Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2870514

EP2870514 - SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR DETECTING AND FURTHER PROCESSING THE POSITION OF AT LEAST ONE STORAGE SPACE DEVICE MOVING BULK MATERIAL [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  13.01.2017
Database last updated on 09.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip13.01.2017Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 15.02.2017  [2017/07]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
ABB AG
Kallstadter Strasse 1
68309 Mannheim / DE
For all designated states
Mitteldeutsche Braunkohlengesellschaft MbH
Glück-Auf-Strasse 1
06711 Zeitz / DE
[2015/20]
Inventor(s)01 / GRALOW, Bernd
Ziegelstrasse 37
03149 Forst / DE
02 / HOLZBECHER, Klaus
Sergener Strasse 3
03419 Wiesengrund / DE
03 / MÜLLER, Dietmar
Goethestrasse 6
04552 Boma / DE
 [2015/20]
Representative(s)Marks, Frank , et al
ABB AG
GF-IP
Wallstadter Strasse 59
68526 Ladenburg / DE
[N/P]
Former [2015/20]Eickmeyer, Dietmar
ABB AG
GF-IP
Wallstadter Straße 59
68526 Ladenburg / DE
Application number, filing date13734660.702.07.2013
WO2013EP01924
Priority number, dateDE2012101328205.07.2012         Original published format: DE102012013282
[2015/20]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO2014005692
Date:09.01.2014
Language:DE
[2014/02]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP2870514
Date:13.05.2015
Language:DE
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.01.2014
[2015/20]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP04.09.2014
ClassificationInternational:G01S13/93, G05D1/02, E21C47/02, B65G65/00
[2016/14]
Former International [2015/20]G05D1/02, G01D1/16, E21C47/02, B66C9/16
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2015/20]
TitleGerman:SYSTEM UND VERFAHREN ZUR ERFASSUNG UND WEITERVERARBEITUNG DER LAGE MINDESTENS EINES SCHÜTTGUT BEWEGENDEN LAGERPLATZGERÄTES[2015/20]
English:SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR DETECTING AND FURTHER PROCESSING THE POSITION OF AT LEAST ONE STORAGE SPACE DEVICE MOVING BULK MATERIAL[2015/20]
French:SYSTÈME ET PROCÉDÉ DE DÉTECTION ET DE MODIFICATION ULTÉRIEURE DE LA POSITION D'AU MOINS UN APPAREIL D'ENTREPOSAGE DÉPLAÇANT UN PRODUIT EN VRAC[2015/20]
Entry into regional phase09.12.2014National basic fee paid 
09.12.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
09.12.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure09.12.2014Examination requested  [2015/20]
13.04.2016Communication of intention to grant the patent
24.08.2016Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2017/07]
27.09.2016Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time  [2017/07]
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  13.04.2016
Fees paidRenewal fee
23.07.2015Renewal fee patent year 03
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.07.201604   M06   Not yet paid
Cited inInternational search[A]DE2528293  (KRUPP GMBH) [A] 1-14 * page 1, paragraph 2 - page 13, paragraph 1; figures 1,4,7,9 *;
 [A]DE10024039  (NOELL CRANE SYS GMBH [DE]) [A] 1,8 * the whole document *;
 [A]WO0157553  (IDM GMBH INFRAROT SENSOREN [DE]; TIEDECKE JOACHIM [DE]; VISSCHER EGBER) [A] 1-14 * page 1, paragraph 2 - page 12, paragraph 2; figures 1-3 *;
 [A]JP2002362709  (MURATA MACHINERY LTD) [A] 1,8 * paragraphs [0011] - [0017] *;
 [A]EP0490012  (BUEHNE WERNER ABUS KG [DE] ABUS KRANSYSTEME GMBH & CO KG [DE]) [A] 1,8 * paragraphs [0003] - [0013]; figure 1 *;
 [A]DE2841269  (NEUMANN ELEKTRONIK GMBH) [A] 2-4,11-14 * the whole document *
by applicant   - SERGIY A. KAVERYNSKYY, ZUSTANDSORIENTIERTE INSTANDHALTUNG UND TELESERVICE FüR SCHüTTGUT-MATERIALFLUSSSYSTEME