Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2852456

EP2852456 - REACTOR SYSTEM AND PROCESS FOR WOOD MODIFICATION [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  11.08.2017
Database last updated on 19.07.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip29.04.2019New entry: Renewal fee paid 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Titan Wood Limited
Brettenham House
19 Lancaster Place
London
WC2E 7EN / GB
[2016/41]
Former [2015/14]For all designated states
Titan Wood Limited
Royal Albert House
Sheet Street
Windsor SL4 1BE / GB
Inventor(s)01 / POL, Bernardus Jozef Maria
c/o Brettenham House
19 Lancaster Place
London WC2E 7EN / GB
02 / BUSSEMAKER, Paul
c/o Brettenham House
19 Lancaster Place
London WC2E 7EN / GB
03 / KAPPEN, Theodorus Gerardus Marinus Maria
c/o Brettenham House
19 Lancaster Place
London WC2E 7EN / GB
04 / RADEMAKERS, Karlijn
c/o Brettenham House
19 Lancaster Place
London WC2E 7EN / GB
[N/P]
Former [2015/14]01 / POL, Bernardus Jozef Maria
Beatrixstraat 5
NL-6824 LN Arnhem / NL
02 / BUSSEMAKER, Paul
De Horst 39
NL-6902 BC Zevenaar / NL
03 / KAPPEN, Theodorus Gerardus Marinus Maria
De-Quayborch 6
NL-5241 HN Rosmalen / NL
04 / RADEMAKERS, Karlijn
Zutphensestraatweg 40
6881WS Velp / NL
Representative(s)V.O.
P.O. Box 87930
2508 DH Den Haag / NL
[N/P]
Former [2015/14]Jansen, Cornelis Marinus , et al
V.O.
Johan de Wittlaan 7
2517 JR Den Haag / NL
Application number, filing date13734851.222.05.2013
WO2013IB54244
Priority number, dateEP2012016897322.05.2012         Original published format: EP 12168973
[2015/14]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013175420
Date:28.11.2013
Language:EN
[2013/48]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2852456
Date:01.04.2015
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.11.2013
[2015/14]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP28.11.2013
ClassificationInternational:B01J16/00, B01J19/18, B01J19/32, C08H8/00
[2015/14]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2015/14]
TitleGerman:REAKTORSYSTEM UND VERFAHREN ZUR HOLZMODIFIZIERUNG[2015/14]
English:REACTOR SYSTEM AND PROCESS FOR WOOD MODIFICATION[2015/14]
French:PROCÉDÉ ET SYSTÈME DE RÉACTEUR DESTINÉS À LA MODIFICATION DU BOIS[2015/14]
Entry into regional phase22.12.2014National basic fee paid 
22.12.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
22.12.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure22.12.2014Examination requested  [2015/14]
22.07.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
14.08.2017Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
22.12.2017Reply to a communication from the examining division
14.10.2019Date of oral proceedings
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  14.08.2017
Fees paidRenewal fee
12.05.2015Renewal fee patent year 03
10.05.2016Renewal fee patent year 04
26.04.2017Renewal fee patent year 05
24.04.2018Renewal fee patent year 06
23.04.2019Renewal fee patent year 07
Cited inInternational search[ID]WO2009095687  (TITAN WOOD LTD [GB], et al) [ID] 1-15 * examples 1, 2 *;
 [XI]US4640963  (KREIDER DAVID R [US], et al) [X] 1,3-6 * figure 1 * [I] 2,7,8
by applicantWO2009095687
 US5525721