Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2875550

EP2875550 - ELECTRIC CONTACT DEVICE FOR CONTACTING AN ELECTRIC CONDUCTOR [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  09.08.2019
Database last updated on 07.12.2019
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  20.05.2019
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  05.01.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip09.08.2019(Expected) grantpublished on 11.09.2019  [2019/37]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Weidmüller Interface GmbH & Co. KG
Klingenbergstrasse 26
32758 Detmold / DE
[2019/35]
Former [2015/22]For all designated states
Weidmüller Interface GmbH & Co. KG
Klingenbergstrasse 16
32758 Detmold / DE
Inventor(s)01 / STJEPANOVIC, Karlo
Libellenweg 12
33609 Bielefeld / DE
02 / CLASSEN, Constantin
Peckenweg 7
32758 Detmold / DE
03 / ZIEMKE, Jürgen
Bollweg 2a
32760 Detmold / DE
 [2019/37]
Former [2015/22]01 / STJEPANOVIC, Karlo
Hofstr. 45
33607 Bielefeld / DE
02 / CLASSEN, Constantin
Peckenweg 7
32758 Detmold / DE
03 / ZIEMKE, Jürgen
Bollweg 2a
32760 Detmold / DE
Representative(s)Specht, Peter , et al
Loesenbeck - Specht - Dantz
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte
Am Zwinger 2
33602 Bielefeld / DE
[2015/22]
Application number, filing date13735020.309.07.2013
[2019/37]
WO2013EP64514
Priority number, dateDE201220102732U20.07.2012         Original published format: DE 202012102732 U
[2015/22]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2014012822
Date:23.01.2014
Language:DE
[2014/04]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2875550
Date:27.05.2015
Language:DE
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.01.2014
[2015/22]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2875550
Date:11.09.2019
Language:DE
[2019/37]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP23.01.2014
ClassificationInternational:H01R4/48
[2015/22]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2015/22]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:ELEKTRISCHE KONTAKTEINRICHTUNG ZUR KONTAKTIERUNG EINES ELEKTRISCHEN LEITERS[2015/22]
English:ELECTRIC CONTACT DEVICE FOR CONTACTING AN ELECTRIC CONDUCTOR[2015/22]
French:DISPOSITIF DE CONTACT ÉLECTRIQUE POUR LA MISE EN CONTACT ÉLECTRIQUE D'UN CONDUCTEUR ÉLECTRIQUE[2015/22]
Entry into regional phase10.12.2014National basic fee paid 
10.12.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
10.12.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure10.12.2014Examination requested  [2015/22]
25.08.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
08.01.2018Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
11.07.2018Reply to a communication from the examining division
21.05.2019Communication of intention to grant the patent
01.08.2019Fee for grant paid
01.08.2019Fee for publishing/printing paid
01.08.2019Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  08.01.2018
Fees paidRenewal fee
14.07.2015Renewal fee patent year 03
12.07.2016Renewal fee patent year 04
27.07.2017Renewal fee patent year 05
23.07.2018Renewal fee patent year 06
03.07.2019Renewal fee patent year 07
Cited inInternational search[XYI]DE202011100357U  (WU SHANG TSAI [TW]) [X] 1,2,7-10 * figure 3 * * paragraph [0018] - paragraph [0022] * * paragraph [0028] * [Y] 5,6 [I] 3,4;
 [XYI]WO2008095453  (SIEMENS AG [DE]; BODENMEIER MARTIN [DE]; HELDMANN BERTHOLD [DE]; LUEFT) [X] 1,2,7-10 * claims 1-4 * * figure 2 * * page 9, line 18 - page 10, line 13 * [Y] 5,6 [I] 3,4;
 [XY]EP2280453  (WAGO VERWALTUNGS GMBH [DE]) [X] 1,2 * figures 3a, 8a * * paragraphs [0038] , [ 0050] - [0052] * [Y] 5,6;
 [XPI]DE202013001487U  (PHOENIX CONTACT GMBH & CO [DE]) [XP] 1,2,7-10 * figures 1-3 * * paragraph [0018] - paragraph [0023] * * paragraph [0027] - paragraph [0029] * [I] 3,4
ExaminationDE2624397
 DE1136393