Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2804433

EP2804433 - DOWNLINK CONTROL INFORMATION TRANSMISSION METHOD AND DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  26.10.2018
Database last updated on 16.10.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip11.03.2019New entry: Reply to examination report 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
ZTE Corporation
ZTE Plaza
Keji Road South
Hi-Tech Industrial Park
Nanshan District
Shenzhen, Guangdong 518057 / CN
[N/P]
Former [2014/47]For all designated states
ZTE Corporation
ZTE Plaza, Keji Road South Hi-Tech Industrial Park, Nanshan District
Shenzhen, Guangdong 518057 / CN
Inventor(s)01 / DAI, Bo
ZTE Plaza, Keji Road South
Hi-Tech Industrial Park
Nanshan District
Shenzhen Guangdong 518057 / CN
02 / LU, Kexue
ZTE Plaza, Keji Road South
Hi-Tech Industrial Park
Nanshan District
Shenzhen Guangdong 518057 / CN
03 / CHEN, Yijian
ZTE Plaza, Keji Road South
Hi-Tech Industrial Park
Nanshan District
Shenzhen Guangdong 518057 / CN
04 / GUO, Senbao
ZTE Plaza, Keji Road South
Hi-Tech Industrial Park
Nanshan District
Shenzhen Guangdong 518057 / CN
 [2014/47]
Representative(s)Brevalex
95, rue d'Amsterdam
75378 Paris Cedex 8 / FR
[2014/47]
Application number, filing date13735644.005.01.2013
WO2013CN70082
Priority number, dateCN2012100460409.01.2012         Original published format: CN201210004604
[2014/47]
Filing languageZH
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013104277
Date:18.07.2013
Language:ZH
[2013/29]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2804433
Date:19.11.2014
Language:EN
[2014/47]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:CN18.07.2013
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP12.05.2015
ClassificationInternational:H04W72/04, H04L5/00
[2015/24]
Former International [2014/47]H04W72/04
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/47]
TitleGerman:DOWNLINK-STEUERUNGSINFORMATIONSÜBERTRAGUNGSVERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG[2014/47]
English:DOWNLINK CONTROL INFORMATION TRANSMISSION METHOD AND DEVICE[2014/47]
French:DISPOSITIF ET PROCÉDÉ DE TRANSMISSION D'INFORMATIONS DE COMMANDE DE LIAISON DESCENDANTE[2014/47]
Entry into regional phase01.08.2014Translation filed 
01.08.2014National basic fee paid 
01.08.2014Search fee paid 
01.08.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
01.08.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure01.08.2014Examination requested  [2014/47]
03.12.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
05.11.2018Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
08.03.2019Reply to a communication from the examining division
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  05.11.2018
Fees paidRenewal fee
29.01.2015Renewal fee patent year 03
11.01.2016Renewal fee patent year 04
11.01.2017Renewal fee patent year 05
15.01.2018Renewal fee patent year 06
25.01.2019Renewal fee patent year 07
Documents cited:Search[A]EP2273817  (ZTE CORP [CN]) [A] 1-15 * paragraph [0004] - paragraph [0014] *
 [XI]  - RENESAS MOBILE EUROPE LTD, "Link-level evaluation of E-PDCCH design aspects", 3GPP DRAFT; R1-113175, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, (20111004), vol. RAN WG1, no. Zhuhai; 20111010, XP050538302 [X] 1,9 * the whole document * [I] 2-8,10-15
 [XI]  - MOTOROLA MOBILITY, "Initial analysis of EPDCCH link performance", 3GPP DRAFT; R1-114030 EPDCCH LINK PERFORMANCE FINAL, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, (20111121), vol. RAN WG1, no. San Francisco, USA; 20111114 - 20111118, XP050562453 [X] 1,9 * the whole document * [I] 2-8,10-15
International search[X]CN102256358  (ACADEMY OF TELECOMMUNICATION TECHNOLOGY);
 [A]CN101707511  (ZTE CORP.);
 [A]CN102082600  (ZTE CORP.)