
MC | 22.08.2018 | ||
NL | 22.08.2018 | ||
PL | 22.08.2018 | ||
RO | 22.08.2018 | ||
RS | 22.08.2018 | ||
SE | 22.08.2018 | ||
SI | 22.08.2018 | ||
SK | 22.08.2018 | ||
SM | 22.08.2018 | ||
BG | 22.11.2018 | ||
NO | 22.11.2018 | ||
GR | 23.11.2018 | ||
IS | 22.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/37] | AL | 22.08.2018 | |
CZ | 22.08.2018 | ||
DK | 22.08.2018 | ||
EE | 22.08.2018 | ||
ES | 22.08.2018 | ||
FI | 22.08.2018 | ||
HR | 22.08.2018 | ||
IT | 22.08.2018 | ||
LT | 22.08.2018 | ||
LV | 22.08.2018 | ||
NL | 22.08.2018 | ||
PL | 22.08.2018 | ||
RO | 22.08.2018 | ||
RS | 22.08.2018 | ||
SE | 22.08.2018 | ||
SI | 22.08.2018 | ||
SK | 22.08.2018 | ||
SM | 22.08.2018 | ||
BG | 22.11.2018 | ||
NO | 22.11.2018 | ||
GR | 23.11.2018 | ||
IS | 22.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/26] | AL | 22.08.2018 | |
CZ | 22.08.2018 | ||
DK | 22.08.2018 | ||
EE | 22.08.2018 | ||
ES | 22.08.2018 | ||
FI | 22.08.2018 | ||
HR | 22.08.2018 | ||
IT | 22.08.2018 | ||
LT | 22.08.2018 | ||
LV | 22.08.2018 | ||
NL | 22.08.2018 | ||
PL | 22.08.2018 | ||
RO | 22.08.2018 | ||
RS | 22.08.2018 | ||
SE | 22.08.2018 | ||
SK | 22.08.2018 | ||
SM | 22.08.2018 | ||
BG | 22.11.2018 | ||
NO | 22.11.2018 | ||
GR | 23.11.2018 | ||
IS | 22.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/23] | AL | 22.08.2018 | |
CZ | 22.08.2018 | ||
EE | 22.08.2018 | ||
ES | 22.08.2018 | ||
FI | 22.08.2018 | ||
HR | 22.08.2018 | ||
IT | 22.08.2018 | ||
LT | 22.08.2018 | ||
LV | 22.08.2018 | ||
NL | 22.08.2018 | ||
PL | 22.08.2018 | ||
RO | 22.08.2018 | ||
RS | 22.08.2018 | ||
SE | 22.08.2018 | ||
SK | 22.08.2018 | ||
BG | 22.11.2018 | ||
NO | 22.11.2018 | ||
GR | 23.11.2018 | ||
IS | 22.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/22] | AL | 22.08.2018 | |
CZ | 22.08.2018 | ||
FI | 22.08.2018 | ||
HR | 22.08.2018 | ||
IT | 22.08.2018 | ||
LT | 22.08.2018 | ||
LV | 22.08.2018 | ||
NL | 22.08.2018 | ||
PL | 22.08.2018 | ||
RO | 22.08.2018 | ||
RS | 22.08.2018 | ||
SE | 22.08.2018 | ||
BG | 22.11.2018 | ||
NO | 22.11.2018 | ||
GR | 23.11.2018 | ||
IS | 22.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/21] | AL | 22.08.2018 | |
FI | 22.08.2018 | ||
HR | 22.08.2018 | ||
IT | 22.08.2018 | ||
LT | 22.08.2018 | ||
LV | 22.08.2018 | ||
NL | 22.08.2018 | ||
RS | 22.08.2018 | ||
SE | 22.08.2018 | ||
BG | 22.11.2018 | ||
NO | 22.11.2018 | ||
GR | 23.11.2018 | ||
IS | 22.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/12] | AL | 22.08.2018 | |
FI | 22.08.2018 | ||
HR | 22.08.2018 | ||
LT | 22.08.2018 | ||
LV | 22.08.2018 | ||
NL | 22.08.2018 | ||
RS | 22.08.2018 | ||
SE | 22.08.2018 | ||
BG | 22.11.2018 | ||
NO | 22.11.2018 | ||
GR | 23.11.2018 | ||
IS | 22.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/11] | FI | 22.08.2018 | |
HR | 22.08.2018 | ||
LT | 22.08.2018 | ||
NL | 22.08.2018 | ||
RS | 22.08.2018 | ||
SE | 22.08.2018 | ||
BG | 22.11.2018 | ||
NO | 22.11.2018 | ||
GR | 23.11.2018 | ||
IS | 22.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/10] | FI | 22.08.2018 | |
LT | 22.08.2018 | ||
NL | 22.08.2018 | ||
RS | 22.08.2018 | ||
SE | 22.08.2018 | ||
BG | 22.11.2018 | ||
NO | 22.11.2018 | ||
GR | 23.11.2018 | ||
IS | 22.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/09] | FI | 22.08.2018 | |
LT | 22.08.2018 | ||
NL | 22.08.2018 | ||
NO | 22.11.2018 | ||
IS | 22.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/08] | FI | 22.08.2018 | |
LT | 22.08.2018 | ||
NO | 22.11.2018 | ||
IS | 22.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/07] | LT | 22.08.2018 | Cited in | International search | [X]WO2004043974 (TAKASAGO PERFUMERY CO LTD [JP], et al) [X] 1-8,13 * page 21; compounds (II-xi),(II-xvi) * * page 5, paragraph 2 *; | [XD]WO2005113563 (COVION ORGANIC SEMICONDUCTORS [DE], et al) [XD] 1-15 * page 22; example 50 * * page 15 - page 16; claims 19,22,25,27,28 *; | [X]EP1659129 (IDEMITSU KOSAN CO [JP]) [X] 1-8,11-15 * paragraphs [0115] , [0128] , [0129] - paragraph [0137] ** paragraphs [0138] , [0139] *; | [X] - SEBASTIAN BLANCK ET AL, "Bioactive cyclometalated phthalimides: design, synthesis and kinase inhibition", DALTON TRANSACTIONS, (20120611), vol. 41, no. 31, doi:10.1039/c2dt30940h, ISSN 1477-9226, page 9337, XP055077009 [X] 1-7 * page 9339; compound 5 * * page 9344, paragraph 3 - column r * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1039/c2dt30940h | by applicant | US4539507 | US5151629 | WO9218552 | EP0652273 | EP0676461 | EP0707020 | EP0842208 | WO9827136 | EP0894107 | WO0022026 | EP1028136 | US2002034656 | EP1205527 | WO02060910 | WO02064700 | WO02072714 | WO03019694 | JP2003109758 | WO03040257 | EP1348711 | WO2004013080 | WO2004037887 | WO2004041901 | WO2004058911 | WO2004070772 | WO2004081017 | WO2004085449 | JP2004288381 | WO2004093207 | WO2004113468 | WO2004113412 | US2005008895 | WO2005011013 | WO2005014689 | WO2005019373 | US2005069729 | WO2005039246 | WO2005040302 | WO2005042548 | US2005191527 | WO2005104264 | WO2005111172 | WO2005113563 | JP2005347160 | EP1617710 | EP1617711 | WO2006005627 | WO2006008069 | WO2006061181 | WO2006095943 | WO2006117052 | EP1731584 | WO2007017066 | WO2007063754 | WO2007065523 | WO2007137725 | WO2008056746 | WO2008086851 | WO2009062578 | US2009134784 | US2009136779 | WO2009148015 | WO2010006680 | WO2010015306 | WO2010027583 | WO2010050778 | WO2010054729 | WO2010054730 | WO2010108579 | WO2010136109 | WO2011000455 | WO2011028473 | WO2011042107 | WO2011088877 | - M. A. BALDO ET AL., APPL. PHYS. LETT., (1999), vol. 75, pages 4 - 6 | - M. S. ARNOLD ET AL., APPL. PHYS. LETT., (2008), vol. 92, page 053301 | - J. BARAN ET AL., J. ORG. CHEM., (1988), vol. 53, no. 19, page 4626 | - D. L. BOGER ET AL., J. ORG. CHEM., (1981), vol. 46, no. 10, page 2180 | - L. S. CHEN ET AL., J. ORGANOMET. CHEM., (1980), vol. 193, pages 283 - 292 | - A. MAZZANTI ET AL., EUR. J. ORG. CHEM., (2011), page 6725 | - S. V. MORE ET AL., TETRAHEDRON LETT., (2005), vol. 46, page 6345 | - D. ZHAO ET AL., ORG. LETT., (2011), vol. 13, no. 24, page 6516 | - Z.-H. ZHANG ET AL., J. HETEROCYCL. CHEM., (2007), vol. 44, no. 6, page 1509 | - S. ZHANG ET AL., CHEM. COMMUN., (2008), vol. 46, page 6170 | - G. BRATULESCU, SYNTHESIS, (2009), vol. 14, page 2319 | - C. CAO ET AL., SYNTH. COMMUN., (2012), vol. 42, page 380 | - A. G. TENNYSON ET AL., INORG. CHEM., (2009), vol. 48, page 6924 | - J. BROOKS ET AL., INORG. CHEM., (2002), vol. 41, page 3055 | - K. TSUCHIYA ET AL., EUR. J. INORG. CHEM., (2010), page 926 | - H. K. LEE ET AL., SYNTH. COMMUN., (2013), vol. 43, page 915 |