Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2803731

EP2803731 - METHOD FOR PRODUCING CHEMICAL SUBSTANCE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  28.09.2018
Database last updated on 22.05.2019
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  12.01.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip28.09.2018Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 31.10.2018  [2018/44]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Toray Industries, Inc.
1-1, Nihonbashi-Muromachi 2-chome Chuo-ku
Tokyo, 103-8666 / JP
[2014/47]
Inventor(s)01 / ISOBE, Kyohei
c/o Basic Research Center
Toray Industries Inc.
10-1 Tebiro 6-chome
Kamakura-shi Kanagawa 248-8555 / JP
02 / WATANABE, Shiomi
c/o Basic Research Center
Toray Industries Inc.
10-1 Tebiro 6-chome
Kamakura-shi Kanagawa 248-8555 / JP
03 / KOBAYASHI, Koji
c/o Basic Research Center
Toray Industries Inc.
10-1 Tebiro 6-chome
Kamakura-shi Kanagawa 248-8555 / JP
04 / SAWAI, Kenji
c/o Basic Research Center
Toray Industries Inc.
10-1 Tebiro 6-chome
Kamakura-shi Kanagawa 248-8555 / JP
05 / NA, Kyungsu
c/o Basic Research Center
Toray Industries Inc.
10-1 Tebiro 6-chome
Kamakura-shi Kanagawa 248-8555 / JP
06 / HIRAMATSU, Shingo
c/o Basic Research Center
Toray Industries Inc.
10-1 Tebiro 6-chome
Kamakura-shi Kanagawa 248-8555 / JP
07 / YAMADA, Katsushige
c/o Basic Research Center
Toray Industries Inc.
10-1 Tebiro 6-chome
Kamakura-shi Kanagawa 248-8555 / JP
 [2014/47]
Representative(s)Kador & Partner PartG mbB
Corneliusstraße 15
80469 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2014/47]Kador & Partner
Corneliusstraße 15
80469 München / DE
Application number, filing date13736377.611.01.2013
WO2013JP50438
Priority number, dateJP2012000525713.01.2012         Original published format: JP 2012005257
[2014/47]
Filing languageJA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013105653
Date:18.07.2013
Language:JA
[2013/29]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2803731
Date:19.11.2014
Language:EN
[2014/47]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:JP18.07.2013
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP23.07.2015
ClassificationInternational:C12P7/06, C12P7/18, C12P7/56
[2014/47]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/47]
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINER CHEMISCHEN SUBSTANZ[2014/47]
English:METHOD FOR PRODUCING CHEMICAL SUBSTANCE[2014/47]
French:PROCÉDÉ POUR LA PRODUCTION DE SUBSTANCE CHIMIQUE[2014/47]
Entry into regional phase25.07.2014Translation filed 
25.07.2014National basic fee paid 
25.07.2014Search fee paid 
25.07.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
25.07.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure25.07.2014Examination requested  [2014/47]
11.02.2016Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
15.01.2018Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
26.05.2018Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2018/44]
21.06.2018Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2018/44]
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  15.01.2018
Fees paidRenewal fee
27.01.2015Renewal fee patent year 03
28.01.2016Renewal fee patent year 04
23.01.2017Renewal fee patent year 05
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.01.201806   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[Y]EP2371973  (TORAY INDUSTRIES [JP]) [Y] 1-6 * paragraphs [0118] , [0122] , [0123]; example -; claim 14 *;
 [Y]EP1988170  (TORAY INDUSTRIES [JP]) [Y] 1-6 * paragraphs [0070] - [0082]; claim - *;
 [Y]  - LAPLACE J M ET AL, "Cofermentation of glucose and xylose to ethanol by a respiratory-deficient mutant of Saccharomyces cerevisiae co-cultivated with a xylose-fermenting yeast", JOURNAL OF FERMENTATION AND BIOENGINEERING, SOCIETY OF FERMENTATION TECHNOLOGY, JP, vol. 75, no. 3, doi:10.1016/0922-338X(93)90117-Q, ISSN 0922-338X, (19930101), pages 207 - 212, (19930101), XP025748805 [Y] 1 * page 210, paragraph l *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0922-338X(93)90117-Q
 [Y]  - DU PREEZ ET AL, "Process parameters and environmental factors affecting d-xylose fermentation by yeasts", ENZYME AND MICROBIAL TECHNOLOGY, STONEHAM, MA, US, vol. 16, no. 11, doi:10.1016/0141-0229(94)90003-5, ISSN 0141-0229, (19941101), pages 944 - 956, (19941101), XP023678146 [Y] 1 * page 947 - page 951 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0141-0229(94)90003-5
 [A]  - J M LAPLACE ET AL, "Ethanol Production from Glucose and Xylose by Separated and Co-culture Processes Using H&h Cell Density Systems", PROCESS BIOCHEMISTRY, (19930101), vol. 28, no. 5, pages 19 - 525, XP055202497 [A] 1-6 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0032-9592(93)85013-6
 [A]  - FRANK K AGBOGBO ET AL, "Cellulosic ethanol production using the naturally occurring xylose-fermenting yeast, Pichia stipitis", BIOTECHNOLOGY LETTERS, SPRINGER NETHERLANDS, DORDRECHT, (20080423), vol. 30, no. 9, ISSN 1573-6776, pages 1515 - 1524, XP019599996 [A] 1 * the whole document *
International search[X]JP4770987B  (TORAY INDUSTRIES, INC.);
 [Y]WO2007097260  (TORAY INDUSTRIES [JP], et al);
 [A]JP2009028030  (GEKKEIKAN KK);
 [A]JP2011139707  (NIPPON SUISAN KAISHA LTD);
 [Y]  - KRISHNAN ET AL., "Ethanol production from glucose and xylose by immobilized Zymomonas mobilis CP4 (pZB5)", APPLIED BIOCHEMISTRY AND BIOTECHNOLOGY, (2000), vol. 84-86, pages 525 - 541, XP055080753

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1385/ABAB:84-86:1-9:525
 [A]  - TANAKA ET AL., "Two different pathways for D- xylose metabolism and the effectof xylose concentration on the yield coefficient of L- lactate in mixed-acidfermentation by the lactic acid bacterium Lactococcus lactis 10-1", APPL MICROBIOL BIOTECHNOL, (2002), vol. 60, pages 160 - 167, XP009148218

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/s00253-002-1078-5
 [A]  - ERLANDSON ET AL., "Dissolution of Xylose Metabolism inLactococcus lactis", APPL. ENVIRON. MICROBIOL., (2000), vol. 66, no. 9, pages 3974 - 3980, XP002578206
 [A]  - FOND ET AL., "The acetone butanol fermentation on glucose and xylose. I. Regulation and kinetics in batch cultures", BIOTECHNOLOGY AND BIOENGINEERING, (1986), vol. XXVIII, pages 160 - 166, XP055080755

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/bit.260280203
 [A]  - KIM ET AL., "Batch and continuous fermentation of succinic acid from wood hydrolysate by Mannheimia succiniciproducens MBEL55E", ENZYME AND MICROBIAL TECHNOLOGY, (2004), vol. 35, pages 648 - 653, XP004619965

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.enzmictec.2004.08.018
by applicantJPH11506934
 JP2005229821
 JP2003212888
 JP2001095597
 JP3041380B
 WO2010067785
 JP2008079564
 JP2006525029
 WO2007097260
 WO2012086763
    - KAISA KARHUMAA; ROSA GARCIA SANCHEZ; BARBEL HAHN-HAGERDAL; MARIE-F GORWA-GRAUSLUND, "Comparison of the xylose reductase-xylitol dehydrogenase and the xylose isomerase pathways for xylose fermentation by recombinant Saccharomyces cerevisiae", MICROBIAL CELL FACTORIES, (2007), vol. 6, doi:doi:10.1186/1475-2859-6-5, page 5, XP021024086

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1186/1475-2859-6-5
    - DO YUN KIM; SEONG CHUN YIM; PYUNG CHEON LEE; WOO GI LEE; SANG YUP LEE; HO NAM CHANG, "Batch and continuous fermentation of succinic acid from wood hydrolysate by Mannheimia succiniciproducens MBEL55E", ENZYME AND MICROBIAL TECHNOLOGY, (2004), vol. 35, doi:doi:10.1016/j.enzmictec.2004.08.018, pages 648 - 653, XP004619965

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.enzmictec.2004.08.018
    - THE SOCIETY FOR BIOTECHNOLOGY, JAPAN, Laboratory Manual for Bioengineering, BAIFUKAN CO., LTD., (1992), page 310