blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP2804799


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
21.06.2019 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  24.07.2019 [2019/30]
25.01.2019 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  27.02.2019  [2019/09]
23.11.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  26.12.2018  [2018/52]
09.11.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  12.12.2018  [2018/50]
02.11.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  05.12.2018  [2018/49]
19.10.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  21.11.2018  [2018/47]
21.09.2018 No opposition filed within time limit published on  24.10.2018  [2018/43]
14.09.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  17.10.2018  [2018/42]
31.08.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  03.10.2018  [2018/40]
24.08.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  26.09.2018  [2018/39]
17.08.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  19.09.2018  [2018/38]
10.08.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  12.09.2018  [2018/37]
27.07.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  29.08.2018  [2018/35]
01.06.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  04.07.2018  [2018/27]
25.05.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  27.06.2018  [2018/26]
18.05.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  20.06.2018  [2018/25]
11.05.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  13.06.2018  [2018/24]
27.04.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  30.05.2018  [2018/22]
13.10.2017 (Expected) grant published on  15.11.2017  [2017/46]
12.10.2017 New entry: Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
06.10.2017 New entry: Payment of fee for grant
06.10.2017 New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing
16.07.2017 New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent
30.06.2017 Change - classification published on  02.08.2017  [2017/31]
03.02.2017 New entry: Renewal fee paid
02.12.2016 Amendment by applicant
02.06.2016 Supplementary search report published on  29.06.2016  [2016/26]
27.05.2016 Change - classification published on  29.06.2016  [2016/26]
02.02.2016 New entry: Renewal fee paid
12.06.2015 Change - PCT data published on  15.07.2015  [2015/29]
27.03.2015 Change - extension states published on  29.04.2015  [2015/18]
30.01.2015 New entry: Renewal fee paid
24.10.2014 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  26.11.2014  [2014/48]
24.10.2014 Request for examination filed published on  26.11.2014  [2014/48]
22.08.2014 PCT data prior to European publication
30.07.2014 PCT data prior to European publication
29.07.2014 Amendment by applicant
26.07.2014 PCT data prior to European publication
09.08.2013 PCT data prior to European publication
26.07.2013 PCT data prior to European publication