blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP2806640 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP2806640



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 1157
21.03.2019 Annex to the communication Search / examination 6
21.03.2019 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
19.03.2019 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Search / examination 1
14.03.2019 Examination started Search / examination 1
05.03.2019 Request for change of applicant's representative Search / examination 2
08.02.2019 Confirmation of revocation of automatic debit order Search / examination 1
05.02.2019 Letter relating to the automatic debiting procedure Search / examination 1
14.12.2018 Notification regarding date of start of examination with possibility to withdraw Search / examination 1
12.10.2016 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 2
12.10.2016 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 2
12.10.2016 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 3
12.10.2016 Amendments received before examination Search / examination 7
12.10.2016 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
12.10.2016 Translation of priority document Search / examination 39
12.10.2016 Translation of priority document Search / examination 32
12.10.2016 Translation of priority document Search / examination 49
12.10.2016 Translation of priority document Search / examination 110
12.10.2016 Translation of priority document Search / examination 46
15.04.2016 Invitation to declare maintenance of the application and to correct deficiencies in the Written Opinion/amend application Search / examination 1
15.04.2016 Invitation to file a translation of the previous application Search / examination 1
30.03.2016 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
30.03.2016 European search opinion Search / examination 3
30.03.2016 Information on Search Strategy Search / examination 1
30.03.2016 Supplementary European search report Search / examination 2
16.03.2016 Search started Search / examination 1
11.11.2015 Document concerning representation Search / examination 1
16.06.2015 CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative of the applicant (Association) Search / examination 1
14.04.2015 Communication regarding possible amendment of the application/payment of claims fee Search / examination 3
27.11.2014 Invitation to indicate correct address of inventor Search / examination 1
10.11.2014 Letter which had not been notified Search / examination 2
29.10.2014 Notification of forthcoming publication Search / examination 2
09.10.2014 Invitation to indicate correct address of inventor Search / examination 1
30.09.2014 Letter which had not been notified Search / examination 2
27.08.2014 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
27.08.2014 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
27.08.2014 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
27.08.2014 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
27.08.2014 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
24.07.2014 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 2
24.07.2014 Abstract Search / examination 1
24.07.2014 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 3
24.07.2014 Claims Search / examination 3
24.07.2014 Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability Search / examination 4
24.07.2014 Description Search / examination 123
24.07.2014 Drawings Search / examination 8
24.07.2014 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 5
24.07.2014 Translation of the international preliminary report on patentability Search / examination 5
02.06.2014 Information on entry into European phase Search / examination 3
15.08.2013 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 69
15.08.2013 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 64
15.08.2013 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 141
15.08.2013 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 54
15.08.2013 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 182
15.08.2013 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 46
25.07.2013 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 4
25.07.2013 Copy of the translated international search report Search / examination 4
25.07.2013 International publication pamphlet Search / examination 102