Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2806287

EP2806287 - OBJECT DETECTION DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been withdrawn
Status updated on  12.08.2016
Database last updated on 16.10.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip12.08.2016Withdrawal of applicationpublished on 14.09.2016  [2016/37]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Toyota Jidosha Kabushiki Kaisha
1 Toyota-cho
Toyota-shi, Aichi 471-8571 / JP
[2014/48]
Inventor(s)01 / INOMATA Ryo
c/o TOYOTA JIDOSHA KABUSHIKI KAISHA
1 Toyota-cho
Toyota-shi Aichi 471-8571 / JP
 [2014/48]
Representative(s)TBK
Bavariaring 4-6
80336 München / DE
[2014/48]
Application number, filing date13738490.508.01.2013
WO2013JP50106
Priority number, dateJP2012000636216.01.2012         Original published format: JP 2012006362
[2014/48]
Filing languageJA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013108664
Date:25.07.2013
Language:JA
[2013/30]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2806287
Date:26.11.2014
Language:EN
[2014/48]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:JP25.07.2013
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP05.06.2015
ClassificationInternational:G01S13/86, G01S13/93, G08G1/16, B60R21/00, G01S7/41, G01S17/93
[2015/28]
Former International [2014/48]G01S13/86, G01S13/93, G08G1/16, B60R21/00
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/48]
TitleGerman:OBJEKTERKENNUNGSVORRICHTUNG[2014/48]
English:OBJECT DETECTION DEVICE[2014/48]
French:DISPOSITIF DE DÉTECTION D'OBJET[2014/48]
Entry into regional phase08.07.2014Translation filed 
08.07.2014National basic fee paid 
08.07.2014Search fee paid 
08.07.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
08.07.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination proceduredeletedCommunication of intention to grant the patent
08.07.2014Examination requested  [2014/48]
29.12.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
09.08.2016Application withdrawn by applicant  [2016/37]
Fees paidRenewal fee
30.01.2015Renewal fee patent year 03
11.01.2016Renewal fee patent year 04
Documents cited:Search[IY]EP1947475  (TOYOTA MOTOR CO LTD [JP]) [I] 1,3 * paragraphs [0018] - [0021] - [0027] , [0048] - [0067] - [0009] , [0035] , [0012] - [0013] - [0040]; figure 1 * [Y] 2,4;
 [A]JP2011242860  (TOYOTA MOTOR CORP) [A] 1-4 * paragraphs [0008] - [0009] *;
 [YP]US2012035846  (SAKAMOTO HIROSHI [JP] ET AL) [YP] 2,4 * paragraphs [0049] , [0145] , [0014] , [0128] - [0141]; figures 2,11,12 *;
 WO2010119860  [ ] (HITACHI AUTOMOTIVE SYSTEMS LTD [JP]; SAKAMOTO HIROSHI [JP]; TSUCHIYA K)
International search[X]JP2007132748  (TOYOTA MOTOR CORP.);
 [A]JP2005202878  (TOYOTA MOTOR CORP.);
 [A]JP2003302470  (SOGO JIDOSHA ANZEN KOGAI GIJUTSU KENKYU KUMIAI);
 [A]JP2000131432  (HONDA MOTOR CO., LTD.);
 [A]JP2011220732  (HONDA MOTOR CO., LTD.);
 [A]WO2011036807  (TOYOTA MOTOR CORP.);
 [A]JP2011053139  (TOYOTA MOTOR CORP.);
 [A]WO2008139529  (HONDA MOTOR CO., LTD.);
 [A]JP2006151125  (OMRON CORP.)
by applicantJP2006284293