Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2803227

EP2803227 - METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR AP DISCOVERY WITH FILS BEACON [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2014/47]SYSTEMS AND METHODS FOR AP DISCOVERY WITH FILS BEACON
[2017/10]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  06.07.2018
Database last updated on 15.06.2019
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  28.07.2017
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  26.03.2017
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  03.01.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip25.01.2019Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): IE
published on 27.02.2019  [2019/09]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd.
Huawei Administration Building
Bantian
Longgang District
Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN
[2017/35]
Former [2017/02]For all designated states
Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd.
Huawei Administration Building
Bantian
Longgang District
Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN
Former [2014/47]For all designated states
Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd.
Huawei Administration Building
Bantian, Longgang
Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN
Inventor(s)01 / SUN, Sheng
28 Gray Cres
Kanata, Ontario K2K 3J6 / CA
02 / LI, Yunbo
Huawei Administration Building
Huawei Industrial
Shenzhen Guangdong 518129 / CN
03 / AU, Kwok, Shum
Flat 927
Ding Xiang Gong Yu
Wan Ke Cheng
Bantian, Longgang
Shenzhen Guangdong 518129 / CN
04 / ABOUL-MAGD, Osama
53 Stonemeadow Dr.
Kanata, Ontario K2M 2K2 / CA
05 / SUH, Junghoon
168 Streamside Cres
Kanata, Ontario K2W 0A8 / CA
 [2014/47]
Representative(s)Epping - Hermann - Fischer
Patentanwaltsgesellschaft mbH
Schloßschmidstraße 5
80639 München / DE
[2014/47]
Application number, filing date13735990.709.01.2013
[2017/35]
WO2013CN70263
Priority number, dateUS201261584584P09.01.2012         Original published format: US 201261584584 P
US20121362648225.09.2012         Original published format: US201213626482
[2014/47]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013104309
Date:18.07.2013
Language:EN
[2013/29]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2803227
Date:19.11.2014
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.07.2013
[2014/47]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2803227
Date:30.08.2017
Language:EN
[2017/35]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:CN18.07.2013
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP25.11.2014
ClassificationInternational:H04W48/12
[2014/52]
Former International [2014/47]H04W48/08
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/47]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR ZUGANGSPUNKTERKENNUNG MIT EINEM FILS-BEACON[2017/10]
English:METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR AP DISCOVERY WITH FILS BEACON[2017/10]
French:PROCÉDÉ ET APPAREIL POUR LA RECHERCHE D'UN AP AVEC UNE BALISE FILS[2017/10]
Former [2014/47]SYSTEM UND VERFAHREN ZUR ZUGANGSPUNKTERKENNUNG MIT EINEM FILS-BEACON
Former [2014/47]SYSTEMS AND METHODS FOR AP DISCOVERY WITH FILS BEACON
Former [2014/47]SYSTÈMES ET PROCÉDÉS POUR LA RECHERCHE D'UN AP AVEC UNE BALISE FILS
Entry into regional phase16.07.2014National basic fee paid 
16.07.2014Search fee paid 
16.07.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
16.07.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure16.07.2014Examination requested  [2014/47]
17.06.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
13.11.2015Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
12.03.2016Reply to a communication from the examining division
12.08.2016Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
20.12.2016Reply to a communication from the examining division
27.03.2017Communication of intention to grant the patent
26.06.2017Fee for grant paid
26.06.2017Fee for publishing/printing paid
20.07.2017Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  13.11.2015
Opposition(s)31.05.2018No opposition filed within time limit [2018/32]
Fees paidRenewal fee
26.01.2015Renewal fee patent year 03
21.01.2016Renewal fee patent year 04
24.01.2017Renewal fee patent year 05
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT30.08.2017
CZ30.08.2017
DK30.08.2017
EE30.08.2017
FI30.08.2017
HR30.08.2017
IT30.08.2017
LT30.08.2017
LV30.08.2017
NL30.08.2017
PL30.08.2017
RO30.08.2017
RS30.08.2017
SE30.08.2017
SI30.08.2017
SK30.08.2017
SM30.08.2017
BG30.11.2017
NO30.11.2017
GR01.12.2017
IS30.12.2017
IE09.01.2018
LU09.01.2018
BE31.01.2018
CH31.01.2018
LI31.01.2018
[2019/09]
Former [2018/52]AT30.08.2017
CZ30.08.2017
DK30.08.2017
EE30.08.2017
FI30.08.2017
HR30.08.2017
IT30.08.2017
LT30.08.2017
LV30.08.2017
NL30.08.2017
PL30.08.2017
RO30.08.2017
RS30.08.2017
SE30.08.2017
SI30.08.2017
SK30.08.2017
SM30.08.2017
BG30.11.2017
NO30.11.2017
GR01.12.2017
IS30.12.2017
LU09.01.2018
BE31.01.2018
CH31.01.2018
LI31.01.2018
Former [2018/50]AT30.08.2017
CZ30.08.2017
DK30.08.2017
EE30.08.2017
FI30.08.2017
HR30.08.2017
IT30.08.2017
LT30.08.2017
LV30.08.2017
NL30.08.2017
PL30.08.2017
RO30.08.2017
RS30.08.2017
SE30.08.2017
SI30.08.2017
SK30.08.2017
SM30.08.2017
BG30.11.2017
NO30.11.2017
GR01.12.2017
IS30.12.2017
LU09.01.2018
BE31.01.2018
Former [2018/47]AT30.08.2017
CZ30.08.2017
DK30.08.2017
EE30.08.2017
FI30.08.2017
HR30.08.2017
IT30.08.2017
LT30.08.2017
LV30.08.2017
NL30.08.2017
PL30.08.2017
RO30.08.2017
RS30.08.2017
SE30.08.2017
SI30.08.2017
SK30.08.2017
SM30.08.2017
BG30.11.2017
NO30.11.2017
GR01.12.2017
IS30.12.2017
LU09.01.2018
Former [2018/39]AT30.08.2017
CZ30.08.2017
DK30.08.2017
EE30.08.2017
FI30.08.2017
HR30.08.2017
IT30.08.2017
LT30.08.2017
LV30.08.2017
NL30.08.2017
PL30.08.2017
RO30.08.2017
RS30.08.2017
SE30.08.2017
SI30.08.2017
SK30.08.2017
SM30.08.2017
BG30.11.2017
NO30.11.2017
GR01.12.2017
IS30.12.2017
Former [2018/25]AT30.08.2017
CZ30.08.2017
DK30.08.2017
EE30.08.2017
FI30.08.2017
HR30.08.2017
IT30.08.2017
LT30.08.2017
LV30.08.2017
NL30.08.2017
PL30.08.2017
RO30.08.2017
RS30.08.2017
SE30.08.2017
SK30.08.2017
SM30.08.2017
BG30.11.2017
NO30.11.2017
GR01.12.2017
IS30.12.2017
Former [2018/21]AT30.08.2017
CZ30.08.2017
DK30.08.2017
FI30.08.2017
HR30.08.2017
LT30.08.2017
LV30.08.2017
NL30.08.2017
RS30.08.2017
SE30.08.2017
BG30.11.2017
NO30.11.2017
GR01.12.2017
IS30.12.2017
Former [2018/15]AT30.08.2017
FI30.08.2017
HR30.08.2017
LT30.08.2017
LV30.08.2017
NL30.08.2017
RS30.08.2017
SE30.08.2017
BG30.11.2017
NO30.11.2017
GR01.12.2017
IS30.12.2017
Former [2018/12]AT30.08.2017
FI30.08.2017
HR30.08.2017
LT30.08.2017
LV30.08.2017
RS30.08.2017
SE30.08.2017
BG30.11.2017
NO30.11.2017
GR01.12.2017
IS30.12.2017
Former [2018/11]AT30.08.2017
FI30.08.2017
HR30.08.2017
LT30.08.2017
RS30.08.2017
SE30.08.2017
BG30.11.2017
NO30.11.2017
GR01.12.2017
IS30.12.2017
Former [2018/10]AT30.08.2017
FI30.08.2017
HR30.08.2017
LT30.08.2017
RS30.08.2017
SE30.08.2017
NO30.11.2017
Former [2018/09]FI30.08.2017
LT30.08.2017
SE30.08.2017
NO30.11.2017
Former [2018/08]FI30.08.2017
LT30.08.2017
NO30.11.2017
Former [2018/07]LT30.08.2017
NO30.11.2017
Documents cited:Search[XYI]WO2011106538  (INTERDIGITAL PATENT HOLDINGS [US], et al) [X] 1 * paragraph [0013] * * paragraph [0064] - paragraph [0073] * * figure 4 * [Y] 4,5,8-15 [I] 2,3;
 [XI]US2006285507  (KINDER RICHARD D [AU], et al) [X] 1,8,13 * paragraph [0038] - paragraph [0047] * * paragraph [0058] * * figures 5,6 * [I] 4,5,11;
 [XI]US2009274094  (ENGWER DARWIN A [US]) [X] 1,8,13 * paragraph [0023] - paragraph [0031] * * paragraph [0037] * [I] 2,4,14
 [XYI]  - YUNBO LI ET AL, "AP discovery with FILS beacon", AP DISCOVERY WITH FILS BEACON, IEEE 802.11-12/0042R0, (20120108), XP055138181 [X] 1 * page 4 - page 10 * [Y] 4,5,8-15 [I] 2,3,6,7
International search[A]CN101347005  (CISCO TECH IND [US]);
 [A]CN102076060  (UNIV BEIHANG)
 [X]  - YUNBO LI ET AL., "AP DISCOVERY WITH FILS BEACON, IEEE 802.11-12/0042R0", AP DISCOVERY WITH FILS BEACON, IEEE 802.11-12/0042R0, (20120108), XP055138181
by applicantWO2011106538