Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2804827

EP2804827 - ELEVATOR [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  01.07.2016
Database last updated on 18.05.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip01.07.2016Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 03.08.2016  [2016/31]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Kone Corporation
Kartanontie 1
00330 Helsinki / FI
[2014/48]
Inventor(s)01 / HAKALA, Tuomo
President States Kamibukuro D102
589 Kamibukuro
939-8071 Toyama / JP
 [2014/48]
Representative(s)Glück Kritzenberger Patentanwälte PartGmbB
Hermann-Köhl-Strasse 2a
93049 Regensburg / DE
[N/P]
Former [2014/48]Graf Glück Kritzenberger
Hermann-Köhl-Strasse 2a
93049 Regensburg / DE
Application number, filing date13738261.015.01.2013
WO2013FI50036
Priority number, dateFI2012000504616.01.2012         Original published format: FI 20125046
[2014/48]
Filing languageFI
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013107930
Date:25.07.2013
Language:EN
[2013/30]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2804827
Date:26.11.2014
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.07.2013
[2014/48]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:FI25.07.2013
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP09.07.2015
ClassificationInternational:B66B5/04, B66B5/26, B66B5/18
[2015/33]
Former International [2014/48]B66B5/04
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/48]
TitleGerman:AUFZUG[2014/48]
English:ELEVATOR[2014/48]
French:ASCENSEUR[2014/48]
Entry into regional phase10.06.2014National basic fee paid 
10.06.2014Search fee paid 
10.06.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
10.06.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure10.06.2014Examination requested  [2014/48]
09.02.2016Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2016/31]
15.03.2016Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2016/31]
Fees paidRenewal fee
23.01.2015Renewal fee patent year 03
27.01.2016Renewal fee patent year 04
Documents cited:Search[XY]JP2005206278  (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP) [X] 1-8 * abstract * * paragraphs [0010] , [0011] , [0012] , [0017] - [0019] * [Y] 9-11;
 [YA]US2010219023  (VALJUS PETTERI [FI], et al) [Y] 9-11 * paragraphs [0039] - [0053]; figures 5-7 * [A] 1;
 [A]US2004178023  (MAURY JULIEN [FR]) [A] 1,9-11 * paragraphs [0005] , [0011] - [0018]; figures 1-4 *
International search[X]JP2005206278  (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP);
 [Y]US2010219023  (VALJUS PETTERI [FI], et al)