Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2806640

EP2806640 - METHOD FOR ENCODING AND DECODING QUANTIZED MATRIX AND APPARATUS USING SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  18.03.2019
Database last updated on 22.05.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip22.03.2019First examination report 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Electronics and Telecommunications Research Institute
161 Gajeong-dong
Yuseong-gu
Daejeon 305-700 / KR
[N/P]
Former [2014/48]For all designated states
Electronics and Telecommunications Research Institute
161 Gajeong-dong Yuseong-gu
Daejeon 305-700 / KR
Inventor(s)01 / LIM, Sung Chang
Rm. 103 208-10 Sinseong-dong
Yuseong-gu
Daejeon 305-805 / KR
02 / KIM, Hui Yong
601-201 Yeolmaemaeul Apt.
Jijok-dong
Yuseong-gu
Daejeon 305-770 / KR
03 / LEE, Jin Ho
Rm. 302 Unovill
210-51 Sinseong-dong
Yuseong-gu
Daejeon 305-345 / KR
04 / CHOI, Jin Soo
609-1605 Banseokmaeul 6 Danji Apt.
613 Banseok-dong
Yuseong-gu
Daejeon 305-750 / KR
05 / KIM, Jin Woong
305-1603 Expo Apt.
Jeonmin-dong
Yuseong-gu
Daejeon 305-761 / KR
 [2014/48]
Representative(s)Peterreins Schley
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte
Hermann-Sack-Strasse 3
80331 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2014/48]Betten & Resch
Theatinerstrasse 8
80333 München / DE
Application number, filing date13738659.521.01.2013
WO2013KR00493
Priority number, dateKR2012000656420.01.2012         Original published format: KR 20120006564
KR2012001167206.02.2012         Original published format: KR 20120011672
KR2012001346209.02.2012         Original published format: KR 20120013462
KR2012001399610.02.2012         Original published format: KR 20120013996
KR2012003897116.04.2012         Original published format: KR 20120038971
[2014/48]
Filing languageKO
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013109127
Date:25.07.2013
Language:KO
[2013/30]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2806640
Date:26.11.2014
Language:EN
[2014/48]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:KR25.07.2013
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP30.03.2016
ClassificationInternational:H04N19/50, H04N19/176, H04N19/159, H04N19/70, H04N19/61, H04N19/463, H04N19/126
[2016/17]
Former International [2014/48]H04N7/32
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/48]
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZUR CODIERUNG UND DECODIERUNG EINER QUANTISIERTEN MATRIX UND VORRICHTUNG DAMIT[2014/48]
English:METHOD FOR ENCODING AND DECODING QUANTIZED MATRIX AND APPARATUS USING SAME[2014/48]
French:PROCÉDÉ POUR CODER ET DÉCODER UNE MATRICE QUANTIFIÉE ET APPAREIL L'UTILISANT[2014/48]
Entry into regional phase24.07.2014Translation filed 
20.08.2014National basic fee paid 
20.08.2014Search fee paid 
20.08.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
20.08.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure20.08.2014Examination requested  [2014/48]
12.10.2016Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
21.03.2019Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  21.03.2019
Fees paidRenewal fee
02.02.2015Renewal fee patent year 03
01.02.2016Renewal fee patent year 04
31.01.2017Renewal fee patent year 05
31.01.2018Renewal fee patent year 06
31.01.2019Renewal fee patent year 07
Documents cited:Search[XI]  - STEPHAN WENGER ET AL, "APS syntax and semantics, and parameter set extension syntax", 7. JCT-VC MEETING; 98. MPEG MEETING; 21-11-2011 - 30-11-2011; GENEVA; (JOINT COLLABORATIVE TEAM ON VIDEO CODING OF ISO/IEC JTC1/SC29/WG11 AND ITU-T SG.16 ); URL: HTTP://WFTP3.ITU.INT/AV-ARCH/JCTVC-SITE/,, (20111130), vol. G1016r2_attachement, XP055259009 [X] 1-4,6-10 * sections 1 and 2 * [I] 5,11
 [X]  - JUNICHI TANAKA ET AL, "Quantization matrix for HEVC", 20110310, (20110310), no. JCTVC-E073, ISSN 0000-0007, XP030008579 [X] 1-11 * sections 2.3 and 8 *
 [X]  - CHEN Y ET AL, "Quantization matrices in fragmented APS", 7. JCT-VC MEETING; 98. MPEG MEETING; 21-11-2011 - 30-11-2011; GENEVA; (JOINT COLLABORATIVE TEAM ON VIDEO CODING OF ISO/IEC JTC1/SC29/WG11 AND ITU-T SG.16 ); URL: HTTP://WFTP3.ITU.INT/AV-ARCH/JCTVC-SITE/,, (20111109), no. JCTVC-G658, XP030110642 [X] 1,2 * sections 2.1-2.2 and 3 *
 [XP]  - S-C LIM ET AL, "Non-CE4 Subtest 2: Improvement on quantization matrix signaling", 8. JCT-VC MEETING; 99. MPEG MEETING; 1-2-2012 - 10-2-2012; SAN JOSE; (JOINT COLLABORATIVE TEAM ON VIDEO CODING OF ISO/IEC JTC1/SC29/WG11 AND ITU-T SG.16 ); URL: HTTP://WFTP3.ITU.INT/AV-ARCH/JCTVC-SITE/,, (20120120), no. JCTVC-H0237, XP030111264 [XP] 1-11 * the whole document *
 [XP]  - S-C LIM ET AL, "Simplification on default quantization matrix signalling", 100. MPEG MEETING; 30-4-2012 - 4-5-2012; GENEVA; (MOTION PICTURE EXPERT GROUP OR ISO/IEC JTC1/SC29/WG11),, (20120425), no. m24340, XP030052685 [XP] 1-11 * the whole document *
International search[A]US2011150082  (LU JIUHUAI [US], et al);
 [A]US2010316120  (ABE KIYOFUMI [JP], et al);
 [A]US2010086028  (TANIZAWA AKIYUKI [JP], et al);
 [A]US2008205528  (SONG BYUNG-CHEOL [KR], et al);
 [A]KR940003199  (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO., LTD.)