Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2804547

EP2804547 - DEVICE FOR REMOVING OCCLUSIONS IN A BIOLOGICAL VESSEL [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2014/48]DEVICE AND METHOD FOR REMOVING OCCLUSIONS IN A BIOLOGICAL VESSEL
[2017/51]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  08.02.2019
Database last updated on 22.05.2019
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  02.03.2018
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  14.12.2017
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  05.07.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip15.02.2019Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): SM
published on 20.03.2019  [2019/12]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Triticum Ltd.
18 Vitkin Street
4726389 Ramat-HaSharon / IL
[2014/48]
Inventor(s)01 / BEN-AMI, Doron Jacob
18 Vitkin Street
4726389 Ramat-HaSharon / IL
 [2014/48]
Representative(s)Dennemeyer & Associates S.A.
Postfach 70 04 25
81304 München / DE
[2018/14]
Former [2014/48]Dennemeyer & Associates S.A.
Poccistrasse 11
80336 München / DE
Application number, filing date13735641.615.01.2013
[2018/14]
WO2013IL50049
Priority number, dateUS201261586792P15.01.2012         Original published format: US 201261586792 P
[2014/48]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO2013105099
Date:18.07.2013
Language:EN
[2013/29]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP2804547
Date:26.11.2014
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.07.2013
[2014/48]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2804547
Date:04.04.2018
Language:EN
[2018/14]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US10.10.2013
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP11.05.2015
ClassificationInternational:A61B17/22
[2014/48]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/48]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:VORRICHTUNG ZUR ENTFERNUNG VON OKKLUSIONEN IN EINEM BIOLOGISCHEN GEFÄSS[2017/51]
English:DEVICE FOR REMOVING OCCLUSIONS IN A BIOLOGICAL VESSEL[2017/51]
French:DISPOSITIF D'ÉLIMINATION D'OCCLUSIONS DANS UN VAISSEAU BIOLOGIQUE[2017/51]
Former [2014/48]VORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUR ENTFERNUNG VON OKKLUSIONEN IN EINEM BIOLOGISCHEN GEFÄSS
Former [2014/48]DEVICE AND METHOD FOR REMOVING OCCLUSIONS IN A BIOLOGICAL VESSEL
Former [2014/48]DISPOSITIF ET MÉTHODE D'ÉLIMINATION D'OCCLUSIONS DANS UN VAISSEAU BIOLOGIQUE
Entry into regional phase07.07.2014National basic fee paid 
07.07.2014Search fee paid 
07.07.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
07.07.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure07.07.2014Examination requested  [2014/48]
13.07.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
10.03.2016Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
05.04.2016Reply to a communication from the examining division
23.06.2017Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
14.07.2017Reply to a communication from the examining division
15.12.2017Communication of intention to grant the patent
20.02.2018Fee for grant paid
20.02.2018Fee for publishing/printing paid
20.02.2018Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  10.03.2016
Opposition(s)07.01.2019No opposition filed within time limit [2019/11]
Fees paidRenewal fee
23.01.2015Renewal fee patent year 03
27.01.2016Renewal fee patent year 04
20.01.2017Renewal fee patent year 05
26.01.2018Renewal fee patent year 06
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAL04.04.2018
AT04.04.2018
CZ04.04.2018
DK04.04.2018
EE04.04.2018
FI04.04.2018
HR04.04.2018
LT04.04.2018
LV04.04.2018
NL04.04.2018
PL04.04.2018
RO04.04.2018
RS04.04.2018
SE04.04.2018
SK04.04.2018
SM04.04.2018
BG04.07.2018
NO04.07.2018
GR05.07.2018
PT06.08.2018
[2019/11]
Former [2019/10]AL04.04.2018
AT04.04.2018
CZ04.04.2018
DK04.04.2018
EE04.04.2018
FI04.04.2018
HR04.04.2018
LT04.04.2018
LV04.04.2018
NL04.04.2018
PL04.04.2018
RO04.04.2018
RS04.04.2018
SE04.04.2018
SK04.04.2018
BG04.07.2018
NO04.07.2018
GR05.07.2018
PT06.08.2018
Former [2019/09]AL04.04.2018
DK04.04.2018
EE04.04.2018
FI04.04.2018
HR04.04.2018
LT04.04.2018
LV04.04.2018
NL04.04.2018
PL04.04.2018
RS04.04.2018
SE04.04.2018
BG04.07.2018
NO04.07.2018
GR05.07.2018
PT06.08.2018
Former [2019/08]AL04.04.2018
DK04.04.2018
FI04.04.2018
HR04.04.2018
LT04.04.2018
LV04.04.2018
NL04.04.2018
PL04.04.2018
RS04.04.2018
SE04.04.2018
BG04.07.2018
NO04.07.2018
GR05.07.2018
PT06.08.2018
Former [2019/03]AL04.04.2018
FI04.04.2018
HR04.04.2018
LT04.04.2018
LV04.04.2018
NL04.04.2018
PL04.04.2018
RS04.04.2018
SE04.04.2018
BG04.07.2018
NO04.07.2018
GR05.07.2018
PT06.08.2018
Former [2018/52]AL04.04.2018
FI04.04.2018
HR04.04.2018
LT04.04.2018
LV04.04.2018
NL04.04.2018
PL04.04.2018
RS04.04.2018
SE04.04.2018
BG04.07.2018
NO04.07.2018
GR05.07.2018
Former [2018/51]AL04.04.2018
FI04.04.2018
HR04.04.2018
LT04.04.2018
LV04.04.2018
NL04.04.2018
PL04.04.2018
RS04.04.2018
SE04.04.2018
BG04.07.2018
NO04.07.2018
Former [2018/50]AL04.04.2018
FI04.04.2018
HR04.04.2018
LT04.04.2018
NL04.04.2018
PL04.04.2018
SE04.04.2018
BG04.07.2018
NO04.07.2018
Former [2018/49]AL04.04.2018
FI04.04.2018
LT04.04.2018
NL04.04.2018
PL04.04.2018
SE04.04.2018
BG04.07.2018
NO04.07.2018
Former [2018/47]AL04.04.2018
FI04.04.2018
LT04.04.2018
NL04.04.2018
NO04.07.2018
Former [2018/46]AL04.04.2018
LT04.04.2018
NL04.04.2018
NO04.07.2018
Former [2018/43]NL04.04.2018
Documents cited:Search[XYI]US2007118165  (DEMELLO JONATHAN R [US], et al) [X] 1-3,5-8,10-12,15 * paragraphs [0075] - [0078]; figures 15-17 * [Y] 9 [I] 4,13,14;
 [Y]US6350271  (KURZ DANIEL R [US], et al) [Y] 9 * column 6, lines 34-63; figures 7,8,11,12 *;
 [A]US2006287667  (ABELA GEORGE S [US]) [A] 1-15 * paragraph [0085]; figures 1-6,11 *;
 [A]US2005216050  (SEPETKA IVAN [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * paragraphs [0013] , [0094] *;
 [A]WO2005102184  (ANGIOSLIDE LTD [IL], et al) [A] 1-15 * page 9, line 4; figure 8 *
International search[X]US2007118165  (DEMELLO JONATHAN R [US], et al);
 [Y]US5522825  (KROPF LAURENT [CH], et al);
 [Y]US8062307  (SEPETKA IVAN [US], et al);
 [Y]US2007066991  (MAGNUSON MARK A [US])
ExaminationUS2008167678
by applicantUS2008167678