blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP2803227 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP2803227



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 281
04.07.2018 Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period Search / examination 1
01.09.2017 Transmission of the certificate Search / examination 1
03.08.2017 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
20.07.2017 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 1
20.07.2017 French translation of claims Search / examination 2
20.07.2017 German translation of the claims Search / examination 2
27.03.2017 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 2
27.03.2017 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 5
27.03.2017 Intention to grant (signatures) Search / examination 1
27.03.2017 Text intended for grant Search / examination 18
27.03.2017 Text intended for grant (clean copy) Search / examination 18
25.01.2017 CDS Clean up - amended applicant details Search / examination 1
20.12.2016 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 3
20.12.2016 Amended description with annotations Search / examination 2
20.12.2016 Claims Search / examination 3
20.12.2016 Description Search / examination 2
20.12.2016 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 3
07.12.2016 Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address Search / examination 2
25.11.2016 Request for change of name - applicant Search / examination 1
12.08.2016 Annex to the communication Search / examination 3
12.08.2016 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
12.03.2016 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 3
12.03.2016 Amended description with annotations Search / examination 2
12.03.2016 Claims Search / examination 3
12.03.2016 Description Search / examination 2
12.03.2016 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 5
13.11.2015 Annex to the communication Search / examination 4
13.11.2015 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
10.11.2015 Examination started Search / examination 1
17.06.2015 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 3
17.06.2015 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 4
17.06.2015 Amended description filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 3
17.06.2015 Amended description with annotations Search / examination 4
17.06.2015 Amended drawings filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 2
17.06.2015 Amendments received before examination Search / examination 6
17.06.2015 Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure Search / examination 1
17.02.2015 CDS Clean up - amended applicant details Search / examination 1
12.12.2014 Invitation to declare maintenance of the application and to correct deficiencies in the Written Opinion/amend application Search / examination 1
25.11.2014 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
25.11.2014 European search opinion Search / examination 6
25.11.2014 Supplementary European search report Search / examination 2
17.11.2014 Search started Search / examination 1
22.10.2014 Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data Search / examination 1
22.08.2014 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
22.08.2014 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
22.08.2014 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
22.08.2014 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
22.08.2014 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
28.07.2014 Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability Search / examination 5
16.07.2014 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 2
16.07.2014 Abstract Search / examination 1
16.07.2014 Abstract Search / examination 1
16.07.2014 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 4
16.07.2014 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 5
16.07.2014 Amended description filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 11
16.07.2014 Amended description with annotations Search / examination 11
16.07.2014 Amended drawings filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 3
16.07.2014 Amended drawings with annotations Search / examination 3
16.07.2014 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 5
23.05.2014 Information on entry into European phase Search / examination 3
07.08.2013 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 19
07.08.2013 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 47
18.07.2013 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 2
18.07.2013 International publication of the A1 Pamphlet Search / examination 21