Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2868016

EP2868016 - TRANSMIT DIVERSITY INTERFERENCE SIGNAL COMBINING FOR INTERFERENCE CANCELLATION [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  29.03.2019
Database last updated on 16.11.2019
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  20.04.2018
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  04.12.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip15.11.2019Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): AL
published on 18.12.2019 [2019/51]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Qualcomm Incorporated
5775 Morehouse Drive
San Diego, CA 92121 / US
[2015/19]
Inventor(s)01 / HUANG, Yi
5775 Morehouse Drive
San Diego, California 92121-1714 / US
02 / LUO, Tao
5775 Morehouse Drive
San Diego, California 92121 / US
03 / CHEN, Wanshi
5775 Morehouse Drive
San Diego, California 92121 / US
04 / MALLIK, Siddhartha
5775 Morehouse Drive
San Diego, California 92121 / US
 [2015/19]
Representative(s)Dunlop, Hugh Christopher , et al
Maucher Jenkins
26 Caxton Street
London SW1H 0RJ / GB
[2018/21]
Former [2015/19]Dunlop, Hugh Christopher , et al
RGC Jenkins & Co.
26 Caxton Street
London SW1H 0RJ / GB
Application number, filing date13737740.427.06.2013
[2018/21]
WO2013US48330
Priority number, dateUS201261666680P29.06.2012         Original published format: US 201261666680 P
US20131392825626.06.2013         Original published format: US201313928256
[2015/19]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2014004915
Date:03.01.2014
Language:EN
[2014/01]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2868016
Date:06.05.2015
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.01.2014
[2015/19]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2868016
Date:23.05.2018
Language:EN
[2018/21]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP03.01.2014
ClassificationInternational:H04J11/00, H04B1/7107, H04B7/06
[2017/51]
Former International [2015/19]H04J11/00
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2015/19]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:SENDEDIVERSITÄTS-INTERFERENZSIGNALKOMBINATION ZUR INTERFERENZUNTERDRÜCKUNG[2015/19]
English:TRANSMIT DIVERSITY INTERFERENCE SIGNAL COMBINING FOR INTERFERENCE CANCELLATION[2015/19]
French:COMBINAISON DE SIGNAL D'INTERFÉRENCE À DIVERSITÉ DE TRANSMISSION POUR ANNULATION D'INTERFÉRENCE[2015/19]
Entry into regional phase08.12.2014National basic fee paid 
08.12.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
08.12.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure08.12.2014Examination requested  [2015/19]
16.07.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
05.12.2017Communication of intention to grant the patent
12.04.2018Fee for grant paid
12.04.2018Fee for publishing/printing paid
12.04.2018Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  05.12.2017
Opposition(s)26.02.2019No opposition filed within time limit [2019/18]
Fees paidRenewal fee
15.04.2015Renewal fee patent year 03
31.03.2016Renewal fee patent year 04
08.06.2017Renewal fee patent year 05
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAL23.05.2018
AT23.05.2018
CZ23.05.2018
DK23.05.2018
EE23.05.2018
ES23.05.2018
FI23.05.2018
HR23.05.2018
IT23.05.2018
LT23.05.2018
LV23.05.2018
MC23.05.2018
NL23.05.2018
PL23.05.2018
RO23.05.2018
RS23.05.2018
SE23.05.2018
SI23.05.2018
SK23.05.2018
SM23.05.2018
IE27.06.2018
LU27.06.2018
BE30.06.2018
CH30.06.2018
LI30.06.2018
BG23.08.2018
NO23.08.2018
GR24.08.2018
[2019/51]
Former [2019/26]AT23.05.2018
CZ23.05.2018
DK23.05.2018
EE23.05.2018
ES23.05.2018
FI23.05.2018
HR23.05.2018
IT23.05.2018
LT23.05.2018
LV23.05.2018
MC23.05.2018
NL23.05.2018
PL23.05.2018
RO23.05.2018
RS23.05.2018
SE23.05.2018
SI23.05.2018
SK23.05.2018
SM23.05.2018
IE27.06.2018
LU27.06.2018
BE30.06.2018
CH30.06.2018
LI30.06.2018
BG23.08.2018
NO23.08.2018
GR24.08.2018
Former [2019/24]AT23.05.2018
CZ23.05.2018
DK23.05.2018
EE23.05.2018
ES23.05.2018
FI23.05.2018
HR23.05.2018
IT23.05.2018
LT23.05.2018
LV23.05.2018
MC23.05.2018
NL23.05.2018
PL23.05.2018
RO23.05.2018
RS23.05.2018
SE23.05.2018
SK23.05.2018
SM23.05.2018
IE27.06.2018
LU27.06.2018
BE30.06.2018
CH30.06.2018
LI30.06.2018
BG23.08.2018
NO23.08.2018
GR24.08.2018
Former [2019/21]AT23.05.2018
CZ23.05.2018
DK23.05.2018
EE23.05.2018
ES23.05.2018
FI23.05.2018
HR23.05.2018
IT23.05.2018
LT23.05.2018
LV23.05.2018
MC23.05.2018
NL23.05.2018
PL23.05.2018
RO23.05.2018
RS23.05.2018
SE23.05.2018
SK23.05.2018
SM23.05.2018
IE27.06.2018
LU27.06.2018
CH30.06.2018
LI30.06.2018
BG23.08.2018
NO23.08.2018
GR24.08.2018
Former [2019/19]AT23.05.2018
CZ23.05.2018
DK23.05.2018
EE23.05.2018
ES23.05.2018
FI23.05.2018
HR23.05.2018
IT23.05.2018
LT23.05.2018
LV23.05.2018
MC23.05.2018
NL23.05.2018
PL23.05.2018
RO23.05.2018
RS23.05.2018
SE23.05.2018
SK23.05.2018
SM23.05.2018
IE27.06.2018
LU27.06.2018
BG23.08.2018
NO23.08.2018
GR24.08.2018
Former [2019/17]AT23.05.2018
CZ23.05.2018
DK23.05.2018
EE23.05.2018
ES23.05.2018
FI23.05.2018
HR23.05.2018
IT23.05.2018
LT23.05.2018
LV23.05.2018
MC23.05.2018
NL23.05.2018
PL23.05.2018
RO23.05.2018
RS23.05.2018
SE23.05.2018
SK23.05.2018
SM23.05.2018
LU27.06.2018
BG23.08.2018
NO23.08.2018
GR24.08.2018
Former [2019/15]AT23.05.2018
CZ23.05.2018
DK23.05.2018
EE23.05.2018
ES23.05.2018
FI23.05.2018
HR23.05.2018
IT23.05.2018
LT23.05.2018
LV23.05.2018
MC23.05.2018
NL23.05.2018
PL23.05.2018
RO23.05.2018
RS23.05.2018
SE23.05.2018
SK23.05.2018
SM23.05.2018
BG23.08.2018
NO23.08.2018
GR24.08.2018
Former [2019/11]AT23.05.2018
CZ23.05.2018
DK23.05.2018
EE23.05.2018
ES23.05.2018
FI23.05.2018
HR23.05.2018
IT23.05.2018
LT23.05.2018
LV23.05.2018
NL23.05.2018
PL23.05.2018
RO23.05.2018
RS23.05.2018
SE23.05.2018
SK23.05.2018
SM23.05.2018
BG23.08.2018
NO23.08.2018
GR24.08.2018
Former [2019/10]AT23.05.2018
CZ23.05.2018
DK23.05.2018
EE23.05.2018
ES23.05.2018
FI23.05.2018
HR23.05.2018
LT23.05.2018
LV23.05.2018
NL23.05.2018
PL23.05.2018
RO23.05.2018
RS23.05.2018
SE23.05.2018
SK23.05.2018
BG23.08.2018
NO23.08.2018
GR24.08.2018
Former [2019/09]DK23.05.2018
EE23.05.2018
ES23.05.2018
FI23.05.2018
HR23.05.2018
LT23.05.2018
LV23.05.2018
NL23.05.2018
RS23.05.2018
SE23.05.2018
BG23.08.2018
NO23.08.2018
GR24.08.2018
Former [2019/08]DK23.05.2018
ES23.05.2018
FI23.05.2018
HR23.05.2018
LT23.05.2018
LV23.05.2018
NL23.05.2018
RS23.05.2018
SE23.05.2018
BG23.08.2018
NO23.08.2018
GR24.08.2018
Former [2018/52]ES23.05.2018
FI23.05.2018
HR23.05.2018
LT23.05.2018
LV23.05.2018
NL23.05.2018
RS23.05.2018
SE23.05.2018
BG23.08.2018
NO23.08.2018
GR24.08.2018
Former [2018/51]ES23.05.2018
FI23.05.2018
HR23.05.2018
LT23.05.2018
LV23.05.2018
RS23.05.2018
SE23.05.2018
BG23.08.2018
NO23.08.2018
Former [2018/50]ES23.05.2018
FI23.05.2018
HR23.05.2018
LT23.05.2018
SE23.05.2018
BG23.08.2018
NO23.08.2018
Former [2018/49]ES23.05.2018
FI23.05.2018
LT23.05.2018
SE23.05.2018
BG23.08.2018
NO23.08.2018
Former [2018/47]ES23.05.2018
FI23.05.2018
LT23.05.2018
NO23.08.2018
Cited inInternational search[X]US2005276313  (HORNEMAN KARI [FI], et al) [X] 1-26 * paragraph [0047] - paragraph [0050]; figure 3 *;
 [X]US2011064172  (OLSON ERIC S [US], et al) [X] 1-26 * paragraph [0009] * * paragraph [0112] - paragraph [0113] * * paragraph [0115] - paragraph [0116] *;
 [A]EP1971096  (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR]) [A] 1-26 * paragraph [0076] *