Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2864251

EP2864251 - FLUX COMPOSITION USEFUL IN DIRECTIONAL SOLIDIFICATION FOR PURIFYING SILICON [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  11.05.2018
Database last updated on 15.07.2019
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  30.01.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip11.05.2018Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 13.06.2018  [2018/24]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Silicor Materials Inc.
1750 Lundy Avenue, Nº 610220
San Jose, CA 95161 / US
[2015/18]
Inventor(s)01 / ZHANG, Chunhui
5854 Dalebrook cres.
Mississauga, Ontario L5M 5R8 / CA
02 / TURENNE, Alain
141 Stirling Ave. North
Kitchener, Ontario N2H 3G9 / CA
03 / ALFRED, Christain
Unit B
1 Royal Gate Blvd.
Vaughan, Ontario L4L 8Z7 / CA
 [2015/18]
Representative(s)V.O.
P.O. Box 87930
2508 DH Den Haag / NL
[N/P]
Former [2015/18]Jansen, Cornelis Marinus , et al
V.O.
Johan de Wittlaan 7
2517 JR Den Haag / NL
Application number, filing date13735147.425.06.2013
WO2013US47511
Priority number, dateUS201261663887P25.06.2012         Original published format: US 201261663887 P
[2015/18]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2014004441
Date:03.01.2014
Language:EN
[2014/01]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2864251
Date:29.04.2015
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.01.2014
[2015/18]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP03.01.2014
ClassificationInternational:C01B33/037, C30B11/00, C30B29/06
[2015/18]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2015/18]
TitleGerman:FLUSSMITTELZUSAMMENSETZUNG FÜR GERICHTETE ERSTARRUNG ZUR SILICIUMREINIGUNG[2015/18]
English:FLUX COMPOSITION USEFUL IN DIRECTIONAL SOLIDIFICATION FOR PURIFYING SILICON[2015/18]
French:COMPOSITION DE FLUX UTILE DANS LA SOLIDIFICATION DIRECTIONNELLE POUR PURIFIER LE SILICIUM[2015/18]
Entry into regional phase13.01.2015National basic fee paid 
13.01.2015Designation fee(s) paid 
13.01.2015Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure13.01.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
13.01.2015Examination requested  [2015/18]
03.01.2018Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2018/24]
31.01.2018Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time  [2018/24]
Fees paidRenewal fee
29.06.2015Renewal fee patent year 03
27.06.2016Renewal fee patent year 04
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.06.201705   M06   Not yet paid
Cited inInternational searchCN102001662  [ ] (YUNNAN QIANYUAN LIGHT INDUSTRY CO LTD);
 [Y]JPH0437602  ;
 [Y]WO9910275  (CRYSTAL SYST [US], et al) [Y] 27,29-39,43 * claim 20 * * page 3, line 18 - line 20 * * page 5, line 30 - page 6, line 13 *;
 CN102134076  [ ] (YUNNAN QIANYUAN LIGHT ENERGY INDUSTRY CO LTD);
 [XA]CN1199099  ;
 [X]US4039326  (MOSCHINI AUGUSTO) [X] 1,5 * the whole document *;
 [I]US2007297968  (FUKUYAMA TOSHIAKI [JP]) [I] 1-4,6,9 * paragraphs [0001] , [0016] , [0042] , [0066] , [0 68] - [0081] - [0129] *;
 [I]CN101905885  (GUIYANG BAOYUAN YANGGUANG SILICON INDUSTRY CO LTD) [I] 1-4,6,9 * the whole document *;
 [A]WO8902415  (KEMANORD IND AB [SE]) [A] 1-9 * claims 1-9 * * page 2, line 8 - page 3, line 27 *;
 [A]EP1724238  (NIPPON STEEL CORP [JP]) [A] 1-9 * claims 1-16 *
 [XYI]  - LI, BAIYU ET AL, "Comprehensive method for removing boron, phosphorus and other impurities from industrial silicon by hydrometallurgy, oxidative slagging, and electron beam melting to obtain solar-grade polysilicon", CA, CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS SERVICE, COLUMBUS, OHIO, US, (20110505), Database accession no. 154:463017, URL: STN, XP002715107 [X] 1-6,9,10,14,16,19,21-26 * abstract * [Y] 7,8,27,29-39,43 [I] 11-13,15,17,18,20,28,31,40-42
 [Y]  - DATABASE WPI, 0, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 1992, no. 12, Database accession no. 1992-093648, XP002715242 & JPH0437602 A 19920207 (KAWASAKI STEEL CORP) [Y] 7,8 * abstract *
 [XA]  - ZHANG, JIXIANG ET AL, "Chemical method for removing boron impurity from metallurgical silicon", CA, CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS SERVICE, COLUMBUS, OHIO, US, (20110818), Database accession no. 155:245203, URL: STN, XP002715105 [X] 1,2,6,9,10,14,16,19,22-26 * abstract * [A] 3,4
 [XA]  - DATABASE WPI, 0, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 1999, no. 14, Database accession no. 1999-154471, XP002715104 & CN1199099 A 19981118 (BAOSHAN IRON & STEEL GROUP CORP) [X] 1-5 * abstract * [A] 6