EP2877842 - CAPACITIVE DEVICE FOR MEASURING THE MOISTURE CONTENT OF SOIL AND HAVING A POROUS ACCESS ELEMENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 20.10.2017 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 20.01.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.10.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 22.11.2017 [2017/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Alfred Kärcher GmbH & Co. KG Alfred-Kärcher-Strasse 28-40 71364 Winnenden / DE | [2015/23] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BENZLER, Gottfried Gartenstrasse 1 71737 Kirchberg / DE | 02 /
BECK, Bernhard Hopfauer Strasse 27 70563 Stuttgart / DE | 03 /
MANOCCHIO, Daniel Steinweg 19 71364 Winnenden / DE | 04 /
REEß, Christine Lilienweg 18 71397 Leutenbach / DE | [2015/28] |
Former [2015/23] | 01 /
BENZLER, Gottfried Gartenstrasse 1 71737 Kirchberg / DE | ||
02 /
BECK, Bernhard Hopfauer Strasse 27 70563 Stuttgart / DE | |||
03 /
MANOCCHIO, Daniel Seehalde 10 71364 Winnenden / DE | |||
04 /
REEß, Christine Lilienweg 18 71397 Leutenbach / DE | Representative(s) | Hoeger, Stellrecht & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Uhlandstrasse 14c 70182 Stuttgart / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2015/23] | Hoeger, Stellrecht & Partner Patentanwälte Uhlandstrasse 14c 70182 Stuttgart / DE | Application number, filing date | 13736869.2 | 08.07.2013 | WO2013EP64363 | Priority number, date | DE201210106841 | 27.07.2012 Original published format: DE102012106841 | [2015/23] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014016106 | Date: | 30.01.2014 | Language: | DE | [2014/05] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2877842 | Date: | 03.06.2015 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.01.2014 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2015/23] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 30.01.2014 | Classification | IPC: | G01N27/22 | [2015/23] | CPC: |
G01N27/223 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/23] | Title | German: | KAPAZITIVE BODENFEUCHTIGKEITS -MESSVORRICHTUNG MIT PORÖSEM ZUGANGSELEMENT | [2015/23] | English: | CAPACITIVE DEVICE FOR MEASURING THE MOISTURE CONTENT OF SOIL AND HAVING A POROUS ACCESS ELEMENT | [2015/23] | French: | DISPOSITIF CAPACITIF DE MESURE DE L'HUMIDITÉ DU SOL AVEC ÉLÉMENT D'ACCÈS POREUX | [2015/23] | Entry into regional phase | 21.01.2015 | National basic fee paid | 21.01.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.01.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.01.2015 | Examination requested [2015/23] | 09.10.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 24.01.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.06.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2017/47] | 27.06.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2017/47] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 24.01.2017 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.07.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.07.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2017 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [IDY]DE1673046 (SIEMENS AG) [ID] 1,2,5,6,12,13,15-25,27 * the whole document * [Y] 26; | [I]US4909070 (SMITH JEFFERY B [AU]) [I] 1-4,7-12,14 * column 2; figure - *; | [I]WO2006081693 (HDIC GMBH [CH], et al) [I] 1 * paragraphs [0040] , [0051] *; | [Y]ES2116215 (ZUNIGA ESCOBAR ORLANDO [ES], et al) [Y] 26 * figure 1 *; | [A]WO2008009330 (TESTO AG [DE], et al) [A] 1-27 * claim - *; | [A]EP1318395 (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR]) [A] 1-27 * paragraphs [0030] , [0031] *; | [A]US3181098 (RICHARDS LORENZO A) [A] 1-27 * the whole document *; | [A]DE19708053 (UST UMWELTSENSORTECHNIK GMBH [DE]) [A] 1-27 * the whole document *; | [A] - Ronald T Atkins ET AL, "Soil Moisture Determinations Using Capacitance Probe Methodology", (19980219), URL: http://www.dtic.mil/cgi-bin/GetTRDoc?AD=ADA337497, (20130906), XP055078036 [A] 1-27 * the whole document * | [A] - Pall Corporation, "Pall Aerolith Poröse Keramik", UK, (20110301), URL: http://donar.messe.de/exhibitor/hannovermesse/2013/E370326/produkt-information-aerolith-ger-213147.pdf, (20130909), XP055078303 [A] 1-27 * the whole document * | by applicant | DE1673046 | WO2010097689 | US2008202220 | US2011043230 | US2010251807 | DE10202198 | DE102009014146 | EP0259012 | US2941174 | EP1844323 |