Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2802278

EP2802278 - CRYOGENIC PROBE FILTRATION SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  13.10.2017
Database last updated on 24.01.2020
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  04.11.2016
Most recent event   Tooltip15.11.2019Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): MK
published on 18.12.2019  [2019/51]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Myoscience, Inc.
1600 Seaport Blvd., Suite 450
Redwood City, CA 94063 / US
[2014/47]
Inventor(s)01 / FOURKAS, Michael
862 Quetta Avenue
Sunnyvale, California 94087 / US
02 / RYBA, Eric
1600 Seaport Boulevard
Suite 450
Redwood City, California 94063 / US
03 / ROSEN, Jesse
1600 Seaport Boulevard
Suite 450
Redwood City, California 94063 / US
04 / GOVENJI, Punit
27765 Lupine Road
Los Altos Hills, California 94022 / US
 [2014/47]
Representative(s)Clark, Jane Anne , et al
Mathys & Squire LLP The Shard
32 London Bridge Street
London SE1 9SG / GB
[2014/47]
Application number, filing date13735586.314.01.2013
[2016/49]
WO2013US21492
Priority number, dateUS201261586698P13.01.2012         Original published format: US 201261586698 P
[2014/47]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013106860
Date:18.07.2013
Language:EN
[2013/29]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2802278
Date:19.11.2014
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.07.2013
[2014/47]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2802278
Date:07.12.2016
Language:EN
[2016/49]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:KR18.07.2013
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP09.07.2015
ClassificationInternational:A61B18/02, A61B17/34, A61M5/31, // A61B17/00
[2015/33]
Former International [2014/47]A61B18/02, A61B17/34
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/47]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:FILTERUNGSSYSTEM FÜR KRYOGENE SONDEN[2014/47]
English:CRYOGENIC PROBE FILTRATION SYSTEM[2014/47]
French:SYSTÈME DE FILTRATION DE SONDE CRYOGÉNIQUE[2014/47]
Entry into regional phase31.07.2014National basic fee paid 
31.07.2014Search fee paid 
31.07.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
31.07.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure31.07.2014Examination requested  [2014/47]
04.02.2016Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
05.07.2016Communication of intention to grant the patent
25.10.2016Fee for grant paid
25.10.2016Fee for publishing/printing paid
25.10.2016Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  05.07.2016
Opposition(s)08.09.2017No opposition filed within time limit [2017/46]
Fees paidRenewal fee
13.01.2015Renewal fee patent year 03
11.01.2016Renewal fee patent year 04
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU14.01.2013
AT07.12.2016
BE07.12.2016
CY07.12.2016
CZ07.12.2016
DK07.12.2016
EE07.12.2016
ES07.12.2016
FI07.12.2016
HR07.12.2016
IT07.12.2016
LT07.12.2016
LV07.12.2016
MC07.12.2016
MK07.12.2016
NL07.12.2016
PL07.12.2016
RO07.12.2016
RS07.12.2016
SE07.12.2016
SI07.12.2016
SK07.12.2016
SM07.12.2016
IE14.01.2017
LU14.01.2017
MT14.01.2017
CH31.01.2017
LI31.01.2017
FR07.02.2017
BG07.03.2017
NO07.03.2017
GR08.03.2017
IS07.04.2017
PT07.04.2017
[2019/51]
Former [2019/47]HU14.01.2013
AT07.12.2016
BE07.12.2016
CY07.12.2016
CZ07.12.2016
DK07.12.2016
EE07.12.2016
ES07.12.2016
FI07.12.2016
HR07.12.2016
IT07.12.2016
LT07.12.2016
LV07.12.2016
MC07.12.2016
NL07.12.2016
PL07.12.2016
RO07.12.2016
RS07.12.2016
SE07.12.2016
SI07.12.2016
SK07.12.2016
SM07.12.2016
IE14.01.2017
LU14.01.2017
MT14.01.2017
CH31.01.2017
LI31.01.2017
FR07.02.2017
BG07.03.2017
NO07.03.2017
GR08.03.2017
IS07.04.2017
PT07.04.2017
Former [2019/31]HU14.01.2013
AT07.12.2016
BE07.12.2016
CZ07.12.2016
DK07.12.2016
EE07.12.2016
ES07.12.2016
FI07.12.2016
HR07.12.2016
IT07.12.2016
LT07.12.2016
LV07.12.2016
MC07.12.2016
NL07.12.2016
PL07.12.2016
RO07.12.2016
RS07.12.2016
SE07.12.2016
SI07.12.2016
SK07.12.2016
SM07.12.2016
IE14.01.2017
LU14.01.2017
MT14.01.2017
CH31.01.2017
LI31.01.2017
FR07.02.2017
BG07.03.2017
NO07.03.2017
GR08.03.2017
IS07.04.2017
PT07.04.2017
Former [2018/43]AT07.12.2016
BE07.12.2016
CZ07.12.2016
DK07.12.2016
EE07.12.2016
ES07.12.2016
FI07.12.2016
HR07.12.2016
IT07.12.2016
LT07.12.2016
LV07.12.2016
MC07.12.2016
NL07.12.2016
PL07.12.2016
RO07.12.2016
RS07.12.2016
SE07.12.2016
SI07.12.2016
SK07.12.2016
SM07.12.2016
IE14.01.2017
LU14.01.2017
MT14.01.2017
CH31.01.2017
LI31.01.2017
FR07.02.2017
BG07.03.2017
NO07.03.2017
GR08.03.2017
IS07.04.2017
PT07.04.2017
Former [2018/28]AT07.12.2016
BE07.12.2016
CZ07.12.2016
DK07.12.2016
EE07.12.2016
ES07.12.2016
FI07.12.2016
HR07.12.2016
IT07.12.2016
LT07.12.2016
LV07.12.2016
MC07.12.2016
NL07.12.2016
PL07.12.2016
RO07.12.2016
RS07.12.2016
SE07.12.2016
SI07.12.2016
SK07.12.2016
SM07.12.2016
IE14.01.2017
LU14.01.2017
CH31.01.2017
LI31.01.2017
FR07.02.2017
BG07.03.2017
NO07.03.2017
GR08.03.2017
IS07.04.2017
PT07.04.2017
Former [2018/13]AT07.12.2016
BE07.12.2016
CZ07.12.2016
DK07.12.2016
EE07.12.2016
FI07.12.2016
HR07.12.2016
IT07.12.2016
LT07.12.2016
LV07.12.2016
MC07.12.2016
NL07.12.2016
PL07.12.2016
RO07.12.2016
RS07.12.2016
SE07.12.2016
SI07.12.2016
SK07.12.2016
SM07.12.2016
IE14.01.2017
LU14.01.2017
CH31.01.2017
LI31.01.2017
FR07.02.2017
BG07.03.2017
NO07.03.2017
GR08.03.2017
IS07.04.2017
PT07.04.2017
Former [2017/51]AT07.12.2016
BE07.12.2016
CZ07.12.2016
DK07.12.2016
EE07.12.2016
FI07.12.2016
HR07.12.2016
IT07.12.2016
LT07.12.2016
LV07.12.2016
MC07.12.2016
NL07.12.2016
PL07.12.2016
RO07.12.2016
RS07.12.2016
SE07.12.2016
SI07.12.2016
SK07.12.2016
SM07.12.2016
LU14.01.2017
CH31.01.2017
LI31.01.2017
FR07.02.2017
BG07.03.2017
NO07.03.2017
GR08.03.2017
IS07.04.2017
PT07.04.2017
Former [2017/50]AT07.12.2016
BE07.12.2016
CZ07.12.2016
DK07.12.2016
EE07.12.2016
FI07.12.2016
HR07.12.2016
IT07.12.2016
LT07.12.2016
LV07.12.2016
MC07.12.2016
NL07.12.2016
PL07.12.2016
RO07.12.2016
RS07.12.2016
SE07.12.2016
SI07.12.2016
SK07.12.2016
SM07.12.2016
CH31.01.2017
LI31.01.2017
FR07.02.2017
BG07.03.2017
NO07.03.2017
GR08.03.2017
IS07.04.2017
PT07.04.2017
Former [2017/42]AT07.12.2016
BE07.12.2016
CZ07.12.2016
EE07.12.2016
FI07.12.2016
HR07.12.2016
IT07.12.2016
LT07.12.2016
LV07.12.2016
MC07.12.2016
NL07.12.2016
PL07.12.2016
RO07.12.2016
RS07.12.2016
SE07.12.2016
SK07.12.2016
SM07.12.2016
BG07.03.2017
NO07.03.2017
GR08.03.2017
IS07.04.2017
PT07.04.2017
Former [2017/41]AT07.12.2016
BE07.12.2016
CZ07.12.2016
EE07.12.2016
FI07.12.2016
HR07.12.2016
IT07.12.2016
LT07.12.2016
LV07.12.2016
NL07.12.2016
PL07.12.2016
RO07.12.2016
RS07.12.2016
SE07.12.2016
SK07.12.2016
SM07.12.2016
BG07.03.2017
NO07.03.2017
GR08.03.2017
IS07.04.2017
PT07.04.2017
Former [2017/36]BE07.12.2016
CZ07.12.2016
EE07.12.2016
FI07.12.2016
HR07.12.2016
LT07.12.2016
LV07.12.2016
NL07.12.2016
PL07.12.2016
RO07.12.2016
RS07.12.2016
SE07.12.2016
SK07.12.2016
NO07.03.2017
GR08.03.2017
IS07.04.2017
Former [2017/34]CZ07.12.2016
FI07.12.2016
HR07.12.2016
LT07.12.2016
LV07.12.2016
NL07.12.2016
RS07.12.2016
SE07.12.2016
BE31.01.2017
NO07.03.2017
GR08.03.2017
Former [2017/31]FI07.12.2016
HR07.12.2016
LT07.12.2016
LV07.12.2016
NL07.12.2016
RS07.12.2016
SE07.12.2016
BE31.01.2017
NO07.03.2017
GR08.03.2017
Former [2017/28]FI07.12.2016
HR07.12.2016
LT07.12.2016
LV07.12.2016
RS07.12.2016
SE07.12.2016
BE31.01.2017
NO07.03.2017
GR08.03.2017
Former [2017/12]LV07.12.2016
Documents cited:Search[Y]WO2009065061  (MYOSCIENCE INC [US]; BURGER KEITH [US]; ELKINS LISA [US]; WILLIAMS RON) [Y] 1-15 * paragraphs [0033] - [0036] - [0044]; figures 1A,1B,3,4 *;
 [Y]US3786814  (ARMAO T) [Y] 1-15 * page 7, line 19 - line 46 *;
 [A]WO9817167  (CRYOGEN INC [US]) [A] 1-15 * page 6, line 5 - line 17 *;
 [A]US2011124114  (ERMANTRAUT EUGEN [DE] ET AL) [A] 9,14 * paragraph [0168] *
International search[A]WO2009065061  (MYOSCIENCE INC [US], et al);
 [A]WO2008079812  (MYOSCIENCE INC [US], et al);
 [A]WO2008101027  (MYOSCIENCE INC [US], et al);
 [A]US5281215  (MILDER FREDRIC L [US]);
 [A]US5275595  (DOBAK III JOHN D [US]);
 [A]US3951152  (CRANDELL WILLIAM H, et al);
 [A]US7998137  (ELKINS LISA [US], et al);
 [A]US3993075  (LISENBEE WAYNE F, et al)
by applicantUS7850683
 US2009248001
 US2008200910
 WO2010075438
 US2008154254
 WO2010075448
 US2007129714
 US2008183164
 US20080611160