Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2802971

EP2802971 - STYLUS COMPUTING ENVIRONMENT [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  14.12.2018
Database last updated on 18.05.2019
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  15.03.2018
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  20.01.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip14.12.2018Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 16.01.2019  [2019/03]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Microsoft Technology Licensing, LLC
One Microsoft Way
Redmond, WA 98052 / US
[2015/19]
Former [2014/47]For all designated states
Microsoft Corporation
One Microsoft Way
Redmond, Washington 98052-6399 / US
Inventor(s)01 / HINCKLEY, Kenneth P.
c/o Microsoft Corporation
LCA - International Patents
One Microsoft Way
Redmond Washington 98052-6399 / US
02 / LATTA, Stephen G.
c/o Microsoft Corporation
LCA - International Patents
One Microsoft Way
Redmond Washington 98052-6399 / US
 [2014/47]
Representative(s)Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB
Leopoldstraße 4
80802 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2014/47]Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser
Leopoldstrasse 4
80802 München / DE
Application number, filing date13736406.304.01.2013
WO2013US20184
Priority number, dateUS20121335054013.01.2012         Original published format: US201213350540
[2014/47]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013106235
Date:18.07.2013
Language:EN
[2013/29]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2802971
Date:19.11.2014
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.07.2013
[2014/47]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:KR18.07.2013
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP13.08.2015
ClassificationInternational:G06F3/033
[2014/47]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/47]
TitleGerman:DATENVERARBEITUNGSUMGEBUNG MIT STIFT[2014/47]
English:STYLUS COMPUTING ENVIRONMENT[2014/47]
French:ENVIRONNEMENT INFORMATIQUE À STYLET[2014/47]
Entry into regional phase10.07.2014National basic fee paid 
10.07.2014Search fee paid 
10.07.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
10.07.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure10.07.2014Examination requested  [2014/47]
09.03.2016Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
06.09.2016Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
16.01.2017Reply to a communication from the examining division
16.03.2018Communication of intention to grant the patent
27.07.2018Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2019/03]
03.09.2018Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time  [2019/03]
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  06.09.2016
Fees paidRenewal fee
08.01.2015Renewal fee patent year 03
11.01.2016Renewal fee patent year 04
11.01.2017Renewal fee patent year 05
15.01.2018Renewal fee patent year 06
Documents cited:Search   [] - No further relevant documents disclosed
International search[X]US6307956  (BLACK GERALD R [US]);
 [A]US2010116564  (SILVERBROOK KIA [AU], et al);
 [A]US6195446  (SKOOG STEVEN K [US]);
 [A]US5559895  (LEE LUAN L [US], et al)
by applicantUS6307956