Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2805069

EP2805069 - FASTENER RETAINING DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  25.01.2019
Database last updated on 18.05.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip01.05.2019New entry: Reply to examination report 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Magna Closures Inc.
521 Newpark Boulevard
Newmarket, ON L3Y 4X7 / CA
[2015/13]
Former [2014/48]For all designated states
Magna Closures Inc.
521 Newpark Boulevard
Newmarket, ON L3Y 4X7 / CA
For all designated states
McCorkell, John P.
16 Cleopatra Crescent
Orillia, Ontario L3V 7Y7 / CA
Inventor(s)01 / MCCORKELL, John P.
16 Cleopatra Crescent
Orillia, Ontario L3V 7Y7 / CA
 [2014/48]
Representative(s)Glawe, Delfs, Moll
Partnerschaft mbB von
Patent- und Rechtsanwälten
Postfach 13 03 91
20103 Hamburg / DE
[N/P]
Former [2014/48]Hössle Patentanwälte Partnerschaft
Postfach 10 23 38
70019 Stuttgart / DE
Application number, filing date13738404.617.01.2013
WO2013CA00030
Priority number, dateUS201261587286P17.01.2012         Original published format: US 201261587286 P
[2014/48]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013106907
Date:25.07.2013
Language:EN
[2013/30]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2805069
Date:26.11.2014
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.07.2013
[2014/48]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:CA25.07.2013
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP23.06.2015
ClassificationInternational:F16B21/07, B60J5/00, B62D65/06, F16B29/00, F16B41/00, F16B5/02, B60J5/04, F16B37/08, F16B39/02
[2015/30]
Former International [2014/48]F16B21/07, B60J5/00, B62D65/06, F16B29/00, F16B41/00, F16B5/02
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/48]
TitleGerman:VERSCHLUSSHALTEVORRICHTUNG[2014/48]
English:FASTENER RETAINING DEVICE[2014/48]
French:DISPOSITIF DE RETENUE D' ÉLÉMENTS DE FIXATION[2014/48]
Entry into regional phase04.08.2014National basic fee paid 
04.08.2014Search fee paid 
04.08.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
04.08.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure04.08.2014Examination requested  [2014/48]
11.01.2016Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
29.01.2019Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
30.04.2019Reply to a communication from the examining division
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  29.01.2019
Fees paidRenewal fee
13.01.2015Renewal fee patent year 03
11.01.2016Renewal fee patent year 04
11.01.2017Renewal fee patent year 05
15.01.2018Renewal fee patent year 06
15.01.2019Renewal fee patent year 07
Documents cited:Search[XI]US2009197724  (YOUNG JAMES D [US]) [X] 1-3,6,7,9,11 * abstract * * paragraphs [0002] , [0 25] - [0028] * * figures 1-7 * [I] 10;
 [XI]US2010260578  (ULLEIN THOMAS [DE]) [X] 1-3,6,7,9 * abstract * * paragraphs [0003] , [0 14] * * figures 1, 2 * [I] 10,11;
 [XI]DE4131779  (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [X] 1-4 * abstract * * column 1, lines 10-20, 37-51 * * column 2, lines 23-29, 35-50 * * column 2, line 67 - column 3, line 6 * * claim 1 * * figures 1-5 * [I] 9-12;
 [XI]US5536124  (SILVA DENNIS [US]) [X] 1-3,6-8 * abstract * * column 2, lines 15-39 * * figures 1-4 * [I] 9,11;
 [XI]DE202005014924U  (ARVINMERITOR GMBH [DE]) [X] 1,6,9,10 * abstract * * paragraphs [0030] - [0032] * * figure 5 * [I] 11
International search[A]US2005198761  (BASKERVILLE TAURRIS D [US], et al);
 [A]US6357953  (BALLANTYNE DAVID BURGESS [US]);
 [A]US8061947  (VAN TIEM RYAN [US], et al)
by applicantUS2009197724
 DE4131779