blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP2802869 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP2802869



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 381
11.01.2019 Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period Search / examination 1
19.03.2018 Transmission of the certificate Search / examination 1
08.02.2018 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
07.12.2017 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
07.12.2017 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 1
07.12.2017 French translation of claims Search / examination 3
07.12.2017 German translation of the claims Search / examination 3
07.12.2017 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 2
31.07.2017 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 2
31.07.2017 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 5
31.07.2017 Intention to grant (signatures) Search / examination 1
31.07.2017 Text intended for grant Search / examination 52
31.07.2017 Text intended for grant (clean copy) Search / examination 52
19.06.2017 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
19.06.2017 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 3
19.06.2017 Claims Search / examination 3
19.06.2017 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
19.06.2017 Matter concerning the application Search / examination 2
24.05.2017 Annex to the communication Search / examination 1
24.05.2017 Consultation by telephone/in person Search / examination 1
24.05.2017 Result of consultation by telephone/in person Search / examination 1
18.05.2017 Examination started Search / examination 1
10.06.2016 Document concerning representation Search / examination 1
10.06.2016 Document concerning representation Search / examination 1
06.06.2016 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
06.06.2016 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 3
06.06.2016 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 4
06.06.2016 Amendments received before examination Search / examination 4
06.06.2016 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
26.11.2015 Invitation to declare maintenance of the application and to correct deficiencies in the Written Opinion/amend application Search / examination 1
09.11.2015 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
09.11.2015 European search opinion Search / examination 6
09.11.2015 Information on Search Strategy Search / examination 1
09.11.2015 Supplementary European search report Search / examination 4
06.08.2015 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
06.08.2015 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
06.08.2015 Letter concerning search matters Search / examination 1
22.07.2015 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 2
22.07.2015 Partial European search report Search / examination 4
23.06.2015 Search started Search / examination 1
24.10.2014 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
22.10.2014 Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data Search / examination 1
16.10.2014 Letter concerning the inventor Search / examination 1
26.09.2014 Invitation to indicate correct address of inventor Search / examination 1
17.09.2014 Letter which had not been notified Search / examination 2
12.09.2014 Communication regarding possible amendment of the application/payment of claims fee Search / examination 3
04.09.2014 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 2
04.09.2014 International publication of the international search report Search / examination 1
02.09.2014 Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability Search / examination 13
21.08.2014 Reply by International Bureau Search / examination 1
18.08.2014 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
18.08.2014 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
05.08.2014 Enquiry with the International Bureau Search / examination 1
28.07.2014 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 2
28.07.2014 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 5
28.07.2014 Amended drawings filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 23
28.07.2014 Amended drawings with annotations Search / examination 8
28.07.2014 Amendments received before examination Search / examination 3
28.07.2014 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
28.07.2014 Document concerning representation Search / examination 1
28.07.2014 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 5
23.05.2014 Information on entry into European phase Search / examination 3
07.08.2013 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 65
18.07.2013 International publication of the A2 Pamphlet Search / examination 58