Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2804858

EP2804858 - METALLOENZYME INHIBITOR COMPOUNDS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  17.07.2019
Database last updated on 16.10.2019
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  06.01.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip17.07.2019New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Mycovia Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
4505 Emperor Boulevard Suite 300
Durham NC 27703 / US
[2019/28]
Former [2018/09]For all designated states
Viamet Pharmaceuticals (NC), Inc.
4505 Emperor Boulevard, Suite 300
Durham, NC 27703 / US
Former [2015/01]For all designated states
Viamet Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
4505 Emperor Boulevard, Suite 300
Durham, NC 27703 / US
Former [2014/48]For all designated states
Viamet Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
4505 Emperor Blvd., Suite 300
Durham, NC 27703 / US
Inventor(s)01 / HOEKSTRA, William J.
7 Treviso Place
Durham, NC 27707 / US
02 / SCHOTZINGER, Robert J.
7000 Potomac Court
Raleigh, NC 27613 / US
03 / RAFFERTY, Stephen W.
525 Okeechobee Blvd.
Suite 1600
West Palm Beach, FL 33401 / US
 [2014/48]
Representative(s)Adam, Holger , et al
Kraus & Weisert
Patentanwälte PartGmbB
Thomas-Wimmer-Ring 15
80539 München / DE
[2014/48]
Application number, filing date13738427.718.01.2013
WO2013US22313
Priority number, dateUS201261589076P20.01.2012         Original published format: US 201261589076 P
[2014/48]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013109998
Date:25.07.2013
Language:EN
[2013/30]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2804858
Date:26.11.2014
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.07.2013
[2014/48]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:KR25.07.2013
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP30.06.2015
ClassificationInternational:C07D401/06, A61K31/454, A61P35/00, A61P9/00
[2014/48]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/48]
TitleGerman:METALLOENZYMHEMMERVERBINDUNGEN[2014/48]
English:METALLOENZYME INHIBITOR COMPOUNDS[2014/48]
French:COMPOSÉS INHIBITEURS DE MÉTALLOENZYMES[2014/48]
Entry into regional phase11.08.2014National basic fee paid 
11.08.2014Search fee paid 
11.08.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
11.08.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure11.08.2014Examination requested  [2014/48]
12.01.2016Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
02.09.2016Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
22.12.2016Reply to a communication from the examining division
31.03.2017Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
10.10.2017Reply to a communication from the examining division
15.01.2018Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
10.07.2018Reply to a communication from the examining division
09.11.2018Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
07.03.2019Reply to a communication from the examining division
18.07.2019Communication of intention to grant the patent
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  02.09.2016
Fees paidRenewal fee
27.01.2015Renewal fee patent year 03
27.01.2016Renewal fee patent year 04
27.01.2017Renewal fee patent year 05
29.01.2018Renewal fee patent year 06
09.01.2019Renewal fee patent year 07
Documents cited:Search[I]WO2011133875  (VIAMET PHARMACEUTICALS INC [US], et al) [I] 1-28 * example -; claim - *;
 [T]  - HOEKSTRA WILLIAM J ET AL, "Design and optimization of highly-selective fungal CYP51 inhibitors", BIOORGANIC & MEDICINAL CHEMISTRY LETTERS, PERGAMON, AMSTERDAM, NL, (20140101), vol. 24, no. 15, doi:10.1016/J.BMCL.2014.05.068, ISSN 0960-894X, pages 3455 - 3458, XP028864117 [T] * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.bmcl.2014.05.068
International search[X]WO2011133875  (VIAMET PHARMACEUTICALS, INC.);
 [A]JP2000344744  (SS PHARMACEUT CO LTD);
 [A]US4616026  (KENNETH RICHARDSON ET AL.);
 [A]  - HIROMICHI ETO ET AL., "New Antifungal 1, 2, 4-Triazoles with Difluoro- (heteroaryl)methyl Moiety", CHEMICAL AND PHARMACEUTICAL BULLETIN, (2000), vol. 48, no. 7, pages 982 - 990, XP002197708
by applicantWO2011133875
 US6261547
 US6197934
 US6056950
 US5800807
 US5776445
 US5698219
 US5521222
 US5403841
 US5077033
 US4882150
 US4738851
 US5407713
 US5352456
 US5332213
 US5336168
 US5290561
 US5254346
 US5164189
 US5163899
 US5088977
 US5087240
 US5008110
 US4921475
    - XUE et al., Nature Chemical Biology, (20080000), vol. 4, no. 2, pages 107 - 109
    - BERGE et al., "Pharmaceutical Salts", J. Pharm. Sci., (19770000), vol. 66, doi:doi:10.1002/jps.2600660104, pages 1 - 19, XP002675560

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/jps.2600660104
    - JAHNISCH, K. et al., Angew. Chem. Int. Ed. Engl., (20040000), vol. 43, page 406
    - BERGE et al., Journal of Pharmaceutical Science, (19770000), vol. 66, pages 1 - 19
    - "General Principles", FINGL; WOODBURY, Goodman and Gilman's The Pharmaceutical Basis of Therapeutics, Pagamonon Press, pages 1 - 46