blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP2806640


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
22.03.2019 First examination report
18.03.2019 New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit
15.03.2019 Change - representative
04.02.2019 New entry: Renewal fee paid
02.02.2018 New entry: Renewal fee paid
06.02.2017 New entry: Renewal fee paid
14.10.2016 Amendment by applicant
25.03.2016 Change - classification published on  27.04.2016  [2016/17]
25.03.2016 Change - classification published on  27.04.2016  [2016/17]
25.03.2016 Change - date of supplementary search report published on  27.04.2016  [2016/17]
05.02.2016 New entry: Renewal fee paid
27.03.2015 Change - extension states published on  29.04.2015  [2015/18]
06.02.2015 New entry: Renewal fee paid
24.10.2014 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  26.11.2014  [2014/48]
24.10.2014 Request for examination filed published on  26.11.2014  [2014/48]
04.09.2014 PCT data prior to European publication
22.08.2014 PCT data prior to European publication
12.08.2014 PCT data prior to European publication
26.07.2014 Amendment by applicant
25.07.2014 PCT data prior to European publication
03.08.2013 PCT data prior to European publication
26.07.2013 PCT data prior to European publication