blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP2802869


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
22.02.2019 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  27.03.2019  [2019/13]
18.01.2019 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  20.02.2019  [2019/08]
11.01.2019 No opposition filed within time limit published on  13.02.2019  [2019/07]
14.12.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  16.01.2019  [2019/03]
23.11.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  26.12.2018  [2018/52]
16.11.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  19.12.2018  [2018/51]
09.11.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  12.12.2018  [2018/50]
12.10.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  14.11.2018  [2018/46]
14.09.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  17.10.2018  [2018/42]
07.09.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  10.10.2018  [2018/41]
31.08.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  03.10.2018  [2018/40]
10.08.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  12.09.2018  [2018/37]
03.08.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  05.09.2018  [2018/36]
27.07.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  29.08.2018  [2018/35]
02.02.2018 (Expected) grant published on  07.03.2018  [2018/10]
31.01.2018 New entry: Renewal fee paid
12.12.2017 New entry: Payment of fee for grant
12.12.2017 New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing
08.12.2017 New entry: Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
30.07.2017 New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent
28.07.2017 Change - inventor published on  30.08.2017  [2017/35]
23.06.2017 Change - classification published on  26.07.2017  [2017/30]
23.06.2017 Change - classification published on  26.07.2017  [2017/30]
03.02.2017 New entry: Renewal fee paid
16.12.2016 Change - request for examination published on  18.01.2017  [2017/03]
15.06.2016 Amendment by applicant
02.02.2016 New entry: Renewal fee paid
10.11.2015 Supplementary search report published on  09.12.2015  [2015/50]
06.11.2015 Change - classification published on  09.12.2015  [2015/50]
17.07.2015 Change - classification published on  19.08.2015  [2015/34]
10.07.2015 Change - extension states published on  12.08.2015  [2015/33]
30.01.2015 New entry: Renewal fee paid
24.10.2014 Change - inventor published on  26.11.2014  [2014/48]
17.10.2014 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  19.11.2014  [2014/47]
17.10.2014 Request for examination filed published on  19.11.2014  [2014/47]
24.09.2014 PCT data prior to European publication
05.09.2014 PCT data prior to European publication
22.08.2014 PCT data prior to European publication
01.08.2014 PCT data prior to European publication
30.07.2014 Amendment by applicant
29.07.2014 PCT data prior to European publication
30.07.2013 PCT data prior to European publication
19.07.2013 PCT data prior to European publication