EP2856341 - PROVIDING ASSISTANCE WITH REPORTING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 13.03.2020 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 18.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.03.2020 | Withdrawal of application | published on 15.04.2020 [2020/16] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Koninklijke Philips N.V. High Tech Campus 52 5656 AG Eindhoven / NL | [2020/12] |
Former [2015/15] | For all designated states Koninklijke Philips N.V. High Tech Campus 5 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BUURMAN, Johannes c/o High Tech Campus Building 5 NL-5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | 02 /
SERLIE, Iwo Willem Oscar c/o High Tech Campus Building 5 NL-5656AE Eindhoven / NL | 03 /
ALEKSOVSKI, Zarko c/o High Tech Campus Building 5 NL-5656AE Eindhoven / NL | 04 /
MARTHERUS, Rudolph c/o High Tech Campus Building 5 NL-5656AE Eindhoven / NL | [2015/15] | Representative(s) | Philips Intellectual Property & Standards High Tech Campus 52 5656 AG Eindhoven / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2015/15] | Steffen, Thomas Philips International B.V. Intellectual Property & Standards High Tech Campus 5 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | Application number, filing date | 13737393.2 | 27.05.2013 | WO2013IB54358 | Priority number, date | US201261652909P | 30.05.2012 Original published format: US 201261652909 P | EP20120170023 | 30.05.2012 Original published format: EP 12170023 | [2015/15] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2013179200 | Date: | 05.12.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/49] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2856341 | Date: | 08.04.2015 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.12.2013 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2015/15] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 05.12.2013 | Classification | IPC: | G06F17/24, G06F17/22 | [2015/15] | CPC: |
G06F40/131 (EP,US);
G06F40/40 (US);
G06F40/174 (EP,US);
G16H15/00 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/15] | Title | German: | BEREITSTELLUNG VON HILFE BEI BERICHTERSTATTUNGEN | [2015/15] | English: | PROVIDING ASSISTANCE WITH REPORTING | [2015/15] | French: | OBTENTION D'ASSISTANCE AVEC LE RAPPORT | [2015/15] | Entry into regional phase | 05.01.2015 | National basic fee paid | 05.01.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.01.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.11.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 05.01.2015 | Examination requested [2015/15] | 09.06.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 18.11.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.03.2020 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 05.03.2020 | 05.03.2020 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 09.03.2020 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2020/16] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 09.06.2016 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.06.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.05.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.05.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 01.06.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.05.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]WO9837478 (ACTIONEER INC [US]) [A] 1,5,9,11 * abstract *; | [A]WO9917223 (IHC HEALTH SERVICES INC [US]) [A] 1,5,9-11 * abstract *; | [I]WO2010109351 (KONINKL PHILIPS ELECTRONICS NV [NL], et al) [I] 1-11 * abstract * * page 3, line 15 - page 4, line 22 * * page 6, line 10 - page 7, line 7 *; | [A]WO2011036585 (KONINKL PHILIPS ELECTRONICS NV [NL], et al) [A] 1,5,9-11* abstract * | by applicant | - S.L. ZIMMERMAN ET AL., "Automated Structured Reporting of Imaging Findings Using the AIM Standard and XML", RADIOGRAPHICS, (2011), vol. 31, pages 881 - 887 |