Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2803266

EP2803266 - COMPOSITION FOR CONTROLLING PLANT DISEASE AND APPLICATION THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  01.07.2016
Database last updated on 12.10.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip01.07.2016Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 03.08.2016  [2016/31]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
SUMITOMO CHEMICAL COMPANY, LIMITED
Floor 18, Sumitomo Twin Buildings
27-1 Shinkawa 2-chome
Chuo-ku
Tokyo
104-8260 / JP
[2014/47]
Inventor(s)01 / MATSUZAKI, Yuichi
c/o SUMITOMO CHEMICAL COMPANY LIMITED
2-1 Takatsukasa 4-chome
Takarazuka-shi Hyogo 665-8555 / JP
 [2014/47]
Representative(s)Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB
Siebertstrasse 3
81675 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2014/47]Vossius & Partner
Siebertstrasse 4
81675 München / DE
Application number, filing date13735711.708.01.2013
WO2013JP50075
Priority number, dateJP2012000191510.01.2012         Original published format: JP 2012001915
[2014/47]
Filing languageJA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013105540
Date:18.07.2013
Language:JA
[2013/29]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2803266
Date:19.11.2014
Language:EN
[2014/47]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:JP18.07.2013
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP23.06.2015
ClassificationInternational:A01N43/58, A01N43/78, A01P3/00
[2014/47]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/47]
TitleGerman:ZUSAMMENSETZUNG ZUR BEKÄMPFUNG VON PFLANZENBEFALL UND ANWENDUNG DAVON[2014/47]
English:COMPOSITION FOR CONTROLLING PLANT DISEASE AND APPLICATION THEREOF[2014/47]
French:COMPOSITION POUR LUTTER CONTRE UNE MALADIE DE PLANTE ET APPLICATION DE CETTE COMPOSITION[2014/47]
Entry into regional phase01.08.2014Translation filed 
01.08.2014National basic fee paid 
01.08.2014Search fee paid 
01.08.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
01.08.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure01.08.2014Examination requested  [2014/47]
21.01.2016Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2016/31]
26.02.2016Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2016/31]
Fees paidRenewal fee
26.01.2015Renewal fee patent year 03
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.01.201604   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[I]EP2011397  (BAYER CROPSCIENCE AG [DE]) [I] 1-7 * paragraphs [0007] , [0 12] - [0013] - [0 29] , [0 61] , [0 69] *
International search[Y]WO2005121104  (SUMITOMO CHEMICAL CO., LTD.);
 [Y]WO2006001175  (SUMITOMO CHEMICAL CO., LTD.);
 [A]WO2008135413  (BASF SE);
 [AP]WO2012020772  (SUMITOMO CHEMICAL CO., LTD.);
 [AP]WO2012020774  (SUMITOMO CHEMICAL CO., LTD.);
 [AP]WO2012020776  (SUMITOMO CHEMICAL CO., LTD.);
 [AP]WO2012020778  (SUMITOMO CHEMICAL CO., LTD.)
 [Y]  - TOMLIN,C.D.S. ET AL., "316 - ETHABOXAM (FUNGICIDE)", THE PESTICIDE MANUAL, (2006), pages 401 - 402, XP008174437
by applicantWO2005121104
 WO2006001175
    - THE PESTICIDE MANUAL-14th EDITION, BCPC, ISBN 1901396142