Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2803043

EP2803043 - 3-D SURFACE-BASED WAVEFORM INVERSION [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  08.02.2019
Database last updated on 18.01.2020
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  02.03.2018
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  03.01.2018
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  28.11.2016
Most recent event   Tooltip30.08.2019Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): MC
published on 02.10.2019  [2019/40]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Geco Technology B.V.
Gevers Deynootweg 61
2586 BJ S'Gravenhage / NL
[2014/47]
Inventor(s)01 / HOBRO, James William Douglas
Schlumberger Gould Research
High Cross
Madingley Road
Cambridge Cambridgeshire CB3 0EL / GB
 [2014/47]
Representative(s)Schlumberger Intellectual Property Department
Parkstraat 83
2514 JG Den Haag / NL
[N/P]
Former [2018/14]Schlumberger Cambridge Research Limited
High Cross
Madingley Road
Cambridge CB3 0EL / GB
Former [2014/47]Ford, Michael Frederick
Schlumberger Cambridge Research Limited
High Cross
Madingley Road
Cambridge CB3 0EL / GB
Application number, filing date13735726.514.01.2013
[2018/14]
WO2013IB50330
Priority number, dateUS201261586326P13.01.2012         Original published format: US 201261586326 P
[2014/47]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013105074
Date:18.07.2013
Language:EN
[2013/29]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2803043
Date:19.11.2014
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.07.2013
[2014/47]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2803043
Date:04.04.2018
Language:EN
[2018/14]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:KR18.07.2013
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP12.11.2015
ClassificationInternational:G06T17/00
[2014/47]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/47]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:WELLENFORMINVERSION AUF BASIS VON 3D-OBERFLÄCHEN[2014/47]
English:3-D SURFACE-BASED WAVEFORM INVERSION[2014/47]
French:INVERSION DE FORME D'ONDE BASÉE SUR SURFACE 3D[2014/47]
Entry into regional phase23.06.2014National basic fee paid 
23.06.2014Search fee paid 
23.06.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
23.06.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure23.06.2014Examination requested  [2014/47]
23.11.2015Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
22.03.2016Reply to a communication from the examining division
08.08.2016Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
20.02.2017Reply to a communication from the examining division
04.01.2018Communication of intention to grant the patent
20.02.2018Fee for grant paid
20.02.2018Fee for publishing/printing paid
20.02.2018Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  23.11.2015
Opposition(s)07.01.2019No opposition filed within time limit [2019/11]
Fees paidRenewal fee
13.01.2015Renewal fee patent year 03
11.01.2016Renewal fee patent year 04
30.01.2017Renewal fee patent year 05
30.01.2018Renewal fee patent year 06
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAL04.04.2018
AT04.04.2018
CZ04.04.2018
DK04.04.2018
EE04.04.2018
ES04.04.2018
FI04.04.2018
HR04.04.2018
IT04.04.2018
LT04.04.2018
LV04.04.2018
MC04.04.2018
NL04.04.2018
PL04.04.2018
RO04.04.2018
RS04.04.2018
SE04.04.2018
SI04.04.2018
SK04.04.2018
SM04.04.2018
BG04.07.2018
GR05.07.2018
PT06.08.2018
[2019/40]
Former [2019/26]AL04.04.2018
AT04.04.2018
CZ04.04.2018
DK04.04.2018
EE04.04.2018
ES04.04.2018
FI04.04.2018
HR04.04.2018
IT04.04.2018
LT04.04.2018
LV04.04.2018
NL04.04.2018
PL04.04.2018
RO04.04.2018
RS04.04.2018
SE04.04.2018
SI04.04.2018
SK04.04.2018
SM04.04.2018
BG04.07.2018
GR05.07.2018
PT06.08.2018
Former [2019/11]AL04.04.2018
AT04.04.2018
CZ04.04.2018
DK04.04.2018
EE04.04.2018
ES04.04.2018
FI04.04.2018
HR04.04.2018
IT04.04.2018
LT04.04.2018
LV04.04.2018
NL04.04.2018
PL04.04.2018
RO04.04.2018
RS04.04.2018
SE04.04.2018
SK04.04.2018
SM04.04.2018
BG04.07.2018
GR05.07.2018
PT06.08.2018
Former [2019/10]AL04.04.2018
AT04.04.2018
CZ04.04.2018
DK04.04.2018
EE04.04.2018
ES04.04.2018
FI04.04.2018
HR04.04.2018
LT04.04.2018
LV04.04.2018
NL04.04.2018
PL04.04.2018
RO04.04.2018
RS04.04.2018
SE04.04.2018
SK04.04.2018
BG04.07.2018
GR05.07.2018
PT06.08.2018
Former [2019/09]AL04.04.2018
DK04.04.2018
EE04.04.2018
ES04.04.2018
FI04.04.2018
HR04.04.2018
LT04.04.2018
LV04.04.2018
NL04.04.2018
PL04.04.2018
RS04.04.2018
SE04.04.2018
BG04.07.2018
GR05.07.2018
PT06.08.2018
Former [2019/08]AL04.04.2018
DK04.04.2018
ES04.04.2018
FI04.04.2018
HR04.04.2018
LT04.04.2018
LV04.04.2018
NL04.04.2018
PL04.04.2018
RS04.04.2018
SE04.04.2018
BG04.07.2018
GR05.07.2018
PT06.08.2018
Former [2019/03]AL04.04.2018
ES04.04.2018
FI04.04.2018
HR04.04.2018
LT04.04.2018
LV04.04.2018
NL04.04.2018
PL04.04.2018
RS04.04.2018
SE04.04.2018
BG04.07.2018
GR05.07.2018
PT06.08.2018
Former [2018/52]AL04.04.2018
ES04.04.2018
FI04.04.2018
HR04.04.2018
LT04.04.2018
LV04.04.2018
NL04.04.2018
PL04.04.2018
RS04.04.2018
SE04.04.2018
BG04.07.2018
GR05.07.2018
Former [2018/51]AL04.04.2018
ES04.04.2018
FI04.04.2018
HR04.04.2018
LT04.04.2018
LV04.04.2018
NL04.04.2018
PL04.04.2018
RS04.04.2018
SE04.04.2018
BG04.07.2018
Former [2018/50]AL04.04.2018
ES04.04.2018
FI04.04.2018
HR04.04.2018
LT04.04.2018
NL04.04.2018
PL04.04.2018
SE04.04.2018
BG04.07.2018
Former [2018/49]AL04.04.2018
ES04.04.2018
FI04.04.2018
LT04.04.2018
NL04.04.2018
PL04.04.2018
SE04.04.2018
BG04.07.2018
Former [2018/47]AL04.04.2018
ES04.04.2018
FI04.04.2018
LT04.04.2018
NL04.04.2018
Former [2018/46]AL04.04.2018
LT04.04.2018
NL04.04.2018
Former [2018/43]NL04.04.2018
Documents cited:Search[Y]US2004201585  (SRIVASTAVA RAVI PRAKASH [US], et al) [Y] 3,13 * paragraph [0002] * * paragraph [0013] - paragraph [0016] * * paragraph [0024] - paragraph [0027] * * figures 5,20 *;
 [XA]US2011090760  (RICKETT JAMES [GB], et al) [X] 1,2 * paragraph [0026] - paragraph [0038]; figure 1 * [A] 3-15;
 [A]US2005143923  (KEERS HENK [GB], et al) [A] 3-8 * the whole document *
 [XY]  - VIGH D ET AL, "3D prestack plane-wave, full-waveform inversion", GEOPHYSICS, SOCIETY OF EXPLORATION GEOPHYSICISTS, US, (20080901), vol. 73, no. 5, sup, doi:10.1190/1.2952623, ISSN 0016-8033, pages VE135 - VE144, XP001516163 [X] 1,2,14,15 * page 136, column 2, line "Waveform Inversion" - page 137, column 2, paragraph 1 * [Y] 3,13

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1190/1.2952623
 [XA]  - CAREY BUNKS ET AL, "Multiscale seismic waveform inversion", GEOPHYSICS, US, (19950901), vol. 60, no. 5, doi:10.1190/1.1443880, ISSN 0016-8033, pages 1457 - 1473, XP055226224 [X] 1,2 * page 1459, line "Classic Seismic waveform Inversion" * [A] 3-15

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1190/1.1443880
 [XA]  - A. ABUBAKAR ET AL, "Three-dimensional seismic full-waveform inversion using the finite-difference contrast source inversion method", GEOPHYSICAL PROSPECTING, (20110322), doi:10.1111/j.1365-2478.2011.00953.x, ISSN 0016-8025, pages no - no, XP055225529 [X] 1,2 * page 875, column 2, line "Theory"; figures 1,2,3,4 * [A] 3-15

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1111/j.1365-2478.2011.00953.x
International search[A]US2011292761  (JIAO JUNRU [US], et al);
 [A]US2009083006  (MACKIE RANDALL [US]);
 [A]US2011131020  (MENG ZHAOBO [US]);
 [A]US6502037  (JORGENSEN GREGORY JOSEPH [US], et al);
 [A]US2009006053  (CARAZZONE JAMES J [US], et al)
by applicant   - VIGH D ET AL., "3D prestack plane-wave, full-waveform inversion", GEOPHYSICS, (2008), vol. 73, no. 5, doi:doi:10.1190/1.2952623, pages VE135 - VE144, XP001516163

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1190/1.2952623