Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2805978

EP2805978 - ACTIVE ENERGY BEAM-CURABLE WATER-BASED RESIN COMPOSITION, ACTIVE ENERGY BEAM-CURABLE WATER-BASED COATING AND ARTICLE COATED WITH COATING [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  07.12.2018
Database last updated on 21.10.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip18.03.2019New entry: Reply to examination report 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
DIC Corporation
35-58, Sakashita 3-chome Itabashi-ku
Tokyo 174-8520 / JP
[2014/48]
Inventor(s)01 / MIYAKE Masahiro
c/o DIC Corporation
Sakai Plant
3 Takasago 1-chome
Takaishi-shi Osaka 592-0001 / JP
02 / MUKAI Takashi
c/o DIC Corporation
Sakai Plant
3 Takasago 1-chome
Takaishi-shi Osaka 592-0001 / JP
 [2014/48]
Representative(s)Beckmann, Claus , et al
Kraus & Weisert
Patentanwälte PartGmbB
Thomas-Wimmer-Ring 15
80539 München / DE
[2014/48]
Application number, filing date13738337.810.01.2013
WO2013JP50291
Priority number, dateJP2012000702517.01.2012         Original published format: JP 2012007025
[2014/48]
Filing languageJA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013108707
Date:25.07.2013
Language:JA
[2013/30]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2805978
Date:26.11.2014
Language:EN
[2014/48]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:JP25.07.2013
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP22.07.2015
ClassificationInternational:C08G18/67, C09D5/02, C09D133/14, C08G18/62, C08G18/75, C09D133/06, C09D175/16, C09D133/10
[2015/34]
Former International [2014/48]C08G18/67, C09D5/02, C09D133/14
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/48]
TitleGerman:DURCH AKTIVENERGIESTRAHLEN HÄRTBARE WÄSSRIGE HARZZUSAMMENSETZUNG, DURCH AKTIVENERGIESTRAHLEN HÄRTBARE WÄSSRIGE BESCHICHTUNG UND MIT DER BESCHICHTUNG BESCHICHTETER ARTIKEL[2014/48]
English:ACTIVE ENERGY BEAM-CURABLE WATER-BASED RESIN COMPOSITION, ACTIVE ENERGY BEAM-CURABLE WATER-BASED COATING AND ARTICLE COATED WITH COATING[2014/48]
French:COMPOSITION DE RÉSINE À BASE D'EAU DURCISSABLE PAR UN FAISCEAU D'ÉNERGIE ACTIVE, REVÊTEMENT À BASE D'EAU DURCISSABLE PAR UN FAISCEAU D'ÉNERGIE ACTIVE ET ARTICLE REVÊTU DU REVÊTEMENT[2014/48]
Entry into regional phase16.05.2014Translation filed 
16.05.2014National basic fee paid 
16.05.2014Search fee paid 
16.05.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
16.05.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure16.05.2014Examination requested  [2014/48]
18.01.2016Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
06.12.2018Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
14.03.2019Reply to a communication from the examining division
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  06.12.2018
Fees paidRenewal fee
27.01.2015Renewal fee patent year 03
22.12.2015Renewal fee patent year 04
29.12.2016Renewal fee patent year 05
21.12.2017Renewal fee patent year 06
15.01.2019Renewal fee patent year 07
Documents cited:Search[X]WO2006137569  (NIPPON PAINT CO LTD [JP]; HONDA MOTOR CO LTD [JP]; IRIE TAKASHI [JP];) [X] 1-8 * page 1, lines 7-8 * * page 3, lines 26-30 * * page 11, line 20 - page 12, line 27 * * examples 1-5; claim - *;
 [XA]US2003069353  (SUGANUMA HAJIME [JP] ET AL) [X] 8 * paragraphs [0001] , [0 16] - [0017] - [0 20] , [0 56] , [0 61] - [0062]; example -; claim - * [A] 1-7;
 [XA]EP1002817  (SHOWA DENKO KK [JP]) [X] 8 * paragraphs [0001] , [00 7] , [0 21] , [0 27] , [0 73]; example 1; claim - * [A] 1-7;
 [XA]JP2002216845  (NIPPON SYNTHETIC CHEM IND) [X] 8 * paragraphs [0001] , [0 20] , [0 24] , [0 27]; example 1 * [A] 1-7
International search[X]JP2007002048  (NIPPON PAINT CO., LTD.);
 [A]JP2003064149  (DAINIPPON INK AND CHEMICALS, INC.);
 [AP]JP2012214759  (DAIKIN INDUSTRIES, LTD.);
 [A]JPH03250014  (MITSUBISHI CHEMICAL CORP.);
 [A]JP2002270235  (NISSHINBO INDUSTRIES, INC.);
 [A]JP2004244435  (MITSUBISHI CHEMICAL CORP.);
 [A]JPH05271384  (OLIN CORP.);
 [A]JP2008156659  (DAINIPPON PRINTING CO., LTD.)
by applicantJP2004010779
 WO2008056569