Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2877114

EP2877114 - METHOD FOR THE ILLUMINATION OF AN ILLUMINATION AREA AND ILLUMINATION DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2015/23]METHOD FOR IMPROVING THE ILLUMINATION OF A ILLUMINATION AREA
[2019/14]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  26.07.2019
Database last updated on 09.12.2019
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  08.05.2019
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  24.08.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip26.07.2019(Expected) grantpublished on 28.08.2019  [2019/35]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Drägerwerk AG & Co. KGaA
Moislinger Allee 53-55
23558 Lübeck / DE
[2015/49]
Former [2015/23]For all designated states
Dräger Medical GmbH
Moislinger Allee 53 - 55
23558 Lübeck / DE
Inventor(s)01 / SATTLER, Frank
Damaschkestraße 2-4
23560 Lübeck / DE
02 / FORNASIERO, Livio
Nelkenweg 4a
23847 Bliestorf / DE
03 / STARK, Hartmut
Schlesische Straße 7
23617 Stockelsdorf / DE
 [2015/23]
Representative(s)Mildner, Volker
Drägerwerk AG & Co. KGaA
Moislinger Allee 53-55
23558 Lübeck / DE
[2019/35]
Former [2015/23]Schmütz, Christian Klaus Johannes
Drägerwerk AG & Co. KGaA
Moislinger Allee 53-55
23558 Lübeck / DE
Application number, filing date13734760.508.07.2013
[2019/35]
WO2013EP64357
Priority number, dateDE2012101471625.07.2012         Original published format: DE102012014716
[2015/23]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2014016104
Date:30.01.2014
Language:DE
[2014/05]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2877114
Date:03.06.2015
Language:DE
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.01.2014
[2015/23]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2877114
Date:28.08.2019
Language:DE
[2019/35]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP30.01.2014
ClassificationInternational:A61B90/30, H05B37/02, // G01J1/32
[2019/14]
Former International [2015/23]A61B19/00, G01J1/00, H05B37/02
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2015/23]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZUR AUSLEUCHTUNG EINES AUSLEUCHTBEREICHS UND AUSLEUCHTVORRICHTUNG[2019/14]
English:METHOD FOR THE ILLUMINATION OF AN ILLUMINATION AREA AND ILLUMINATION DEVICE[2019/14]
French:PROCÉDÉ POUR L'ÉCLAIRAGE D'UNE ZONE ÉCLAIRÉE ET DISPOSITIF D'ÉCLAIRAGE[2019/14]
Former [2015/23]VERFAHREN ZUR VERBESSERUNG DER AUSLEUCHTUNG EINES AUSLEUCHTBEREICHS
Former [2015/23]METHOD FOR IMPROVING THE ILLUMINATION OF A ILLUMINATION AREA
Former [2015/23]PROCÉDÉ POUR AMÉLIORER L'ÉCLAIRAGE D'UNE ZONE ÉCLAIRÉE
Entry into regional phase04.02.2015National basic fee paid 
04.02.2015Designation fee(s) paid 
04.02.2015Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure04.02.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
04.02.2015Examination requested  [2015/23]
28.08.2018Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
02.10.2018Reply to a communication from the examining division
09.05.2019Communication of intention to grant the patent
12.06.2019Fee for grant paid
12.06.2019Fee for publishing/printing paid
12.06.2019Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  28.08.2018
Fees paidRenewal fee
30.07.2015Renewal fee patent year 03
28.07.2016Renewal fee patent year 04
27.07.2017Renewal fee patent year 05
30.07.2018Renewal fee patent year 06
22.07.2019Renewal fee patent year 07
Cited inInternational search[XDI]US2004129860  (THIBAUD PHILIPPE [FR], et al) [XD] 1,2,4-7,10-12,14,15 * paragraph [0045] - paragraph [0064]; figure 1 * [I] 8,9;
 [XDI]US2009261759  (FORNASIERO LIVIO [DE]) [XD] 1,2,4-7,10-12,14,15 * the whole document * [I] 8,9;
 [XI]US2005219167  (HATTORI REIJI [JP], et al) [X] 1-3,6,7 * paragraph [0032] - paragraph [0038]; figures 1-6 * * paragraph [0006] - paragraph [0007] * [I] 8;
 [X]DE4122531  (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [X] 10,12,13 * the whole document *
ExaminationUS2003185009
by applicantDE102008019191
 EP1433998