EP2872364 - METHOD FOR CONTROLLING AN INTERIOR LIGHTING SYSTEM IN A VEHICLE AND INTERIOR LIGHTING SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 04.12.2020 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 18.03.2020 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 20.01.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.12.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 06.01.2021 [2021/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BCS Automotive Interface Solutions GmbH Industriestr. 2-8 78315 Radolfzell / DE | [2019/33] |
Former [2015/21] | For all designated states TRW Automotive Electronics & Components GmbH Industriestrasse 2-8 78315 Radolfzell / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BACKES, Ulrich Lessingstrasse 1/1 78315 Radolfzell / DE | [2015/21] | Representative(s) | Prinz & Partner mbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Rundfunkplatz 2 80335 München / DE | [2015/21] | Application number, filing date | 13736859.3 | 05.07.2013 | WO2013EP64219 | Priority number, date | DE20121013783 | 11.07.2012 Original published format: DE102012013783 | [2015/21] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014009262 | Date: | 16.01.2014 | Language: | DE | [2014/03] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2872364 | Date: | 20.05.2015 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.01.2014 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2015/21] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 16.01.2014 | Classification | IPC: | B60Q3/80, B60Q3/16 | [2020/09] | CPC: |
H05B47/10 (EP,US);
B60Q3/00 (US);
B60Q3/16 (EP,US);
B60Q3/80 (EP,US);
H05B47/105 (EP);
B60Q2900/40 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2015/21] | B60Q3/02, B60Q3/04 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/21] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR STEUERUNG EINER INNENRAUMBELEUCHTUNG IN EINEM FAHRZEUG SOWIE INNENRAUMBELEUCHTUNG | [2015/21] | English: | METHOD FOR CONTROLLING AN INTERIOR LIGHTING SYSTEM IN A VEHICLE AND INTERIOR LIGHTING SYSTEM | [2015/21] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE COMMANDE D'UN SYSTÈME D'ÉCLAIRAGE D'HABITACLE DANS UN VÉHICULE, ET SYSTÈME D'ÉCLAIRAGE D'HABITACLE CORRESPONDANT | [2015/21] | Entry into regional phase | 04.11.2014 | National basic fee paid | 04.11.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.11.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.11.2014 | Examination requested [2015/21] | 21.08.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 24.01.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 17.07.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.01.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.04.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.03.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.07.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2021/01] | 20.08.2020 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2021/01] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 24.01.2017 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.07.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.07.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.07.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 24.07.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 11.07.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2020 | 08   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]EP1884408 (AUDI AG [DE]) [A] 1,7-9,11,12 * paragraphs [0001] , [0006] , [0007] , [0009] , [0011] , [0012] , [0014] - [0016] - [0019] , [0020]; figure 1 *; | [A]EP1946967 (AUDI AG [DE]) [A] 1,6,7,11 * paragraphs [0001] , [0004] - [0006] - [0007] , [0010] , [0012] - [0016] - [0018]; figure 1 *; | [X]EP2174833 (MAN NUTZFAHRZEUGE AG [DE]) [X] 1,2,4,6-9,11,12 * paragraphs [0001] , [0005] , [0007] - [0009] - [0011] - [0022] - [0025] , [0027] - [0045]; figures 1,2 *; | [XY]US2010302020 (LENNEMAN JOHN K [US], et al) [X] 1-3,6-9,11-13 * paragraphs [0001] - [0006] - [0015] - [0039]; figures 1-7 * [Y] 5,10; | [YA]DE102010003270 (BAYERISCHE MOTOREN WERKE AG [DE]) [Y] 5,10 * paragraphs [0001] , [0003] , [0005] , [0006] , [0008] - [0014] - [0019] - [0021]; figure 1 * [A] 1,6,9,11; | [A]DE102010003273 (BAYERISCHE MOTOREN WERKE AG [DE]) [A] 1-13* paragraphs [0001] , [0005] , [0007] , [0008] , [0013] , [0016] - [0020]; figure 1 * |