blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Patent family: EP2804799 Family dossiers alerts: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):  

CN201380006121 EP13738516



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated





TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US9695917Global Dossier 04.07.2017B2
US2014339858 20.11.2014A1
Priority number Date
US201261588929 20.01.2012
WO2013US22166 18.01.2013
US201314372230 18.01.2013
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CN104520163Global Dossier 15.04.2015A
Priority number Date
US201261588929 20.01.2012
WO2013US22166 18.01.2013
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CA2861311Global Dossier 27.03.2018C
CA2861311 25.07.2013A1
Priority number Date
US201261588929 20.01.2012
WO2013US22166 18.01.2013
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
EP2804799Global Dossier 15.11.2017B1
EP2804799 29.06.2016A4
EP2804799 26.11.2014A2
Priority number Date
US201261588929 20.01.2012
WO2013US22166 18.01.2013
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
AU2013209609 28.08.2014A1
Priority number Date
US201261588929 20.01.2012
WO2013US22166 18.01.2013
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
WO2013109905Global Dossier 11.06.2015A3
WO2013109905 25.07.2013A2
Priority number Date
US201261588929 20.01.2012