Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2863845

EP2863845 - ELBOW PROSTHESIS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  08.03.2019
Database last updated on 24.08.2019
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  30.03.2018
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  13.11.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip24.05.2019Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): SI
published on 26.06.2019  [2019/26]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Zimmer, Inc.
1800 W. Center Street
Warsaw IN 46580 / US
[2015/18]
Inventor(s)01 / WAGNER, Terry W.
318 E. Lowell
Mishawaka, Indiana 56545 / US
02 / KINCAID, Brian L.
2006 Robb Road
Warsaw, Indiana 46580 / US
03 / WALZ, Kenton A.
6021 Goodfellow Drive
Fort Wayne, Indiana 46835 / US
04 / HOAG, Stephen H.
1618 W. Briaridge Road
Warsaw, Indiana 46580 / US
05 / MARQUELING, Mark Reed
7629 East State Rd 205
Churubusco, Indiana 46723 / US
 [2015/18]
Representative(s)Mays, Julie , et al
Venner Shipley LLP
200 Aldersgate
London, EC1A 4HD / GB
[2018/18]
Former [2015/18]Mays, Julie , et al
Venner Shipley LLP
200 Aldersgate
London
EC1A 4HD / GB
Application number, filing date13734583.120.06.2013
[2018/18]
WO2013US46792
Priority number, dateUS201261663452P22.06.2012         Original published format: US 201261663452 P
US20131380056713.03.2013         Original published format: US201313800567
[2015/18]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013192408
Date:27.12.2013
Language:EN
[2013/52]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2863845
Date:29.04.2015
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.12.2013
[2015/18]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2863845
Date:02.05.2018
Language:EN
[2018/18]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP27.12.2013
ClassificationInternational:A61F2/38
[2015/18]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2015/18]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:ELLENBOGENPROTHESE[2015/18]
English:ELBOW PROSTHESIS[2015/18]
French:PROTHÈSE DE COUDE[2015/18]
Entry into regional phase22.01.2015National basic fee paid 
22.01.2015Designation fee(s) paid 
22.01.2015Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure22.01.2015Examination requested  [2015/18]
23.09.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
14.11.2017Communication of intention to grant the patent
26.03.2018Fee for grant paid
26.03.2018Fee for publishing/printing paid
26.03.2018Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  14.11.2017
Opposition(s)05.02.2019No opposition filed within time limit [2019/15]
Fees paidRenewal fee
10.06.2015Renewal fee patent year 03
10.06.2016Renewal fee patent year 04
16.06.2017Renewal fee patent year 05
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT02.05.2018
CZ02.05.2018
DK02.05.2018
EE02.05.2018
FI02.05.2018
HR02.05.2018
LT02.05.2018
LV02.05.2018
MC02.05.2018
NL02.05.2018
PL02.05.2018
RO02.05.2018
RS02.05.2018
SE02.05.2018
SI02.05.2018
SK02.05.2018
SM02.05.2018
LU20.06.2018
BE30.06.2018
BG02.08.2018
NO02.08.2018
GR03.08.2018
[2019/26]
Former [2019/24]AT02.05.2018
CZ02.05.2018
DK02.05.2018
EE02.05.2018
FI02.05.2018
HR02.05.2018
LT02.05.2018
LV02.05.2018
MC02.05.2018
NL02.05.2018
PL02.05.2018
RO02.05.2018
RS02.05.2018
SE02.05.2018
SK02.05.2018
SM02.05.2018
LU20.06.2018
BE30.06.2018
BG02.08.2018
NO02.08.2018
GR03.08.2018
Former [2019/17]AT02.05.2018
CZ02.05.2018
DK02.05.2018
EE02.05.2018
FI02.05.2018
HR02.05.2018
LT02.05.2018
LV02.05.2018
MC02.05.2018
NL02.05.2018
PL02.05.2018
RO02.05.2018
RS02.05.2018
SE02.05.2018
SK02.05.2018
SM02.05.2018
LU20.06.2018
BG02.08.2018
NO02.08.2018
GR03.08.2018
Former [2019/15]AT02.05.2018
CZ02.05.2018
DK02.05.2018
EE02.05.2018
FI02.05.2018
HR02.05.2018
LT02.05.2018
LV02.05.2018
MC02.05.2018
NL02.05.2018
PL02.05.2018
RO02.05.2018
RS02.05.2018
SE02.05.2018
SK02.05.2018
SM02.05.2018
BG02.08.2018
NO02.08.2018
GR03.08.2018
Former [2019/11]AT02.05.2018
CZ02.05.2018
DK02.05.2018
EE02.05.2018
FI02.05.2018
HR02.05.2018
LT02.05.2018
LV02.05.2018
NL02.05.2018
PL02.05.2018
RO02.05.2018
RS02.05.2018
SE02.05.2018
SK02.05.2018
SM02.05.2018
BG02.08.2018
NO02.08.2018
GR03.08.2018
Former [2019/10]AT02.05.2018
CZ02.05.2018
DK02.05.2018
EE02.05.2018
FI02.05.2018
HR02.05.2018
LT02.05.2018
LV02.05.2018
NL02.05.2018
PL02.05.2018
RO02.05.2018
RS02.05.2018
SE02.05.2018
SK02.05.2018
BG02.08.2018
NO02.08.2018
GR03.08.2018
Former [2019/09]DK02.05.2018
EE02.05.2018
FI02.05.2018
HR02.05.2018
LT02.05.2018
LV02.05.2018
NL02.05.2018
RS02.05.2018
SE02.05.2018
BG02.08.2018
NO02.08.2018
GR03.08.2018
Former [2019/08]DK02.05.2018
FI02.05.2018
HR02.05.2018
LT02.05.2018
LV02.05.2018
NL02.05.2018
RS02.05.2018
SE02.05.2018
BG02.08.2018
NO02.08.2018
GR03.08.2018
Former [2018/52]FI02.05.2018
HR02.05.2018
LT02.05.2018
LV02.05.2018
NL02.05.2018
RS02.05.2018
SE02.05.2018
BG02.08.2018
NO02.08.2018
GR03.08.2018
Former [2018/51]FI02.05.2018
HR02.05.2018
LT02.05.2018
LV02.05.2018
RS02.05.2018
SE02.05.2018
BG02.08.2018
NO02.08.2018
Former [2018/50]FI02.05.2018
HR02.05.2018
LT02.05.2018
SE02.05.2018
BG02.08.2018
NO02.08.2018
Former [2018/49]FI02.05.2018
LT02.05.2018
SE02.05.2018
BG02.08.2018
NO02.08.2018
Former [2018/47]FI02.05.2018
LT02.05.2018
NO02.08.2018
Cited inInternational search[A]US2006173546  (BERELSMAN BRIAN K [US] ET AL) [A] 1-24 * figures 1,1a,4,36,38 *;
 [A]US2010222887  (KATRANA NICHOLAS J [US] ET AL) [A] 1-24 * figures 42,44 *;
 [A]US2003144739  (HUENE DONALD R [US]) [A] 1-24 * figures 3,4,5 *;
 [A]US2011153024  (WAGNER TERRY W [US] ET AL) [A] 1-24 * figures 1,2,3,5 *;
 [A]WO2011060430  (NEW YORK SOC FOR THE RUPTURED AND CRIPPLED MAINTAINING THE HOSPITAL FO) [A] 1-24 * figures 2,7 *