Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2806022

EP2806022 - RECOMBINANT MICROORGANISM WITH IMPROVED PUTRESCINE PRODUCTIVITY, AND METHOD FOR PRODUCING PUTRESCINE USING SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  29.03.2019
Database last updated on 20.08.2019
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  20.04.2018
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  05.12.2017
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  16.11.2016
Most recent event   Tooltip24.05.2019Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): SI
published on 26.06.2019  [2019/26]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
CJ Cheiljedang Corporation
330 Dongho-ro
Jung-gu
Seoul 100-400 / KR
[N/P]
Former [2018/21]For all designated states
Cj Cheiljedang Corporation
330 Dongho-ro
Jung-gu
Seoul 100-400 / KR
Former [2014/48]For all designated states
Cj Cheiljedang Corporation
330 Dongho-ro
Jung-gu
Seoul 100-400 / KR
Inventor(s)01 / LEE, Kyoung Min
716 Estarvill 1-cha
1480-5 Gayang-dong
Gangseo-gu
Seoul 157-200 / KR
02 / KIM, Seon Hye
102-104 Songnae Xi Apt.
Songnae-dong
Sosa-gu
Bucheon-si Gyeonggi-do 422-040 / KR
03 / UM, Hye Won
122-101 Hyundai HillState Apt.
176 Maetan-dong
Yeongtong-gu
Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do 443-370 / KR
04 / KANG, Min Sun
102-1504 Hyundai Construction Apt.
Yeoseo-dong
Yeosu-si Jeollanam-do 550-781 / KR
05 / CHOI, Su Jin
1044-21 Pyeongni 1-dong
Seo-gu
Daegu 703-842 / KR
06 / JUNG, Hee Kyoung
324-28 Namgajwa 2-dong
Seodaemun-gu
Seoul 120-806 / KR
07 / JHON, Sung Hoo
203-404 Dosigaebal Apt.
1461 Gayang-dong
Gangseo-gu
Seoul 157-200 / KR
08 / LI, Hongxian
640-5 Deungchon-dong
Gangseo-gu
Seoul 157-840 / KR
09 / GWAK, Won Sik
301 Duckcheon Atp.
13-1 Seoseong-dong
Masanhappo-gu
Changwon-si Gyeongsangnam-do 631-430 / KR
10 / LEE, Chong Ho
103-501 Hyundai I-Park Apt.
Deungchon 2-dong
Gangseo-gu
Seoul 157-794 / KR
11 / YANG, Young Lyeol
1910-101 Haetvitmaeul Apt.
Haengsin-dong
Deokyang-gu
Goyang-si Gyeonggi-do 412-220 / KR
 [2014/48]
Representative(s)Gill, Siân Victoria
Venner Shipley LLP
200 Aldersgate
London EC1A 4HD / GB
[2018/21]
Former [2014/48]Murphy, Colm Damien , et al
Venner Shipley LLP
200 Aldersgate
London EC1A 4HD / GB
Application number, filing date13738280.021.01.2013
[2018/21]
WO2013KR00487
Priority number, dateKR2012000700420.01.2012         Original published format: KR 20120007004
[2014/48]
Filing languageKO
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013109121
Date:25.07.2013
Language:KO
[2013/30]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2806022
Date:26.11.2014
Language:EN
[2014/48]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2806022
Date:23.05.2018
Language:EN
[2018/21]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:KR25.07.2013
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP09.09.2015
ClassificationInternational:C12N1/21, C12N15/60, C12N15/74, C12P13/00
[2014/48]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/48]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:REKOMBINANTER MIKROORGANISMUS MIT VERBESSERTER PUTRESCINPRODUKTIVITÄT UND VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON PUTRESCIN DAMIT[2014/48]
English:RECOMBINANT MICROORGANISM WITH IMPROVED PUTRESCINE PRODUCTIVITY, AND METHOD FOR PRODUCING PUTRESCINE USING SAME[2014/48]
French:MICROORGANISME RECOMBINANT AYANT UNE PRODUCTIVITÉ AMÉLIORÉE DE PUTRESCINE, ET PROCÉDÉ DE PRODUCTION DE PUTRESCINE À L'AIDE DE CELUI-CI[2014/48]
Biological materialThis application mentions deposited biological material, check the file for details
Entry into regional phase13.08.2014Translation filed 
13.08.2014National basic fee paid 
13.08.2014Search fee paid 
13.08.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
13.08.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure13.08.2014Examination requested  [2014/48]
05.04.2016Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
07.07.2016Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
12.01.2017Reply to a communication from the examining division
10.04.2017Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
02.10.2017Reply to a communication from the examining division
06.12.2017Communication of intention to grant the patent
12.04.2018Fee for grant paid
12.04.2018Fee for publishing/printing paid
12.04.2018Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  07.07.2016
Opposition(s)26.02.2019No opposition filed within time limit [2019/18]
Fees paidRenewal fee
23.01.2015Renewal fee patent year 03
18.01.2016Renewal fee patent year 04
19.01.2017Renewal fee patent year 05
22.01.2018Renewal fee patent year 06
Lapses during opposition  TooltipCZ23.05.2018
EE23.05.2018
FI23.05.2018
HR23.05.2018
LT23.05.2018
LV23.05.2018
RO23.05.2018
RS23.05.2018
SE23.05.2018
SI23.05.2018
SK23.05.2018
SM23.05.2018
BG23.08.2018
NO23.08.2018
GR24.08.2018
[2019/26]
Former [2019/11]CZ23.05.2018
EE23.05.2018
FI23.05.2018
HR23.05.2018
LT23.05.2018
LV23.05.2018
RO23.05.2018
RS23.05.2018
SE23.05.2018
SK23.05.2018
SM23.05.2018
BG23.08.2018
NO23.08.2018
GR24.08.2018
Former [2019/10]CZ23.05.2018
EE23.05.2018
FI23.05.2018
HR23.05.2018
LT23.05.2018
LV23.05.2018
RO23.05.2018
RS23.05.2018
SE23.05.2018
SK23.05.2018
BG23.08.2018
NO23.08.2018
GR24.08.2018
Former [2019/09]EE23.05.2018
FI23.05.2018
HR23.05.2018
LT23.05.2018
LV23.05.2018
RS23.05.2018
SE23.05.2018
BG23.08.2018
NO23.08.2018
GR24.08.2018
Former [2018/52]FI23.05.2018
HR23.05.2018
LT23.05.2018
LV23.05.2018
RS23.05.2018
SE23.05.2018
BG23.08.2018
NO23.08.2018
GR24.08.2018
Former [2018/51]FI23.05.2018
HR23.05.2018
LT23.05.2018
LV23.05.2018
RS23.05.2018
SE23.05.2018
BG23.08.2018
NO23.08.2018
Former [2018/50]FI23.05.2018
HR23.05.2018
LT23.05.2018
SE23.05.2018
BG23.08.2018
NO23.08.2018
Former [2018/49]FI23.05.2018
LT23.05.2018
SE23.05.2018
BG23.08.2018
NO23.08.2018
Former [2018/47]FI23.05.2018
LT23.05.2018
NO23.08.2018
Documents cited:Search[A]  - JENS SCHNEIDER ET AL, "Biotechnological production of polyamines by Bacteria: recent achievements and future perspectives", APPLIED MICROBIOLOGY AND BIOTECHNOLOGY, SPRINGER, BERLIN, DE, (20110507), vol. 91, no. 1, doi:10.1007/S00253-011-3252-0, ISSN 1432-0614, pages 17 - 30, XP019915706 [A] 1-11

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/s00253-011-3252-0
 [AP]  - JENS SCHNEIDER ET AL, "Improving putrescine production byby fine-tuning ornithine transcarbamoylase activity using a plasmid addiction system", APPLIED MICROBIOLOGY AND BIOTECHNOLOGY, SPRINGER, BERLIN, DE, (20120228), vol. 95, no. 1, doi:10.1007/S00253-012-3956-9, ISSN 1432-0614, pages 169 - 178, XP035065837 [AP] 1-11

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/s00253-012-3956-9
 [T]  - NGUYEN ANH Q D ET AL, "Elimination of polyamineN-acetylation and regulatory engineering improved putrescine production byCorynebacterium glutamicum", JOURNAL OF BIOTECHNOLOGY, (20141106), vol. 201, doi:10.1016/J.JBIOTEC.2014.10.035, ISSN 0168-1656, pages 75 - 85, XP029124796

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.jbiotec.2014.10.035
 [T]  - P. PETERS-WENDISCH ET AL, "Engineering biotin prototrophic Corynebacterium glutamicum strains for amino acid, diamine and carotenoid production", JOURNAL OF BIOTECHNOLOGY, (20141201), vol. 192, doi:10.1016/j.jbiotec.2014.01.023, ISSN 0168-1656, pages 346 - 354, XP055210839

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.jbiotec.2014.01.023
 [T]  - MEISWINKEL TOBIAS M ET AL, "Crude glycerol-based production of amino acids and putrescine byCorynebacterium glutamicum", BIORESOURCE TECHNOLOGY, (20130301), vol. 145, doi:10.1016/J.BIORTECH.2013.02.053, ISSN 0960-8524, pages 254 - 258, XP028706153

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.biortech.2013.02.053
International search[A]KR20090107920  (KOREA ADVANCED INSTITUTE OF SCIENCE AND TECHNOLOGY);
 [A]US2009011478  (EPPELMANN KATRIN [US], et al);
 [A]  - QIAN, Z.-G. ET AL., "Metabolic engineering of Escherichia coli for the production of putrescine: A four carbon diamine.", BIOTECHNOLOGY AND BIOENGINEERING., (20091101), vol. 104, no. 4, pages 651 - 662, XP055032553

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/bit.22502
 [A]  - KIND, S. ET AL., "Identification and Elimination of the Competing N-Acetyldiaminopentane Pathway for Improved Production of Diaminopentane by Corynebacterium glutamicum.", APPLIED AND ENVIRONMENTAL MICROBIOLOGY, (201008), vol. 76, no. 15, pages 5175 - 5180, XP055095989

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1128/AEM.00834-10
 [A]  - SCHNEIDER, J. ET AL., "Putrescine production by engineered Corynebacterium glutamicum.", APPLIED AND ENVIRONMENTAL MICROBIOLOGY., (2010), vol. 88, no. 4, pages 859 - 868, XP019841775
by applicantWO2009125924
 KR920000933
 KR20090096689
 KR100620092B
 KR20120064046
 KR100860932B
    - SCHNEIDER ET AL., APPL. MICROBIOL. BIOTECHNOL., (2010), vol. 88, no. 4, pages 859 - 868
    - Current Protocols in Molecular Biology, JOHN WILEY & SONS, INC.
    - SAKANYAN V ET AL., MICROBIOLOGY, (1996), vol. 142, no. 1, pages 99 - 108