blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Patent family: EP2802869 Family dossiers alerts: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):  

CN201380005166 EP13736046



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated





TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US2018188250Global Dossier 05.07.2018A1
Priority number Date
US201815908313 28.02.2018
US201261585050 10.01.2012
US201414358280 15.05.2014
WO2013US20483 07.01.2013
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US9933428Global Dossier 03.04.2018B2
US2014315216 23.10.2014A1
Priority number Date
US201261585050 10.01.2012
US201314358280 07.01.2013
WO2013US20483 07.01.2013
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
JP6373191BGlobal Dossier 15.08.2018B2
JP2015505054 16.02.2015A
Priority number Date
US201261585050 10.01.2012
WO2013US20483 07.01.2013
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CN104204794BGlobal Dossier 11.07.2017B
CN104204794 10.12.2014A
Priority number Date
US201261585050 10.01.2012
WO2013US20483 07.01.2013
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
EP2802869Global Dossier 07.03.2018B1
EP2802869 09.12.2015A4
EP2802869 19.11.2014A2
Priority number Date
US201261585050 10.01.2012
WO2013US20483 07.01.2013
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
AU2013208289B 11.08.2016B2
AU2013208289 28.08.2014A1
Priority number Date
US201261585050 10.01.2012
WO2013US20483 07.01.2013
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CA2857522 18.07.2013A1
Priority number Date
US201261585050 10.01.2012
WO2013US20483 07.01.2013
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
ES2672268T 13.06.2018T3
Priority number Date
US201261585050 10.01.2012
WO2013US20483 07.01.2013
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
WO2013106269Global Dossier 04.09.2014A3
WO2013106269 18.07.2013A2
Priority number Date
US201261585050 10.01.2012