Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2864528

EP2864528 - LINING FOR SURFACES OF A REFRACTORY CRUCIBLE FOR PURIFICATION OF SILICON MELT AND METHOD OF PURIFICATION OF THE SILICON MELT USING THAT CRUCIBLE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  11.05.2018
Database last updated on 19.07.2019
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  04.02.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip11.05.2018Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 13.06.2018  [2018/24]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Silicor Materials Inc.
1750 Lundy Avenue, Nº 610220
San Jose, CA 95161 / US
[2015/18]
Inventor(s)01 / TURENNE, Alain
141 Stirling Ave. North
Kitchener, Ontario N2H 3G9 / CA
02 / ALFRED, Christain
Unit B 1 Royal Gate Blvd.
Vaughan, Ontario L4L 8Z7 / CA
 [2015/18]
Representative(s)V.O.
P.O. Box 87930
2508 DH Den Haag / NL
[N/P]
Former [2015/18]Jansen, Cornelis Marinus , et al
V.O.
Johan de Wittlaan 7
2517 JR Den Haag / NL
Application number, filing date13737029.224.06.2013
WO2013US47312
Priority number, dateUS201261663934P25.06.2012         Original published format: US 201261663934 P
[2015/18]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2014004373
Date:03.01.2014
Language:EN
[2014/01]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2864528
Date:29.04.2015
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.01.2014
[2015/18]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP03.01.2014
ClassificationInternational:C30B11/00, C30B9/06, C30B35/00, C01B33/037
[2015/18]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2015/18]
TitleGerman:AUSKLEIDUNG FÜR DIE OBERFLÄCHE EINES FEUERFESTEN TIEGELS ZUR REINIGUNG VON GESCHMOLZENEM SILICIUM SOWIE VERFAHREN ZUR REINIGUNG VON GESCHMOLZENEM SILICIUM MIT DIESEM TIEGEL[2015/18]
English:LINING FOR SURFACES OF A REFRACTORY CRUCIBLE FOR PURIFICATION OF SILICON MELT AND METHOD OF PURIFICATION OF THE SILICON MELT USING THAT CRUCIBLE[2015/18]
French:REVÊTEMENT DE SURFACES D'UN CREUSET RÉFRACTAIRE POUR LA PURIFICATION D'UNE MASSE FONDUE DE SILICIUM ET PROCÉDÉ DE PURIFICATION DE LA MASSE FONDUE DE SILICIUM AU MOYEN DE CE CREUSET[2015/18]
Entry into regional phase13.01.2015National basic fee paid 
13.01.2015Designation fee(s) paid 
13.01.2015Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure13.01.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
13.01.2015Examination requested  [2015/18]
03.01.2018Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2018/24]
05.02.2018Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time  [2018/24]
Fees paidRenewal fee
29.06.2015Renewal fee patent year 03
27.06.2016Renewal fee patent year 04
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.06.201705   M06   Not yet paid
Cited inInternational search[A]US2012119407  (NICHOL SCOTT [CA], et al) [A] 1;
 [XY]US2008292791  (BEWLAY BERNARD PATRICK [US], et al) [X] 1-3,5,6,9 * paragraphs [0002] , [0007] , [0021] , [0025] - [0027] - [0029]; figures 3,4 * [Y] 10-12,14,17-24;
 [X]WO0063630  (MOLTECH INVENT SA [LU], et al) [X] 1,4,7 * abstract * * page 6, lines 31-36 * * page 9, line 29 - page 10, line 15 * * page 1, lines 2-5 *;
 [IY]WO02096830  (MOLTECH INVENT SA [LU], et al) [I] 1-5,7,8 * page 1, lines 6-10 * * page 12, lines 38,42-44 * * page 5, line 44 - page 6, line 15; examples 1,1a,4 * [Y] 13,15,16;
 [Y]US2011044877  (TURENNE ALAIN [CA], et al) [Y] 10-24 * paragraphs [0063] , [0104]; figure 1; claims 1,2,3,16 *;
 [X]US5364513  (SEKHAR JAINAGESH A [US], et al) [X] 1,7,8 * abstract * * column 1, lines 17-20 * * column 4, lines 47-49,52,62,57-58 * * column 6, lines 19-21,50-53 *;
 [A]US4312847  (DAWLESS ROBERT K) [A] 1;
 [A]US5297615  (AIMONE PAUL R [US], et al) [A] 1;
 [A]US5296288  (KOURTIDES DEMETRIUS A [US], et al) [A] 1