Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2854918

EP2854918 - IN-EXSUFFLATION THERAPY AUTO-ADJUSTMENT [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  13.04.2018
Database last updated on 23.01.2020
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  18.09.2017
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  17.03.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip17.01.2020Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): MT
published on 19.02.2020 [2020/08]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Koninklijke Philips N.V.
High Tech Campus 5
5656 AE Eindhoven / NL
[2018/20]
Former [2015/15]For all designated states
Koninklijke Philips N.V.
High Tech Campus 5
5656 AE Eindhoven / NL
Inventor(s)01 / LEE, Seunghyun
c/o High Tech Campus Building 5
5656 AE Eindhoven / NL
02 / NATHAN, April, Stewart
c/o High Tech Campus Building 5
5656AE Eindhoven / NL
 [2015/15]
Representative(s)Philips Intellectual Property & Standards
High Tech Campus 5
5656 AE Eindhoven / NL
[N/P]
Former [2018/20]Steffen, Thomas
Philips Intellectual Property & Standards
High Tech Campus 5
5656 AE Eindhoven / NL
Former [2015/15]Steffen, Thomas
Philips International B.V.
Intellectual Property & Standards
High Tech Campus 5
5656 AE Eindhoven / NL
Application number, filing date13737855.024.05.2013
[2018/20]
WO2013IB54289
Priority number, dateUS201261655546P05.06.2012         Original published format: US 201261655546 P
[2015/15]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013182944
Date:12.12.2013
Language:EN
[2013/50]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2854918
Date:08.04.2015
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.12.2013
[2015/15]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2854918
Date:16.05.2018
Language:EN
[2018/20]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP12.12.2013
ClassificationInternational:A61M16/00, A61B5/00
[2015/15]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2015/15]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:AUTOANPASSUNG VON IN-EXSUFFLATIONS-THERAPIE[2015/15]
English:IN-EXSUFFLATION THERAPY AUTO-ADJUSTMENT[2015/15]
French:AUTO-AJUSTEMENT DE THÉRAPIE D'INSUFFLATION/EXSUFFLATION[2015/15]
Entry into regional phase05.01.2015National basic fee paid 
05.01.2015Designation fee(s) paid 
05.01.2015Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure05.01.2015Examination requested  [2015/15]
29.07.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
16.03.2017Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
31.07.2017Reply to a communication from the examining division
19.09.2017Communication of intention to grant the patent
27.09.2017Observations by third parties
09.10.2017Observations by third parties
19.01.2018Fee for grant paid
19.01.2018Fee for publishing/printing paid
19.01.2018Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  16.03.2017
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  15.02.2019  20.02.2019  ADMISSIBLE
BOTTI & FERRARI S.R.L.
Via Cappellini, 11
I-20124 Milano / IT
Opponent's representative
Ferrari, Barbara
Botti & Ferrari S.r.l. Via Cappellini, 11
20124 Milano / IT
 [2019/13]
04.03.2019Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
02.07.2019Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
25.06.2020Date of oral proceedings
Request for further processing for:The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report
31.07.2017Request for further processing filed
31.07.2017Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
09.08.2017Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
01.06.2015Renewal fee patent year 03
31.05.2016Renewal fee patent year 04
31.05.2017Renewal fee patent year 05
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAL16.05.2018
AT16.05.2018
CZ16.05.2018
DK16.05.2018
EE16.05.2018
ES16.05.2018
FI16.05.2018
HR16.05.2018
IT16.05.2018
LT16.05.2018
LV16.05.2018
MC16.05.2018
NL16.05.2018
PL16.05.2018
RO16.05.2018
RS16.05.2018
SE16.05.2018
SI16.05.2018
SK16.05.2018
SM16.05.2018
IE24.05.2018
LU24.05.2018
MT24.05.2018
BE31.05.2018
CH31.05.2018
LI31.05.2018
BG16.08.2018
GB16.08.2018
NO16.08.2018
GR17.08.2018
[2020/08]
Former [2019/51]AL16.05.2018
AT16.05.2018
CZ16.05.2018
DK16.05.2018
EE16.05.2018
ES16.05.2018
FI16.05.2018
HR16.05.2018
IT16.05.2018
LT16.05.2018
LV16.05.2018
MC16.05.2018
NL16.05.2018
PL16.05.2018
RO16.05.2018
RS16.05.2018
SE16.05.2018
SI16.05.2018
SK16.05.2018
SM16.05.2018
IE24.05.2018
LU24.05.2018
BE31.05.2018
CH31.05.2018
LI31.05.2018
BG16.08.2018
GB16.08.2018
NO16.08.2018
GR17.08.2018
Former [2019/47]AT16.05.2018
CZ16.05.2018
DK16.05.2018
EE16.05.2018
ES16.05.2018
FI16.05.2018
HR16.05.2018
IT16.05.2018
LT16.05.2018
LV16.05.2018
MC16.05.2018
NL16.05.2018
PL16.05.2018
RO16.05.2018
RS16.05.2018
SE16.05.2018
SI16.05.2018
SK16.05.2018
SM16.05.2018
IE24.05.2018
LU24.05.2018
BE31.05.2018
CH31.05.2018
LI31.05.2018
BG16.08.2018
GB16.08.2018
NO16.08.2018
GR17.08.2018
Former [2019/26]AT16.05.2018
CZ16.05.2018
DK16.05.2018
EE16.05.2018
ES16.05.2018
FI16.05.2018
HR16.05.2018
IT16.05.2018
LT16.05.2018
LV16.05.2018
MC16.05.2018
NL16.05.2018
PL16.05.2018
RO16.05.2018
RS16.05.2018
SE16.05.2018
SI16.05.2018
SK16.05.2018
SM16.05.2018
IE24.05.2018
LU24.05.2018
BE31.05.2018
CH31.05.2018
LI31.05.2018
BG16.08.2018
NO16.08.2018
GR17.08.2018
Former [2019/24]AT16.05.2018
CZ16.05.2018
DK16.05.2018
EE16.05.2018
ES16.05.2018
FI16.05.2018
HR16.05.2018
IT16.05.2018
LT16.05.2018
LV16.05.2018
MC16.05.2018
NL16.05.2018
PL16.05.2018
RO16.05.2018
RS16.05.2018
SE16.05.2018
SK16.05.2018
SM16.05.2018
IE24.05.2018
LU24.05.2018
BE31.05.2018
CH31.05.2018
LI31.05.2018
BG16.08.2018
NO16.08.2018
GR17.08.2018
Former [2019/19]AT16.05.2018
CZ16.05.2018
DK16.05.2018
EE16.05.2018
ES16.05.2018
FI16.05.2018
HR16.05.2018
IT16.05.2018
LT16.05.2018
LV16.05.2018
MC16.05.2018
NL16.05.2018
PL16.05.2018
RO16.05.2018
RS16.05.2018
SE16.05.2018
SK16.05.2018
SM16.05.2018
IE24.05.2018
LU24.05.2018
CH31.05.2018
LI31.05.2018
BG16.08.2018
NO16.08.2018
GR17.08.2018
Former [2019/17]AT16.05.2018
CZ16.05.2018
DK16.05.2018
EE16.05.2018
ES16.05.2018
FI16.05.2018
HR16.05.2018
IT16.05.2018
LT16.05.2018
LV16.05.2018
MC16.05.2018
NL16.05.2018
PL16.05.2018
RO16.05.2018
RS16.05.2018
SE16.05.2018
SK16.05.2018
SM16.05.2018
LU24.05.2018
CH31.05.2018
LI31.05.2018
BG16.08.2018
NO16.08.2018
GR17.08.2018
Former [2019/15]AT16.05.2018
CZ16.05.2018
DK16.05.2018
EE16.05.2018
ES16.05.2018
FI16.05.2018
HR16.05.2018
IT16.05.2018
LT16.05.2018
LV16.05.2018
MC16.05.2018
NL16.05.2018
PL16.05.2018
RO16.05.2018
RS16.05.2018
SE16.05.2018
SK16.05.2018
SM16.05.2018
CH31.05.2018
LI31.05.2018
BG16.08.2018
NO16.08.2018
GR17.08.2018
Former [2019/11]AT16.05.2018
CZ16.05.2018
DK16.05.2018
EE16.05.2018
ES16.05.2018
FI16.05.2018
HR16.05.2018
IT16.05.2018
LT16.05.2018
LV16.05.2018
NL16.05.2018
PL16.05.2018
RO16.05.2018
RS16.05.2018
SE16.05.2018
SK16.05.2018
SM16.05.2018
CH31.05.2018
LI31.05.2018
BG16.08.2018
NO16.08.2018
GR17.08.2018
Former [2019/10]AT16.05.2018
CZ16.05.2018
DK16.05.2018
EE16.05.2018
ES16.05.2018
FI16.05.2018
HR16.05.2018
LT16.05.2018
LV16.05.2018
NL16.05.2018
PL16.05.2018
RO16.05.2018
RS16.05.2018
SE16.05.2018
SK16.05.2018
BG16.08.2018
NO16.08.2018
GR17.08.2018
Former [2019/09]DK16.05.2018
EE16.05.2018
ES16.05.2018
FI16.05.2018
HR16.05.2018
LT16.05.2018
LV16.05.2018
NL16.05.2018
RS16.05.2018
SE16.05.2018
BG16.08.2018
NO16.08.2018
GR17.08.2018
Former [2019/08]DK16.05.2018
ES16.05.2018
FI16.05.2018
HR16.05.2018
LT16.05.2018
LV16.05.2018
NL16.05.2018
RS16.05.2018
SE16.05.2018
BG16.08.2018
NO16.08.2018
GR17.08.2018
Former [2018/52]ES16.05.2018
FI16.05.2018
HR16.05.2018
LT16.05.2018
LV16.05.2018
NL16.05.2018
RS16.05.2018
SE16.05.2018
BG16.08.2018
NO16.08.2018
GR17.08.2018
Former [2018/51]ES16.05.2018
FI16.05.2018
HR16.05.2018
LT16.05.2018
LV16.05.2018
RS16.05.2018
SE16.05.2018
BG16.08.2018
NO16.08.2018
Former [2018/50]ES16.05.2018
FI16.05.2018
HR16.05.2018
LT16.05.2018
SE16.05.2018
BG16.08.2018
NO16.08.2018
Former [2018/49]ES16.05.2018
FI16.05.2018
LT16.05.2018
SE16.05.2018
BG16.08.2018
NO16.08.2018
Former [2018/47]ES16.05.2018
FI16.05.2018
LT16.05.2018
NO16.08.2018
Cited inInternational search[XI]WO2007106804  (HUSTER KEITH A [US]; BRANSON GREGORY W [US]; O'NEAL TODD P [US]; YERMA) [X] 11-15 * The whole document, especially paragraphs 0005-0007,0011,0079,0086,00107,00124,00132-00137,00144 * [I] 1-5;
 [A]US4977889  (BUDD JEFFREY R [US]) [A] 1-5,11-15 * the whole document *;
 [A]US2005051174  (EMERSON GEORGE P [US]) [A] 1-5,11-15 * the whole document *;
 [A]WO2010058308  (KONINKL PHILIPS ELECTRONICS NV [NL]; KIMM GARDNER [US]; GARDE SMITA [U) [A] 1-5,11-15 * the whole document *
otherWO2013175394
 WO2010058308
 US2005051174
 WO2011070472
    - DOUGLAS N HOMNICK, "Mechanical Insufflation-Exsufflation for airways mucus clearance", Respiratory Care, (20071000), vol. 52, no. 10, pages 1296 - 1307, XP055419546
OppositionWO2009019339
 WO2010058308
 US2005051174