Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2858909

EP2858909 - CARTON SIZING METHOD AND SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2015/16]CONTAINER SIZING METHOD AND SYSTEM
[2019/27]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  22.11.2019
Database last updated on 25.02.2020
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  02.07.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip10.01.2020Change - divisional application(s)published on 12.02.2020  [2020/07]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
WestRock Linkx Systems Limited
Millenium Way West
Phoenix Centre
Nottingham, Nottinghamshire NG8 6AW / GB
[2019/19]
Former [2015/16]For all designated states
Linkx Systems Limited
Anson House
Anson Way
Ellough Industrial Estate
Ellough
Beccles, Suffolk NR34 7TL / GB
Inventor(s)01 / BENTERMAN, Daniel
c/o Linkx Systems Limited
Anson House
Anson Way
Ellough
Beccles Suffolk NR34 7TL / GB
02 / HAYWARD, David
c/o Linkx Systems Limited
Anson House
Anson Way
Ellough
Beccles Suffolk NR34 7TL / GB
 [2015/16]
Representative(s)Coulson, Elizabeth Eve
Coulson & Rule
13 Whitehall Road
Rugby, Warwickshire CV21 3AE / GB
[2019/52]
Former [2015/16]Lessard, Jason Donat
HGF Limited
Belgrave Hall
Belgrave Street
Leeds LS2 8DD / GB
Application number, filing date13737351.004.06.2013
[2019/52]
WO2013GB51479
Priority number, dateGB2012001017008.06.2012         Original published format: GB 201210170
[2015/16]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013182845
Date:12.12.2013
Language:EN
[2013/50]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2858909
Date:15.04.2015
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.12.2013
[2015/16]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2858909
Date:25.12.2019
Language:EN
[2019/52]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP12.12.2013
ClassificationInternational:B65B59/02
[2015/16]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2015/16]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN UND APPARAT ZUR GRÖSSENANPASSUNG VON KARTONS[2019/27]
English:CARTON SIZING METHOD AND SYSTEM[2019/27]
French:PROCÉDÉ ET SYSTÈME POUR ADAPTER LA TAILLE DES CARTONS[2019/27]
Former [2015/16]CONTAINERSCHLICHTUNGSVERFAHREN UND -SYSTEM
Former [2015/16]CONTAINER SIZING METHOD AND SYSTEM
Former [2015/16]PROCÉDÉ ET SYSTÈME DE DIMENSIONNEMENT DE RÉCIPIENTS
Entry into regional phase07.01.2015National basic fee paid 
07.01.2015Designation fee(s) paid 
07.01.2015Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure07.01.2015Examination requested  [2015/16]
11.08.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
03.07.2019Communication of intention to grant the patent
13.11.2019Fee for grant paid
13.11.2019Fee for publishing/printing paid
13.11.2019Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)EP19218705.2
The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  03.07.2019
Fees paidRenewal fee
15.05.2015Renewal fee patent year 03
18.05.2016Renewal fee patent year 04
26.05.2017Renewal fee patent year 05
25.05.2018Renewal fee patent year 06
27.06.2019Renewal fee patent year 07
Cited inInternational search[Y]US2009031676  (BOIGUES MICHEL [FR], et al) [Y] 1-18 * the whole document *;
 [YD]EP0645309  (SAVOYE NOUVELLE SOCIETE ANONYM [FR]) [YD] 1-18 * the whole document *;
 [A]EP1832413  (SAVOYE [FR]) [A] 1-18 * the whole document *;
 [A]WO2005000570  (HULVERSCHEIDT ANNA MADELEINE [DE], et al) [A] 3,7 * page 11, lines 1-4; figure 4 * * page 15, line 21 - line 24 *
by applicantEP0645309
 FR2612885
 FR2606367
 US3953956