Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2804799

EP2804799 - CABLE ACTUATORS AND CABLE ACTUATED APPARATUSES AND SYSTEMS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  21.09.2018
Database last updated on 19.07.2019
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  13.10.2017
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  16.07.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip21.06.2019Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): MC
published on 24.07.2019 [2019/30]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Altimate Medical Inc
P.O.Box 180 262 West First Street
Morton 56270 / US
[2014/48]
Inventor(s)01 / LOKKEN, Michael Warren
803 Maple Lane
Grove City, Minnesota 56243 / US
 [2014/48]
Representative(s)Ganguillet, Cyril , et al
ABREMA Agence Brevets & Marques Ganguillet Avenue du Théâtre 16 P.O. Box 5027
1002 Lausanne / CH
[2014/48]
Application number, filing date13738516.718.01.2013
[2017/46]
WO2013US22166
Priority number, dateUS201261588929P20.01.2012         Original published format: US 201261588929 P
[2014/48]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO2013109905
Date:25.07.2013
Language:EN
[2013/30]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP2804799
Date:26.11.2014
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.07.2013
[2014/48]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2804799
Date:15.11.2017
Language:EN
[2017/46]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US11.06.2015
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP01.06.2016
ClassificationInternational:A61G5/14
[2017/31]
Former International [2014/48]B62B1/10
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/48]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:SEILZUGAKTUATOREN UND SEILZUGBETÄTIGTE VORRICHTUNGEN UND SYSTEME[2014/48]
English:CABLE ACTUATORS AND CABLE ACTUATED APPARATUSES AND SYSTEMS[2014/48]
French:ACTIONNEURS À CÂBLE ET APPAREILS ET SYSTÈMES ACTIONNÉS PAR CÂBLE[2014/48]
Entry into regional phase25.07.2014National basic fee paid 
25.07.2014Search fee paid 
25.07.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
25.07.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure25.07.2014Examination requested  [2014/48]
22.11.2016Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
17.07.2017Communication of intention to grant the patent
02.10.2017Fee for grant paid
02.10.2017Fee for publishing/printing paid
02.10.2017Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  17.07.2017
Opposition(s)17.08.2018No opposition filed within time limit [2018/43]
Fees paidRenewal fee
27.01.2015Renewal fee patent year 03
27.01.2016Renewal fee patent year 04
27.01.2017Renewal fee patent year 05
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT15.11.2017
CY15.11.2017
CZ15.11.2017
DK15.11.2017
EE15.11.2017
ES15.11.2017
FI15.11.2017
HR15.11.2017
LT15.11.2017
LV15.11.2017
MC15.11.2017
NL15.11.2017
PL15.11.2017
RO15.11.2017
RS15.11.2017
SE15.11.2017
SI15.11.2017
SK15.11.2017
SM15.11.2017
IE18.01.2018
LU18.01.2018
BE31.01.2018
CH31.01.2018
FR31.01.2018
LI31.01.2018
BG15.02.2018
NO15.02.2018
GR16.02.2018
[2019/30]
Former [2019/09]AT15.11.2017
CY15.11.2017
CZ15.11.2017
DK15.11.2017
EE15.11.2017
ES15.11.2017
FI15.11.2017
HR15.11.2017
LT15.11.2017
LV15.11.2017
NL15.11.2017
PL15.11.2017
RO15.11.2017
RS15.11.2017
SE15.11.2017
SI15.11.2017
SK15.11.2017
SM15.11.2017
IE18.01.2018
LU18.01.2018
BE31.01.2018
CH31.01.2018
FR31.01.2018
LI31.01.2018
BG15.02.2018
NO15.02.2018
GR16.02.2018
Former [2018/52]AT15.11.2017
CY15.11.2017
CZ15.11.2017
DK15.11.2017
EE15.11.2017
ES15.11.2017
FI15.11.2017
HR15.11.2017
LT15.11.2017
LV15.11.2017
NL15.11.2017
PL15.11.2017
RO15.11.2017
RS15.11.2017
SE15.11.2017
SI15.11.2017
SK15.11.2017
SM15.11.2017
LU18.01.2018
BE31.01.2018
CH31.01.2018
FR31.01.2018
LI31.01.2018
BG15.02.2018
NO15.02.2018
GR16.02.2018
Former [2018/49]AT15.11.2017
CY15.11.2017
CZ15.11.2017
DK15.11.2017
EE15.11.2017
ES15.11.2017
FI15.11.2017
HR15.11.2017
LT15.11.2017
LV15.11.2017
NL15.11.2017
PL15.11.2017
RO15.11.2017
RS15.11.2017
SE15.11.2017
SK15.11.2017
SM15.11.2017
LU18.01.2018
BE31.01.2018
FR31.01.2018
BG15.02.2018
NO15.02.2018
GR16.02.2018
Former [2018/47]AT15.11.2017
CY15.11.2017
CZ15.11.2017
DK15.11.2017
EE15.11.2017
ES15.11.2017
FI15.11.2017
HR15.11.2017
LT15.11.2017
LV15.11.2017
NL15.11.2017
PL15.11.2017
RO15.11.2017
RS15.11.2017
SE15.11.2017
SK15.11.2017
SM15.11.2017
LU18.01.2018
BG15.02.2018
NO15.02.2018
GR16.02.2018
Former [2018/40]AT15.11.2017
CY15.11.2017
CZ15.11.2017
DK15.11.2017
EE15.11.2017
ES15.11.2017
FI15.11.2017
HR15.11.2017
LT15.11.2017
LV15.11.2017
NL15.11.2017
PL15.11.2017
RO15.11.2017
RS15.11.2017
SE15.11.2017
SK15.11.2017
SM15.11.2017
BG15.02.2018
NO15.02.2018
GR16.02.2018
Former [2018/37]AT15.11.2017
CY15.11.2017
CZ15.11.2017
DK15.11.2017
EE15.11.2017
ES15.11.2017
FI15.11.2017
HR15.11.2017
LT15.11.2017
LV15.11.2017
NL15.11.2017
PL15.11.2017
RS15.11.2017
SE15.11.2017
SK15.11.2017
SM15.11.2017
BG15.02.2018
NO15.02.2018
GR16.02.2018
Former [2018/35]AT15.11.2017
CY15.11.2017
CZ15.11.2017
DK15.11.2017
EE15.11.2017
ES15.11.2017
FI15.11.2017
HR15.11.2017
LT15.11.2017
LV15.11.2017
NL15.11.2017
RS15.11.2017
SE15.11.2017
SK15.11.2017
BG15.02.2018
NO15.02.2018
GR16.02.2018
Former [2018/24]AT15.11.2017
ES15.11.2017
FI15.11.2017
HR15.11.2017
LT15.11.2017
LV15.11.2017
NL15.11.2017
RS15.11.2017
SE15.11.2017
BG15.02.2018
NO15.02.2018
GR16.02.2018
Former [2018/22]ES15.11.2017
FI15.11.2017
LT15.11.2017
NL15.11.2017
NO15.02.2018
Documents cited:Search[XI]US5433126  (CORBETT CHRISTOPHER H [US]) [X] 1-3,5,7-9,11,13,14 * figures 1-9 * * column 4, line 10 - column 9, line 65 * [I] 10;
 [XI]WO2010043030  (MAGNA SEATING INC [CA], et al) [X] 1-5,9-11,13-15 * figures 1-8 * * paragraph [0021] - paragraph [0030] * [I] 12;
 [A]US2009305843  (HUNG MU-CHEN [TW]) [A] 1-15 * figures 1-6 * * paragraph [0005] - paragraph [0008] *;
 [A]DE202011005162U  (ROLLEN GMBH AS [DE]) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *
International search[X]US2008224520  (VELUSWAMY SELVAKUMARESAN [US], et al);
 [Y]US6199951  (ZEILE KIM [US], et al);
 [Y]US2010164265  (TOMANDL MARK G [US]);
 [Y]US6474739  (LAGERWEIJ RICHARD ALLEN [CA]);
 [Y]US4431076  (SIMPSON ROBERT C [US]);
 [Y]US2007062324  (INGRAHAM DEREK [US])
by applicantUS5433126