EP2865187 - IDENTIFYING MEDIA ON A MOBILE DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 15.06.2017 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 31.01.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.06.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 07.06.2017 [2017/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Google Technology Holdings LLC 1600 Amphitheatre Parkway Mountain View, CA 94043 / US | [2017/13] |
Former [2015/18] | For all designated states Motorola Mobility LLC 600 North US Highway 45 Libertyville, IL 60048 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LI, Renxiang 290 Stone Avenue Lake Zurich, Illinois 60047 / US | 02 /
BAUM, Kevin L. 3450 Richnee Lane Rolling Meadows, Illinois 60008 / US | 03 /
ISHTIAQ, Faisal 5415 N. Sheridan Chicago, Illinois 60640 / US | 04 /
NEEDHAM, Michael L. 354 W. Helen Road Palatine, Illinois 60067 / US | [2015/18] | Representative(s) | Boult Wade Tennant LLP Salisbury Square House 8 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8AP / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2015/18] | Shipp, Nicholas Kilburn & Strode LLP 20 Red Lion Street London WC1R 4PJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 13737481.5 | 25.06.2013 | WO2013US47694 | Priority number, date | US201213533247 | 26.06.2012 Original published format: US201213533247 | [2015/18] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2014004567 | Date: | 03.01.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/01] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2865187 | Date: | 29.04.2015 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.01.2014 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2015/18] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 06.03.2014 | Classification | IPC: | H04N21/234 | [2015/18] | CPC: |
H04N21/23418 (EP,KR,US);
H04N21/4394 (EP,KR,US);
H04N21/4126 (EP,KR,US);
H04N21/42203 (EP,US);
H04N21/4223 (EP,KR,US);
H04N21/44008 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/18] | Title | German: | MEDIENIDENTIFIZIERUNG AUF EINER MOBILEN VORRICHTUNG | [2015/18] | English: | IDENTIFYING MEDIA ON A MOBILE DEVICE | [2015/18] | French: | IDENTIFICATION DE MÉDIA SUR UN DISPOSITIF MOBILE | [2015/18] | Entry into regional phase | 13.01.2015 | National basic fee paid | 13.01.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.01.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.01.2015 | Examination requested [2015/18] | 20.08.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 03.01.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2017/23] | 01.02.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2017/23] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.06.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2016 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US2009077252 (ABDO NADIM Y [US], et al) [A] 5,6,11-15,17-21 * abstract * * paragraphs [0013] , [0 23] , [0 49] *; | [A]US2011087490 (OLSON KENNETH [US]) [A] 1-21* abstract *; | [XY]US2011246495 (MALLINSON DOMINIC S [US]) [X] 1-4,7-10,16 * abstract * * paragraphs [0005] - [0009] - [0 24] - [0027] - [0 39] , [0 42] , [0 49] * [Y] 5,6,11-15,17-21; | [Y]US2012079059 (FONSECA JR BENEDITO J [US], et al) [Y] 5,6,11-15,17-21 * abstract * |