blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Patent family: EP2803227 Family dossiers alerts: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):  

CN201380004162 EP13735990



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated





TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CN104471987BGlobal Dossier 26.06.2018B
CN104471987 25.03.2015A
Priority number Date
WO2013CN70263 09.01.2013
US201261584584 09.01.2012
US201213626482 25.09.2012
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
EP2803227Global Dossier 30.08.2017B1
EP2803227 24.12.2014A4
EP2803227 19.11.2014A1
Priority number Date
WO2013CN70263 09.01.2013
US201261584584 09.01.2012
US201213626482 25.09.2012
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
WO2013104309Global Dossier 18.07.2013A1
Priority number Date
US201261584584 09.01.2012
US201213626482 25.09.2012
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
US9008062Global Dossier 14.04.2015B2
US2013177002 11.07.2013A1
Priority number Date
US201261584584 09.01.2012
US201213626482 25.09.2012