Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2866848

EP2866848 - THIN FILM TANTALUM COATING FOR MEDICAL IMPLANTS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  28.06.2019
Database last updated on 14.12.2019
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  20.07.2018
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  01.02.2018
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  06.01.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip09.08.2019Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): SI
published on 11.09.2019  [2019/37]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Zimmer, Inc.
1800 W. Center Street
Warsaw, Indiana 46580 / US
[2015/19]
Inventor(s)01 / VARGAS, Joseph, R.
10 North Central Highway
Garnerville, NY 10923 / US
02 / SEELMAN, Steven
5 Grant Street
Unit 1R
Montclair, NJ 07042 / US
 [2015/19]
Representative(s)Mays, Julie , et al
Venner Shipley LLP
200 Aldersgate
London, EC1A 4HD / GB
[2018/34]
Former [2015/19]Mays, Julie , et al
Venner Shipley LLP
200 Aldersgate
London
EC1A 4HD / GB
Application number, filing date13736738.902.07.2013
[2018/34]
WO2013US49131
Priority number, dateUS201261667043P02.07.2012         Original published format: US 201261667043 P
[2015/19]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2014008293
Date:09.01.2014
Language:EN
[2014/02]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2866848
Date:06.05.2015
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.01.2014
[2015/19]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2866848
Date:22.08.2018
Language:EN
[2018/34]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP09.01.2014
ClassificationInternational:A61L27/30, A61L27/06, C23C16/40, A61K6/02, A61K6/04, C23C16/14, C23C16/46
[2018/08]
Former International [2015/19]A61L27/30, C23C16/40
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2015/19]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:DÜNNSCHICHT-TANTALBESCHICHTUNG FÜR MEDIZINISCHE IMPLANTATE[2015/19]
English:THIN FILM TANTALUM COATING FOR MEDICAL IMPLANTS[2015/19]
French:REVÊTEMENT DE TANTALE À COUCHE MINCE POUR IMPLANTS MÉDICAUX[2015/19]
Entry into regional phase29.01.2015National basic fee paid 
29.01.2015Designation fee(s) paid 
29.01.2015Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure29.01.2015Examination requested  [2015/19]
01.09.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
11.01.2017Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
22.05.2017Reply to a communication from the examining division
02.02.2018Communication of intention to grant the patent
12.06.2018Fee for grant paid
12.06.2018Fee for publishing/printing paid
12.06.2018Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  11.01.2017
Opposition(s)23.05.2019No opposition filed within time limit [2019/31]
Fees paidRenewal fee
10.07.2015Renewal fee patent year 03
11.07.2016Renewal fee patent year 04
12.07.2017Renewal fee patent year 05
11.07.2018Renewal fee patent year 06
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAL22.08.2018
AT22.08.2018
CZ22.08.2018
DK22.08.2018
EE22.08.2018
ES22.08.2018
FI22.08.2018
HR22.08.2018
IT22.08.2018
LT22.08.2018
LV22.08.2018
NL22.08.2018
PL22.08.2018
RO22.08.2018
RS22.08.2018
SE22.08.2018
SI22.08.2018
SK22.08.2018
SM22.08.2018
BG22.11.2018
NO22.11.2018
GR23.11.2018
IS22.12.2018
[2019/37]
Former [2019/26]AL22.08.2018
AT22.08.2018
CZ22.08.2018
DK22.08.2018
EE22.08.2018
ES22.08.2018
FI22.08.2018
HR22.08.2018
IT22.08.2018
LT22.08.2018
LV22.08.2018
NL22.08.2018
PL22.08.2018
RO22.08.2018
RS22.08.2018
SE22.08.2018
SK22.08.2018
SM22.08.2018
BG22.11.2018
NO22.11.2018
GR23.11.2018
IS22.12.2018
Former [2019/23]AL22.08.2018
AT22.08.2018
CZ22.08.2018
EE22.08.2018
ES22.08.2018
FI22.08.2018
HR22.08.2018
IT22.08.2018
LT22.08.2018
LV22.08.2018
NL22.08.2018
PL22.08.2018
RO22.08.2018
RS22.08.2018
SE22.08.2018
SK22.08.2018
BG22.11.2018
NO22.11.2018
GR23.11.2018
IS22.12.2018
Former [2019/22]AL22.08.2018
CZ22.08.2018
FI22.08.2018
HR22.08.2018
IT22.08.2018
LT22.08.2018
LV22.08.2018
NL22.08.2018
PL22.08.2018
RO22.08.2018
RS22.08.2018
SE22.08.2018
BG22.11.2018
NO22.11.2018
GR23.11.2018
IS22.12.2018
Former [2019/21]AL22.08.2018
FI22.08.2018
HR22.08.2018
IT22.08.2018
LT22.08.2018
LV22.08.2018
NL22.08.2018
RS22.08.2018
SE22.08.2018
BG22.11.2018
NO22.11.2018
GR23.11.2018
IS22.12.2018
Former [2019/12]AL22.08.2018
FI22.08.2018
HR22.08.2018
LT22.08.2018
LV22.08.2018
NL22.08.2018
RS22.08.2018
SE22.08.2018
BG22.11.2018
NO22.11.2018
GR23.11.2018
IS22.12.2018
Former [2019/11]FI22.08.2018
HR22.08.2018
LT22.08.2018
NL22.08.2018
RS22.08.2018
SE22.08.2018
BG22.11.2018
NO22.11.2018
GR23.11.2018
IS22.12.2018
Former [2019/10]FI22.08.2018
LT22.08.2018
NL22.08.2018
RS22.08.2018
SE22.08.2018
BG22.11.2018
NO22.11.2018
GR23.11.2018
IS22.12.2018
Former [2019/09]FI22.08.2018
LT22.08.2018
NL22.08.2018
NO22.11.2018
IS22.12.2018
Former [2019/08]FI22.08.2018
LT22.08.2018
NO22.11.2018
IS22.12.2018
Former [2019/07]LT22.08.2018
Cited inInternational search[X]EP1916007  (DEPUY PRODUCTS INC [US]) [X] 1-5,10-16,18,22,23 * column 5, paragraphs 17-18 * * column 6, paragraphs 22-26 * * claim - *;
 [XI]WO03093530  (DANFOSS AS [DK], et al) [X] 1,2,7,9,10,13-16,19,22-24 * page 8, lines 20-25 * * claim - * * figure 2 * [I] 8,20,25,26
 [X]  - DANFOSS TANTALUM TECHNOLOGIES, "User Guide - Answers to most questions about: Danfoss Tantalum Coating", INTERNET CITATION, (20050501), pages 1 - 8, URL: http://www.tantalum-coating.com/Literat/UserGuide.pdf, (20090130), XP002512814 [X] 1,2,4-7,9-17,19,21-24 * the whole document *
by applicantUS5282861