Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2802869

EP2802869 - IMMUNOASSAY TEST SLIDE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  11.01.2019
Database last updated on 18.06.2019
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  02.02.2018
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  30.07.2017
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  16.12.2016
Most recent event   Tooltip22.02.2019Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): SI
published on 27.03.2019  [2019/13]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
IDEXX Laboratories, Inc.
One Idexx Drive
Westbrook, ME 04092 / US
[2014/47]
Inventor(s)01 / CHAN, Eugene
2 Cedarwood Drive
Falmouth, ME 04105 / US
02 / NASSIF, Keith
38 Elmwood Drive
Saco, ME 04072 / US
 [2017/35]
Former [2014/48]01 / CHAN, Eugene
2 Cedarwood Drive
Falmouth, Maine 04105 / US
02 / NASSIF, Keith
38 Elmwood Drive
Saco, ME 04072 / US
Former [2014/47]01 / CHAN, Eugene
17 Rudman Road
Portland, ME 04102 / US
02 / NASSIF, Keith
38 Elmwood Drive
Saco, ME 04072 / US
Representative(s)Sajda, Wolf E.
Meissner Bolte Patentanwälte
Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaft mbB
Postfach 86 06 24
81633 München / DE
[2018/10]
Former [2014/47]Sajda, Wolf E.
Meissner, Bolte & Partner GbR
Postfach 86 06 24
81633 München / DE
Application number, filing date13736046.707.01.2013
[2018/10]
WO2013US20483
Priority number, dateUS201261585050P10.01.2012         Original published format: US 201261585050 P
[2014/47]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO2013106269
Date:18.07.2013
Language:EN
[2013/29]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP2802869
Date:19.11.2014
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.07.2013
[2014/47]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2802869
Date:07.03.2018
Language:EN
[2018/10]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US04.09.2014
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP09.11.2015
ClassificationInternational:G01N35/00, G01N33/543
[2017/30]
Former International [2015/34]G01N33/543
Former International [2014/47]G01N33/24
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/47]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:OBJEKTTRÄGER FÜR IMMUNOASSAY[2014/47]
English:IMMUNOASSAY TEST SLIDE[2014/47]
French:LAME D'ESSAI D'IMMUNODOSAGE[2014/47]
Entry into regional phase28.07.2014National basic fee paid 
28.07.2014Search fee paid 
28.07.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
28.07.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure28.07.2014Examination requested  [2014/47]
06.06.2016Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
31.07.2017Communication of intention to grant the patent
07.12.2017Fee for grant paid
07.12.2017Fee for publishing/printing paid
07.12.2017Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  31.07.2017
Opposition(s)10.12.2018No opposition filed within time limit [2019/07]
Fees paidRenewal fee
27.01.2015Renewal fee patent year 03
27.01.2016Renewal fee patent year 04
27.01.2017Renewal fee patent year 05
29.01.2018Renewal fee patent year 06
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAL07.03.2018
AT07.03.2018
CY07.03.2018
CZ07.03.2018
DK07.03.2018
EE07.03.2018
FI07.03.2018
HR07.03.2018
LT07.03.2018
LV07.03.2018
PL07.03.2018
RO07.03.2018
RS07.03.2018
SE07.03.2018
SI07.03.2018
SK07.03.2018
SM07.03.2018
BG07.06.2018
NO07.06.2018
GR08.06.2018
PT09.07.2018
[2019/13]
Former [2019/08]AL07.03.2018
AT07.03.2018
CY07.03.2018
CZ07.03.2018
DK07.03.2018
EE07.03.2018
FI07.03.2018
HR07.03.2018
LT07.03.2018
LV07.03.2018
PL07.03.2018
RO07.03.2018
RS07.03.2018
SE07.03.2018
SK07.03.2018
SM07.03.2018
BG07.06.2018
NO07.06.2018
GR08.06.2018
PT09.07.2018
Former [2019/03]AL07.03.2018
AT07.03.2018
CY07.03.2018
CZ07.03.2018
EE07.03.2018
FI07.03.2018
HR07.03.2018
LT07.03.2018
LV07.03.2018
PL07.03.2018
RO07.03.2018
RS07.03.2018
SE07.03.2018
SK07.03.2018
SM07.03.2018
BG07.06.2018
NO07.06.2018
GR08.06.2018
PT09.07.2018
Former [2018/52]AL07.03.2018
AT07.03.2018
CY07.03.2018
CZ07.03.2018
EE07.03.2018
FI07.03.2018
HR07.03.2018
LT07.03.2018
LV07.03.2018
PL07.03.2018
RO07.03.2018
RS07.03.2018
SE07.03.2018
SK07.03.2018
SM07.03.2018
BG07.06.2018
NO07.06.2018
GR08.06.2018
Former [2018/50]AL07.03.2018
AT07.03.2018
CY07.03.2018
CZ07.03.2018
EE07.03.2018
FI07.03.2018
HR07.03.2018
LT07.03.2018
LV07.03.2018
PL07.03.2018
RO07.03.2018
RS07.03.2018
SE07.03.2018
SK07.03.2018
BG07.06.2018
NO07.06.2018
GR08.06.2018
Former [2018/46]AL07.03.2018
CY07.03.2018
FI07.03.2018
HR07.03.2018
LT07.03.2018
LV07.03.2018
RS07.03.2018
SE07.03.2018
BG07.06.2018
NO07.06.2018
GR08.06.2018
Former [2018/40]CY07.03.2018
FI07.03.2018
HR07.03.2018
LT07.03.2018
LV07.03.2018
RS07.03.2018
SE07.03.2018
BG07.06.2018
NO07.06.2018
GR08.06.2018
Former [2018/37]CY07.03.2018
FI07.03.2018
HR07.03.2018
LT07.03.2018
NO07.06.2018
GR08.06.2018
Former [2018/35]CY07.03.2018
FI07.03.2018
HR07.03.2018
LT07.03.2018
NO07.06.2018
Documents cited:Search[XY]WO9923475  (DADE BEHRING INC [US]) [X] 1,2 * whole document, in particular p. 5, l. 32 - p. 7, l. 9; p. 6, l. 16-22; p. 10, l. 20 - p. 11, l. 25; p. 14, l. 19 - p. 15, l. 14; p. 15, l. 25 - p. 16, l. 36; p. 17, l. 26 - p. 18, l. 29; p. 21, l. 29 - p. 22, l. 2; fig. 1-4 * [Y] 3-12;
 [Y]WO2008140742  (IDEXX LAB INC [US], et al) [Y] 3-12 * whole document, in particular fig. 10-16 *;
 [A]WO2011124991  (BIOSENSIA PATENTS LTD [IE], et al) [A] 1-12 * the whole document *;
 [A]EP1114997  (ARKRAY INC [JP]) [A] 1-12 * the whole document *
International search[Y]US2007087357  (CLARK SCOTT M [US], et al);
 [Y]US2007092401  (LIAO FEIER [CN], et al);
 [Y]US2004137640  (HIRAO KONOMU [JP], et al);
 [Y]US5807751  (ALAJEM SARA [IL], et al);
 [Y]US2003170768  (ANAOKAR SUNIL G [US], et al);
 [Y]US5376551  (YOSHIKAMI DOJU [US]);
 [Y]US2010066543  (DRUCKER STEVEN [US], et al);
 [Y]US5185127  (VONK GLENN P [US]);
 [Y]WO2006105110  (INVERNESS MEDICAL SWITZERLAND [CH], et al);
 [Y]US2004171173  (ECKERMANN MARTIN [DE], et al);
 [Y]US2010129789  (SELF BRIAN AUSTIN [US], et al);
 [A]US2003129767  (BAUTISTA LORRAINE [US], et al);
 [A]US2001039057  (DOUGLAS JOEL S [US], et al)