Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2813367

EP2813367 - PRINTER DEVICE AND PRINTER DEVICE CONTROL METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  13.03.2019
Database last updated on 16.10.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip01.09.2019New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Fujitsu Component Limited
3-5 Higashi-Gotanda 2-chome Shinagawa-ku
Tokyo 141-8630 / JP
[2014/51]
Inventor(s)01 / YAMAGUCHI, Toshio
c/o FUJITSU COMPONENT LIMITED
3-5 Higashi-Gotanda 2-chome
Shinagawa-ku
Tokyo 141-8630 / JP
02 / WATANABE, Sumio
c/o FUJITSU COMPONENT LIMITED
3-5 Higashi-Gotanda 2-chome
Shinagawa-ku
Tokyo 141-8630 / JP
03 / MORI, Yukihiro
c/o FUJITSU COMPONENT LIMITED
3-5 Higashi-Gotanda 2-chome
Shinagawa-ku
Tokyo 141-8630 / JP
04 / KIHARA, Masaru
c/o FUJITSU COMPONENT LIMITED
3-5 Higashi-Gotanda 2-chome
Shinagawa-ku
Tokyo 141-8630 / JP
05 / TSUCHIYA, Masahiro
c/o FUJITSU COMPONENT LIMITED
3-5 Higashi-Gotanda 2-chome
Shinagawa-ku
Tokyo 141-8630 / JP
06 / TAKABATAKE, Yoshinari
c/o FUJITSU COMPONENT LIMITED
3-5 Higashi-Gotanda 2-chome
Shinagawa-ku
Tokyo 141-8630 / JP
07 / ISHIKAWA, Tetsuhiro
c/o FUJITSU COMPONENT LIMITED
3-5 Higashi-Gotanda 2-chome
Shinagawa-ku
Tokyo 141-8630 / JP
 [2014/51]
Representative(s)Haseltine Lake Kempner LLP
Lincoln House, 5th Floor
300 High Holborn
London WC1V 7JH / GB
[N/P]
Former [2014/51]Fenlon, Christine Lesley
Haseltine Lake LLP
Lincoln House, 5th Floor
300 High Holborn
London WC1V 7JH / GB
Application number, filing date13738114.118.01.2013
WO2013JP50997
Priority number, dateJP2012000944019.01.2012         Original published format: JP 2012009440
[2014/51]
Filing languageJA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013108900
Date:25.07.2013
Language:JA
[2013/30]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2813367
Date:17.12.2014
Language:EN
[2014/51]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:JP25.07.2013
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP24.08.2017
ClassificationInternational:B41J15/00, B41J11/70
[2014/51]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/51]
TitleGerman:DRUCKERVORRICHTUNG UND STEUERVERFAHREN FÜR DRUCKERVORRICHTUNG[2014/51]
English:PRINTER DEVICE AND PRINTER DEVICE CONTROL METHOD[2014/51]
French:DISPOSITIF D'IMPRESSION ET SON PROCÉDÉ DE COMMANDE[2014/51]
Entry into regional phase17.07.2014Translation filed 
13.08.2014National basic fee paid 
13.08.2014Search fee paid 
13.08.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
13.08.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure13.08.2014Examination requested  [2014/51]
22.03.2018Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
14.03.2019Communication of intention to grant the patent
02.09.2019Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  14.03.2019
Fees paidRenewal fee
30.01.2015Renewal fee patent year 03
28.01.2016Renewal fee patent year 04
30.01.2017Renewal fee patent year 05
29.01.2018Renewal fee patent year 06
29.01.2019Renewal fee patent year 07
Documents cited:Search[X]JP2002086823  (BROTHER IND LTD) [X] 1-5 * abstract *;
 [XI]US6178863  (KOBAYASHI AKIRA [JP] ET AL) [X] 1 * column 8 - column 9, line 47; figures 2,4 * [I] 8;
 [X]US5278579  (KERR ROGER S [US] ET AL) [X] 1 * column 7, line 66 - column 11, line 22; figures 1,2 *;
 [X]JP2010173822  (CITIZEN HOLDINGS CO LTD; CITIZEN SYSTEMS JAPAN CO LTD) [X] 1 * abstract *
International search[A]JPH10273260  (STAR MICRONICS CO., LTD.);
 [A]JP2009179414  (NORITSU KOKI CO., LTD.);
 [A]JP2011240997  (CANON INC.)
by applicantJP2003019845
 JP2007130842