Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2804423

EP2804423 - HANDOVER METHOD AND APPARATUS IN WIRELESS COMMUNICATION SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  08.02.2019
Database last updated on 16.10.2019
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  29.10.2018
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  07.07.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip11.10.2019Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): IT
published on 13.11.2019 [2019/46]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd.
129, Samsung-ro
Yeongtong-gu
Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do, 443-742 / KR
[2014/47]
Inventor(s)01 / JANG, Jae Hyuk
No.104-2002 Sinmaetan Weve Haneulchae Apt.
Maetan 3-dong
Yeongtong-gu
Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do 443-373 / KR
02 / VAN DER VELDE, Himke
Communications House
South Street
Staines Middlesex TW18 4QE / GB
03 / JEONG, Kyeong In
No.102-511 Woncheon Seongil Apt.
Maetan 2-dong
Yeongtong-gu
Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do 443-372 / KR
 [2014/47]
Representative(s)Nederlandsch Octrooibureau
P.O. Box 29720
2502 LS The Hague / NL
[2014/47]
Application number, filing date13736144.009.01.2013
[2019/11]
WO2013KR00181
Priority number, dateUS201261584744P09.01.2012         Original published format: US 201261584744 P
US201261591385P27.01.2012         Original published format: US 201261591385 P
[2014/47]
Filing languageKO
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013105786
Date:18.07.2013
Language:KO
[2013/29]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2804423
Date:19.11.2014
Language:EN
[2014/47]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2804423
Date:13.03.2019
Language:EN
[2019/11]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:KR18.07.2013
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP03.11.2015
ClassificationInternational:H04W36/00, H04W12/02, H04W12/10, // H04W36/04, H04W84/04
[2018/46]
Former International [2015/49]H04W36/00, // H04W36/04, H04W84/04, H04W12/02, H04W12/10
Former International [2014/47]H04W36/36, H04W36/04
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/47]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:ÜBERGABEVERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG IN EINEM DRAHTLOSEN KOMMUNIKATIONSSYSTEM[2014/47]
English:HANDOVER METHOD AND APPARATUS IN WIRELESS COMMUNICATION SYSTEM[2014/47]
French:PROCÉDÉ ET APPAREIL DE TRANSFERT DANS UN SYSTÈME DE COMMUNICATIONS SANS FIL[2014/47]
Entry into regional phase08.07.2014Translation filed 
08.07.2014National basic fee paid 
08.07.2014Search fee paid 
08.07.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
08.07.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure08.07.2014Examination requested  [2014/47]
18.05.2016Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
06.07.2017Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
06.11.2017Reply to a communication from the examining division
26.07.2018Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02)
25.09.2018Reply to a communication from the examining division
30.10.2018Communication of intention to grant the patent
30.01.2019Fee for grant paid
30.01.2019Fee for publishing/printing paid
30.01.2019Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  06.07.2017
Fees paidRenewal fee
10.11.2014Renewal fee patent year 03
10.12.2015Renewal fee patent year 04
13.12.2016Renewal fee patent year 05
27.12.2017Renewal fee patent year 06
23.01.2019Renewal fee patent year 07
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHR13.03.2019
IT13.03.2019
LT13.03.2019
LV13.03.2019
RS13.03.2019
SE13.03.2019
BG13.06.2019
NO13.06.2019
GR14.06.2019
[2019/46]
Former [2019/39]HR13.03.2019
LT13.03.2019
LV13.03.2019
RS13.03.2019
SE13.03.2019
BG13.06.2019
NO13.06.2019
GR14.06.2019
Former [2019/38]LT13.03.2019
SE13.03.2019
BG13.06.2019
NO13.06.2019
GR14.06.2019
Former [2019/37]LT13.03.2019
SE13.03.2019
NO13.06.2019
GR14.06.2019
Former [2019/34]LT13.03.2019
SE13.03.2019
NO13.06.2019
Former [2019/33]LT13.03.2019
NO13.06.2019
Documents cited:Search[XP]  - MEDIATEK INC, "Impact on handover with PDCP SN change", vol. RAN WG2, no. Qingdao, China; 20120813 - 20120817, (20120807), 3GPP DRAFT; R2-123592_IMPACT ON HANDOVER WITH PDCP SN CHANGE, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, URL: http://www.3gpp.org/ftp/tsg_ran/WG2_RL2/TSGR2_79/Docs/, (20120807), XP050665624 [XP] 1-10 * 2.2 Handover with PDCP SN change * * 2.3 Handover with full configuration *
 [I]  - ZTE, "Some small corrections to 36.300", 3GPP DRAFT; 36300_CR0365_(REL-10)_R2-113388, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, (20110510), vol. RAN WG2, no. Barcelona, Spain; 20110509, XP050495477 [I] 1-10 * page 9 *
 [A]  - "RRC TP on CA changes regarding Connection control", 3GPP DRAFT; R2-103802 CA CONNECTION CONTROL STAGE 3, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, (20100622), vol. RAN WG2, no. Stockholm, Sweden; 20100628, XP050451238 [A] 1-10 * 5.3.1.2 Security * * 5.3.1.3 Connected mode mobility * * 5.3.5.8 Radio Resource Configuration involving full configuration option *
International search[A]KR20110093613  (LG ELECTRONICS INC [KR]);
 [A]KR20110039378  (ALCATEL LUCENT [FR]);
 [A]KR20100105449  (HTC CORP [TW])
 [A]  - "Evolved Universal Terrestrial Radio Access (E-UTRA); Radio Resource Control (RRC); Protocol specification (Release 10)", 3GPP TS 36.331 V10.4.0, (20111222), XP050555028